Hooks v. AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-06061
District Judge Benjamin H Settle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 12, 2019 at 2:59 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald K Hooks, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan E Connolly +1 206 220 6324 ryan.connolly@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah McBride +1 206 220 6282 sarah.mcbride@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anne Phyllis Pomerantz +1 206 220 6301 anne.pomerantz@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY W Melvin Haas, III +1 478 621 2426 mhaas@constangy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles P. Roberts +1 336 721 6852 croberts@constangy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephanie Pennix Berntsen +1 206 622 1711 +1 206 292 0460 sberntsen@schwabe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Farron Danelle Curry +1 206 407 1571 fcurry@schwabe.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2018 before Judge Benjamin H. Settle.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Angela Nicolavo, angela_nicolavo@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3832. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2018, (AN) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT BY COURT. (MGC) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER denying 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Benjamin H. Settle- Dep Clerk: Tyler Campbell; Pla Counsel: Ryan Connolly, Anne Pomerantz; Def Counsel: Charles Roberts, Mel Haas, Farron Curry; CR: Angela Nicolavo; Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 2/7/2018. Argument from counsel. Court to issue order on 1 Petition for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. (TC) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Hearing: 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/7/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ***Motion terminated due to withdrawal by Petitioner: 29 MOTION to Stay of Oral Argument in Light of US Govt cessation filed by Ronald K Hooks. (TG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION Rescinding Prior Request for Indefinite Stay of Oral Argument re 29 MOTION to Stay of Oral Argument in Light of US Govt cessation, filed by Petitioner Ronald K Hooks. Noting Date 1/19/2018, (Pomerantz, Anne) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Stay of Oral Argument in Light of US Govt cessation, filed by Petitioner Ronald K Hooks. Noting Date 1/19/2018, (Pomerantz, Anne) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY, filed by Petitioner Ronald K Hooks, TO RESPONSE to 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Pomerantz, Anne) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER re 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney W Melvin Haas, III for AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles P Roberts, III for AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 16 Declaration, 21 Declaration, 22 Declaration, 13 Response to Motion, 24 Declaration, 20 Declaration, 15 Declaration, 19 Declaration, 14 Declaration, 23 Declaration, 18 Declaration, 17 Declaration (Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DECLARATION of Deborah Ruffcorn filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DECLARATION of Lori Ann Downs-Haynes filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            DECLARATION of Brenda Sellers filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DECLARATION of Becky Cole filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DECLARATION of Leigh Booth filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DECLARATION of Zack Hamilton filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    DECLARATION of Rob Anderson filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      DECLARATION of Kendrick James filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        DECLARATION of Jum Dildine filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          DECLARATION of Evi Phillips filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            DECLARATION of Bill Keilman filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE, by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc., to 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berntsen, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Attorney Stephanie Pennix Berntsen added for AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. per the 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Farron Curry. (CMG)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AIM Group USA, Inc., Corporate Parent AIM Aerospace Corporation, Corporate Parent AIM Aerospace Holdings, LLC for AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. (Curry, Farron) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Farron Danelle Curry on behalf of Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc.. (Curry, Farron) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE TO FILER: The Court is unable to process the 8 and 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice until such time as local counsel has entered an appearance in the case. Thank you. (GMR)(cc: PHV & filer via ad hoc NEF) (SP) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY W. Melvin Haas, III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5159363 (Curry, Farron) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles P. Roberts III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5159346 (Curry, Farron) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Noting Date Set/Reset re 1 Petition: Noting Date 1/19/2018. (TG)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 6 Stipulated Motion to extend noting date signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Stipulated MOTION to Extend the Noting Date for Petitioner's Petition for Preliminary Injunction Relief (Dkt. 1) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Dkt. 2), filed by Respondent AIM Aerospace Sumner, Inc.. Noting Date 12/28/2017, (Curry, Farron) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Ronald K. Hooks in Support of 1 Petition, filed by Ronald K Hooks.(Pomerantz, Anne) Modified on 12/22/2017 (GMR). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER to Show Cause re 1 Petition, filed by Ronald K Hooks.(Pomerantz, Anne) Modified on 12/22/2017 (GMR). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER Granting 1 Petition for Preliminary Injunction Relief, filed by Ronald K Hooks.(Pomerantz, Anne) Modified on 12/22/2017 (GMR). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of 1 Petition for Preliminary Injunctive Relief Under Section 10(j), filed by Ronald K Hooks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits [1-27])(Pomerantz, Anne) Modified on 12/22/2017 (GMR). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            PETITION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief Pursuant to Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act, as Amended (29 USC 160(j)), filed by Ronald K Hooks. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pomerantz, Anne) (Fee Waived) Modified on 12/22/2017 (GMR). Modified on 1/2/2018 (TG). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?