United States v. Bryan
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00424
District Judge John A. Mendez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2019 at 12:56 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guy Patrick Jennings +1 202 307 6648 +1 202 307 0054 guy.p.jennings@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Mark Linn Bryan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Linn Bryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Linn Bryan
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SERVICE BY MAIL: 28 Minute Order served on Mark Linn Bryan. (Michel, G.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Minute OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/2018: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal (ECF No. 27 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this action is DISMISSED in its entirety. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Michel, G.) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Service by Mail
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
      NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
        NOTICE of CLAIM of RIGHT of SUBROGATION by Mark Linn Bryan. (York, M) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
          DEFAULT for 24 Praecipe Undisputed Facts by Affidavit by Mark Linn Bryan (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Request
            PRAECIPE to Court Clerk by Mark Linn Bryan. (Fabillaran, J) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Withdrawal of motion
              WITHDRAWAL of 13 Motion for Entry of Default by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SERVICE BY MAIL: 22 Clerk's Entry of Default served on Mark Linn Bryan. (Donati, J)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                  CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Mark Linn Bryan* (Donati, J) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Service by Mail
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                      NOTICE by Mark Linn Bryan of return of court documents and return of United States' scheduling statement. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                        NOTICE of return of court document and joint scheduling statement by Mark Linn Bryan (Hunt, G) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Report
                          SCHEDULING REPORT by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                            NOTICE re Joint Scheduling Statement by Mark Linn Bryan (Hunt, G) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                              NOTICE of return of Court documents by Mark Linn Bryan. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                NOTICE of RETURN of COURT DOCUMENTS by Mark Linn Bryan (York, M) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None letter
                                  LETTER re dismissal from Mark Linn Bryan. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default
                                    REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mark Linn Bryan by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                      [WITHDRAWN] MOTION for ENTRY of DEFAULT by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                        NOTICE of non-response and default with stipulated judgments by Mark Linn Bryan (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                          NOTICE re return of erroneous documents by Mark Linn Bryan. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                            CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re 9 Summons Returned Executed, 7 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mark Linn Bryan served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. (Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                NOTICE of erroneous presentment, returned for cause by Mark Linn Bryan. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Civil New Case Documents for JAM
                                                  CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Order re Filing Requirements, # 3 VDRP) (Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Summons
                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mark Linn Bryan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Guy Patrick Jennings* *United States Department of Justice* *P.O. Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the SACRAMENTO Division. New Case Number 2:18-cv-00424 JAM DB. Old Case Number 1:18-cv-00238 DAD SAB, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2018.(Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Linn Bryan by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: # 1 SAB Sched Conf, # 2 Consent Form, # 3 VDRP) (Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Summons
                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mark Linn Bryan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Guy Patrick Jennings* *United States Department of Justice* *P.O. Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT to Reduce Tax Assessments to Judgment against Mark Linn Bryan by United States. Attorney Jennings, Guy Patrick added. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?