United States v. Weathers
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05189

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 6, 2021 at 9:15 PM DT (2.9 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Boris Bourget +1 202 307 2182 boris.bourget@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Coral Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cowlitz County, Defendant
No Logo Financial Assistance, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Weathers, Defendant
No Logo Marlene M. Bennett Revocable Living Trust, Defendant
No Logo Mountain Peak Management Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Netfunding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Precision Property Management Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Southwind Software Development Corporation, Defendant
No Logo T&K Weathers Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Weathers, Defendant
No Logo TKW Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Wapiti Ventures LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Appoint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Judgment by Court
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Sanctions
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Judgment - Default
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Motion Re-Noted
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None File Over-length Motions and Briefs
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Surreply
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Surreply
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Response (non motion)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Motion Re-Noted
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Motion Re-Noted
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Motion Re-Noted
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None RJB Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates(FORM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims Four and Five. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRAECIPE to attach document (Proposed Summons) re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Coral Management, Inc., # 2 Summons to Cowlitz County, # 3 Summons to Financial Assistance, # 4 Summons Kathy Weathers, # 5 Summons to Mountain Peak Management Corporation, # 6 Summons to Netfunding, Inc., # 7 Summons to Precision Property Management Corporation, # 8 Summons to Softwind Software and Development Corporation, # 9 Summons to T&K Weathers Limited Partnership, # 10 Summons to Thomas Weathers, # 11 Summons to TKW Limited Partnership, # 12 Summons to Wapiti Ventures LLC)(Bourget, Boris) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bourget, Boris) (Fee Waived) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?