(PS) El Bey v. Accredited Home Lenders Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-02237-KJM-CKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 7, 2019 at 11:18 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331(a)
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/25/2018 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed and this case closed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/14/18 ORDERING that The 4/30/18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 16 are VACATED. And Defendant Wells Fargo Bank shall serve the suggestion of death upon the record pursuant to FRCP 25(a)(1) within twenty-one days of this order and shall file a certificate of service with the court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/30/18 ORDERING that the hearing date of May 9, 2018 on Motion to dismiss is vacated and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice. F&R referred to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/09/17 GRANTING the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; Clerk to serve order setting status conference and send plaintiff 1 USM-285 form for each defendant, 1 summons, copy of complaint and order setting status conference. Plaintiff shall complete and submit service documents to the USM within 14 days and file a statement with the court regarding the submission of documents. USM is directed to serve process within 90 days. (Benson, A.)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?