United States v. Marrero
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:04-cr-00048
District Judge Jed S. Rakoff, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 14, 2019 at 5:31 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dennis Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Irving Cohen +1 212 964 2544 +1 212 732 1339 icohenlaw@msn.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Herbert Smith Freehillls New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Jay O'Donnell, Jr. +1 212 637 2490 +1 212 637 2527 John.ODonnell@hsf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office For The Southern District of Ne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Rebold +1 212 637 2512 jrebold@usa.doj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Caldwell Adams +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2433 andrew.adams@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Ken-Wei Chan +1 212 637 1072 andrew.chan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Vincent Harbach +1 914 993 1928 +1 914 682 3392 david.harbach@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drew Turner Johnson-Skinner +1 212 637 1587 +1 212 637 2527 drew.skinner@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Katherine Anne Lemire +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 0421 katherine.lemire@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Max Clement Nicholas +1 212 637 1565 max.nicholas@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Won S. Shin +1 212 637 2207 +1 212 637 2443 Won.Shin@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Tortorella +1 212 637 2606 +1 212 637 2937 vincent.tortorella@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 1159 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 1158 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 1131 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
        LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 1124 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 1116 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 1109 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 1085 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 1084 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                  LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 1082 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 1081 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                      LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 1080 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 1075 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                          LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 1073 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 1058 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 1056 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 1029 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 1028 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                    LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 1018 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 1017 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 1007 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                          LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 1006 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 1005 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 988 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 985 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM as to Dennis Lewis. On November 14, 2007, the Court sentenced defendant Dennis Lewis to fourteen months' imprisonment for conspiracy to distribute and possess with intent to distribute crack cocaine in violation of 21 U.S.C. §§ 821, 481 and 846, and for use and possession of a firearm in relation to a drug trafficking crime in violation of 18 U.S.C. § 924. On August 7, 2009, the Court found Lewis guilty of eight violations of the conditions of his supervised release and sentenced him to 42 months' imprisonment, five months above the advisory 30 to 37 month policy statement. On May 5, 2011, the Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit directed this Court to memorialize in writing its reasons (previously stated from the bench) for imposing its new (non-Guidelines) sentence. See United States v. Mitchell, 421 F. App'x 102, 106 (2d Cir. 2011). Accordingly, for these and other reasons well summarized in the Court of Appeals Summary Order dated May 5, 2011, the Court imposed a sentence of 42 months. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/27/2012)(jw) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 970 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 969 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 966 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 965 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 961 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 960 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 949 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 937 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 936 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 928 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 924 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal,,,. (nd)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Dennis Lewis, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Jason Mitchell, Nathaniel Slater re: 755 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 744 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 768 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 770 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 738 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, USCA Case Number 09-3491-cr(L), 09-3872-cr(con), 09-4807-cr(con), 09-5197-cr(con),,09-5083-cr(con). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgments and orders of the District Court is AFFIRMED as to Jason Mitchell, but Jeffrey Martinez's, Nelson Martinez's, Nathaniel Slater's and Dennis Lewis's cases are REMANDED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 1/12/2012. (nd) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 900 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 882 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 859 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 853 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (cb) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 833 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 761 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on 8/6/09 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ldi) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on August 6, 2009 at 10:50 am before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (eef) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to Dennis Lewis to US Court of Appeals re: 744 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (nd)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Dennis Lewis from 737 Amended Judgment. (NoA filed by CJA appointed attorney). (nd) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to (04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis. The Court hereby grants defendant's request for an additional thirty days beyond the August 21, 2009 deadline for filing a Notice of Appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(b)(4). The Notice of Appeal must be filed by September 21, 2009. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/14/09)(bw) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on 7/23/09 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ldi) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    AMENDED JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Dennis Lewis (For Revocation of Probation or Supervised Release) (17), Imprisonment for a total term of 42 months on each of violations 1 & 4 to run concurrent, 24 months on each of violations 2,3, 5, 6, 7 & 8 to run concurrent. Supervised release for a term of 18 Months. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: That the defendant's term of imprisonment be served at a facility in the New York City area to accommodate family visitations. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/7/09)(jw) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER as to (S23-04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis. Status Conference (V.O.S.R. Hearing) set for 8/6/2009 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (bw)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Revocation of Supervised Release - Interim Hearing as to (S23-04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis held on 7/27/2009. Violation of probation proceeding held. Adjourned to August 6, 2009 at 10:30am. (bw)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Revocation of Supervised Release - Interim Hearing as to (S23-04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis held on 7/23/2009. Violation of probation proceeding held. Deft Dennis Lewis, (#17), present with atty Irving Cohen, AUSA Marissa Mole, Probation Officer Miranda Hover present, and Court reporter present. A status conference has been set for July 27, 2009 at 2:00pm. Defendant detained. The deft continued detained. (bw)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on June 30, 2009 at 6:10 pm before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (eef) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on May 13, 2009 at 12:30 pm before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (eef) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to (04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis held on 6/15/2009. (bw)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER: As to Dennis Lewis. WHEREAS, a hearing has been set by this Court for June 23, 2009, to hear evidence concerning reported violations of the conditions of supervised release by the defendant, Dennis Lewis; AND WHEREAS, the Government has requested access to the case file maintained by the U.S. Probation Office for this District for the defendant, Dennis Lewis, so as to prepare for the hearing and to comply with the Government's obligations pursuant to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure; United States v. Giglio, 405 U.S. 763 (1972), and its progeny; Title 18, United States Code, Section 3500; and this Court's discovery order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the U.S. Probation Office for this District provide a copy of the complete case file maintained for the defendant, Dennis Lewis, to Assistant United States Attorney Michael D. Lockard. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/9/2009)(dnd) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Preliminary Revocation Hearing re: Supervised Release as to Dennis Lewis held on 5/13/2009, as to Dennis Lewis( Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/23/2009 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) Defendant present with atty Irving Cohen, Ausa Marissa Mole, Probation Officer Timothy Murphy and Court reporter Jennifer Thun. The deft entered a denial to all eight specifications.The Court scheduled an evidentiary hearing for June 23rd at 4:00 p.m. The Court denied the defts application for bail. The deft continued detained. (jw)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry on 'Disposition Sheet' for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton: Preliminary Revocation Hearing re: Supervised Release as to (04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis held on 5/12/2009. Date of Arrest: 5/12/09, vol. surrender. AUSA Michael Lockhart; Defense Counsel Irving Cohen, Esq. (CJA); P.O. Tiffany Thomas x0033; Proceeding - V.O.S.R.; Bail Disposition: Detention on consent w/o prejudice. Date for Violation Hearing: on Wednesday, 5/13/09 at noon in Judge Rakoff's courtroom. (bw)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        PROBATION FORM PETITION as to (04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis. On "Petition for Warrant with Attached Request for Court Action Direction Detailing Probable Cause" addressed to the Court from Tiffany S. Thomas, U.S. Probation Office, Approved by Timothy S. Murphy, Supervising U.S. Probation Office, dated 4/27/09. THE COURT ORDERS: The Issuance of a Warrant (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/30/09)(bw) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 699 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Payment of Fine from Dennis Lewis in the amount of $100.00. Date Received: 1/8/09. (mn)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Payment of Fine from Dennis Lewis in the amount of $100.00. Date Received: 9/19/08. (mn)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on 11/14/07 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (jbe) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on 11/14/07 @ 3:30PM before Judge Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (pr) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Judgment entered in money judgment book as #07,2238 as to Dennis Lewis in the amount of $ 200.00, re: 542 Judgment. (dt)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      FILED JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Dennis Lewis (17), Count(s) 1, All open counts are dismissed on the motion of the US; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1s, 2s, Imprisonment for a total term of Fourteen Months on both counts to run concurrently. Supervised release for a term of Five Years on each count. The Court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: The Court recommends that any State sentence should run concurrent with Federal Sentence. The defendant shall continue to cooperate with the government pursuant to the terms of cooperation agreement. Special Assessment of $200 which is due immediately. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/15/07)(jw) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Dennis Lewis (17) Count 1. (jw)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Order to Unseal Document as to Dennis Lewis. On November 14, 2007, the Court sentenced the above named defendant. The Court hereby ORDERS the Clerk of Court to unseal court document number 351. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/15/07)(jw); Refer to unsealed docs.#540,541, and plea proceeding held on 12/13/06. Modified on 11/16/2007 (Wong, Benny). (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff :Sentencing held on 11/14/2007 for Dennis Lewis (17) Count 1s,2s. (jw)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Dennis Lewis: Sentencing set for 2/28/2008 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to (S23-04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis. [*** NOTE: Previously filed under seal on 12/20/06; refer to Unsealing Order, doc.#539, filed on 11/15/07. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff : Plea entered by Dennis Lewis (17) Guilty as to Count 1s,2s. [*** NOTE: Previously filed under seal on 12/20/06; refer to Unsealing Order, doc.#539, filed on 11/15/07. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff :Arraignment as to (S23-04-Cr-48-) Dennis Lewis (17) Count 1s,2s held on 12/13/2006. Waiver of Indictment and Information filed. Deft Dennis Lewis (#17) present w/atty Irving Cohen, AUSA David Harbach and Court Reporter Ann Hairston. Deft plead guilty to both counts. PSI ordered. Sentencing set for 2/28/08 at 4:00 p.m. Deft continued detained. [*** NOTE: Previously filed under seal on 12/20/06; refer to Unsealing Order, doc.#539, filed on 11/15/07. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by (S23-04-Cr-48-17) Dennis Lewis. [*** NOTE: Previously filed under seal on 12/20/06; refer to Unsealing Order, doc.#539, filed on 11/15/07. ***] (bw) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        (S23) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Dennis Lewis (17) count(s) 1s, 2s. [*** NOTE: Previously filed under seal on 12/20/06; refer to Unsealing Order, doc.#539, filed on 11/15/07. ***] (bw) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Vincent Harbach appearing for USA. (Harbach, David) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Anthony Bowens, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor, to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Michael B. Mukasey, no longer assigned to the case. (jeh, ) Modified on 9/20/2006 (pr, ). (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Trey Boglin, Samuel Flemmings, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Dennis Lewis, Gregory Moore, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Angel Soto held on 6/30/04 @ 11:20 a.m. before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (jco, ) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Anthony Bowens, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor held on 6/30/06 @9:40a.m. before Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (mo, ) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor held on 6/16/2006 @ 10:00 a.m. before Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (lb, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor held on 6/6/2006 @ 10:20 a.m. before Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (lb, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor held on 6/6/2006 @ 10:45 a.m. before Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (lb, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor held on 6/6/2006 @ 10:00 a.m. before Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (lb, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff :Pretrial Conference as to Trey Boglin, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Dennis Lewis, Gregory Moore, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Angel Soto held on 6/30/2006, as to Trey Boglin, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Dennis Lewis, Gregory Moore, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Angel Soto Motions due by 7/21/2006. Jury Trial set for 11/20/2006 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey. Deft Boglin present with atty Macedonio. Motions if any to be filed by July 21. The Court scheduled a trial date for November 20 at 9:00am. Time until November 20 is excluded in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 USC 3161. Deft Trey Boglin, Tony Felder, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Dennis Lewis, Gregory Moore, Xavier Savilla and Denise Shepard, continued detained. Defts Samuel Flemmings, Crystal Shaver and Angel Soto continued released on bail. Deft Tony Felder made an application to have new counsel appointed. The Court granted the application and directed the gov't and atty John Burke to proceed to Magistrate Court for the appointment of new counsel.(jw, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff :Initial Appearance as to Trey Boglin, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Dennis Lewis, Gregory Moore, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Angel Soto held on 6/30/2006. (jw, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Lewis held on 5/10/06 before Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (tro, ) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER as to Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Denise Shepard, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Anthony Ward, Dion Windor Time excluded from 6/6/06 until 7/24/06.(by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 6/6/06)(pr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael B. Mukasey :Pretrial Conference as to Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Denise Shepard, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Anthony Ward, Dion Windor held on 6/6/2006. Defts pres w/atty; AUSA pres. Govt. to provide all discovey material 30 at least 30 days prior to trial date. Trial scheduled for 7/24/06 for first grouping of defts, 13 in total. Time is excluded from 6/6/06 thru 7/24/06 in the IOJ. A bail heaing is scheduled for deft. Raheem Richardson, for 6/16/06 @ 9:15am. (pr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER as to Dennis Lewis. Time excluded from 5/16/06 until 6/29/06. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael B. Mukasey: Pretrial Conference as to Dennis Lewis held on 4/26/2006. Deft (det) present with atty Irving Cohen, AUSA Vincent Tortorella present. PTC held, Defts motions to be filed by 6/6/2006, Gov't response by June 20, 2006. Deft reply by June 29, 2006. Time excluded from 5/16/2006 thru 6/29/2006, in the interest of Justice. Deft detained. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 20 as to Dennis Lewis: Appointment of Attorney Irving Cohen for Dennis Lewis.. (Signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 3/27/06) CJA office mailed original to the attorney and sent a copy to the file.(sao, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER as to Dennis Lewis Time excluded from 3/27/2006 until 6/6/2006. As to Dennis Lewis Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2006 before Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey. (Signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 3/27/2006)(jar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael B. Mukasey : Plea entered by Dennis Lewis (17) Count 1 Not Guilty. (jar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael B. Mukasey :Arraignment as to Dennis Lewis (17) Count 1 held on 3/27/2006. Deft (det) present with atty Irving Cohen, appointed 3/27/2006. AUSA John O'Donnel present. Deft arraigend and enters a plea of "not guilty". Time excluded from 3/27/2006 thru 6/6/2006. Next PTC 6/6/2006. Deft detained. (jar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael B. Mukasey :Initial Appearance as to Dennis Lewis held on 3/27/2006. (jar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Notice of Filing of Government's Proposed Trial Groups as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor (O'Donnell, John) (Entered: 03/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE John Jay O'Donnell, Jr appearing for USA. (O'Donnell, John) (Entered: 03/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor Time excluded from 3/10/06 until 6/6/06.(by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 3/10/06)(pr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James House, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2006 09:15 AM before Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey.. (by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 3/10/06)(pr, ) Modified on 4/6/2006 (pr, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James Jones, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor. All defendants who have not as yet filed motions will do so by 2/10/06. The government will respond by 2/24/06. Defendants may reply by 3/10/06. Motions due by 2/10/2006. Responses due by 2/24/2006. A conference is set for 3/10/06 at 9:15 a.m. in ctrm 21B. The government will serve by 3/24/06, a proposed grouping of defendants for trial, no such trial to include more than 10 defendants. The time until 3/10/06, is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. (Signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 1/4/06)(kw, ) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James Jones, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor re 168 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Nelson Martinez (20) Count 1., 151 MOTION to Compel Fed. R. Evid. 404(b) Notice., 152 FIRST MOTION to Suppress statements, sever, discovery.. AMENDED (Tortorella, Vincent) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Nelson Marrero, Andrew Alston, Sammie Artis, Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Donnell Jones, James Jones, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, George Verdejo, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Jamel Williams, Dion Windor re 151 MOTION to Compel Fed. R. Evid. 404(b) Notice., 152 FIRST MOTION to Suppress statements, sever, discovery.. Motion by Nelson Martinez (Tortorella, Vincent) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Notice of upcoming pre-trial conference as to Jonathan Bethune, Robert Billings, Trey Boglin, Michael Coleman, Tony Felder, Samuel Flemmings, Orande Forde, Sean Gilkes, Eric Glover, Karon Johnson, Roger Lee, Dennis Lewis, Alvin Martinez, Jeffrey Martinez, Nelson Martinez, Gregory Mathis, Shawn Mayzyck, Clayton Mills, Jason Mitchell, Josue Mejia, Gregory Moore, Jason Oatman, Pedro Rabell, Raheem Richardson, Jeremy Robinson, Sammy Santana, Shawn Saunders, Xavier Savilla, Crystal Shaver, Denise Shepard, Nathaniel Slater, Chris Smith, Kasiem Smith, Angel Soto, Anthony Ward, Berron West, Dion Windor (Lemire, Katherine) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Vincent Tortorella appearing for USA. (Tortorella, Vincent) (Entered: 10/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (S3) INDICTMENT FILED as to Andrew Alston (2) count(s) 1, Sammie Artis (3) count(s) 1, Jonathan Bethune (4) count(s) 1, Robert Billings (5) count(s) 1, Trey Boglin (6) count(s) 1, Michael Coleman (7) count(s) 1, Tony Felder (8) count(s) 1, Samuel Flemmings (9) count(s) 1, Orande Forde (10) count(s) 1, Sean Gilkes (11) count(s) 1, Eric Glover (12) count(s) 1, Karon Johnson (13) count(s) 1, Donnell Jones (14) count(s) 1, James Jones (15) count(s) 1, Roger Lee (16) count(s) 1, Dennis Lewis (17) count(s) 1, Alvin Martinez (18) count(s) 1, Jeffrey Martinez (19) count(s) 1, Nelson Martinez (20) count(s) 1, Gregory Mathis (21) count(s) 1, Shawn Mayzyck (22) count(s) 1, Clayton Mills (23) count(s) 1, Jason Mitchell (24) count(s) 1, Josue Mejia (25) count(s) 1, Gregory Moore (26) count(s) 1, Jason Oatman (27) count(s) 1, Pedro Rabell (28) count(s) 1, Raheem Richardson (29) count(s) 1, Jeremy Robinson (30) count(s) 1, Sammy Santana (31) count(s) 1, Shawn Saunders (32) count(s) 1, Xavier Savilla (33) count(s) 1, Crystal Shaver (34) count(s) 1, Denise Shepard (35) count(s) 1, Nathaniel Slater (36) count(s) 1, Chris Smith (37) count(s) 1, Kasiem Smith (38) count(s) 1, Angel Soto (39) count(s) 1, George Verdejo (40) count(s) 1, Anthony Ward (41) count(s) 1, Berron West (42) count(s) 1, Jamel Williams (43) count(s) 1, Dion Windor (44) count(s) 1. (Originally filed under seal. Refer to document #14. Judge Mukasey ordered unsealed on 3/7/05. Refer to unsealing order, document #15). (ph, ) . (Entered: 03/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?