Klein v. Musk et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-00298-CFC
District Judge Colm F. Connolly, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 10:42 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Kelly Ernst Bielli & Wallen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Morris Ernst +1 302 295 4905 +1 302 295 2873 rernst@oebwlegal.com
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Antonia Gracias"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Brad Buss"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Unknown Role, Cavium Networks
Unknown Role, Aecom Technology Corp
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Ehrenpreis, Ira Ehrenpreis, Ira, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"
Murdoch, James R. Murdoch, James R., Defendant
Officially listed as "James Murdoch"
Unknown Role, News Corp
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimbal Musk"
Unknown Role, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
No Logo Linda Johnson Rice, Defendant
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robyn Denholm"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Unknown Role, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Echelon Corp
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stephen Jurvetson"
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Draper Associates, LP
Unknown Role, Draper Timothy C
Unknown Role, Fisher John H N
Unknown Role, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Office Wilmington
Filed 2/11/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
118-cv-01669-CFC
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 SO ORDEREDCourt Filing
SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:19-cv-00298-CFC) (14 in 1:18-cv-01669-CFC) Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation and Stay of Proceedings filed by Stephen Jurvetson, Tesla, Inc., James Murdoch, Brad Buss, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonia Gracias, Robyn Denholm. The Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action shall be captioned In re Tesla, Inc.Shareholder Derivative Litigation, Case No. 18-cv-01669-CFC. All documents or pleadings filed in the Consolidated Derivative Action shall include the caption of the consolidated case, be served on all parties within such cases, and be filed only in the lead case, 18-cv-1669-CFC. Case stayed. See stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01669-CFC, 1:19-cv-00298-CFC(fms)
    LREF
    Blank  Remark
    ALL DOCUMENTS OR PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE, 18-cv-1669-CFC. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01669-CFC, 1:19-cv-00298-CFC(fms)
      LREF
      Blank  Create Case Association
      Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:18-cv-01669-CFC. (fms)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 stipulation
        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: Consolidation and Stay of Proceedings by Brad Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonia Gracias, Stephen Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Disclosure Statement
          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Stachel on behalf of Brad Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonia Gracias, Stephen Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc. (Stachel, Matthew)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Notice of appearance
              NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alan Mason on behalf of Brad Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonia Gracias, Stephen Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, Tesla, Inc. (Mason, Daniel)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Notice of appearance
                NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina M. Hendershot on behalf of Elon Musk (Hendershot, Sabrina)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                    LREF
                    Blank  No Summons Issued
                    No Summons Issued. (ddp)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 Complaint
                        Verified Shareholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Brad Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonia Gracias, Stephen Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Linda Johnson Rice, and Tesla, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2567675.) - filed by Melvyn Klein. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C, # (2) Verification, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 382 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?