Paris, Keion v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Supreme Court of the State of New York, Erie County, Case No. 808299/2018

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paris, Keion, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Grove Roofing ROC, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Grove Roofing Services, Inc., Defendant
Silevo, Inc. Silevo, Inc., Defendant
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
No Logo SolarCity Electrical New York Corporation, Defendant
SolarCity Engineering, Inc. SolarCity Engineering, Inc., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weaver Metal & Roofing, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019
STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018
    STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018
      RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018
        ANSWER (AMENDED)
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018
          ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
            Blank 7 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018
            AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
              Blank 6 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018
              AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                Blank 5 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018
                AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018
                  AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018
                    AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018
                      EXHIBIT(S)
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018
                        SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 31 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?