Shields v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00012
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 15, 2019 at 3:51 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ricardo Shields, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bostwick & Peterson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Stephen Bostwick +1 415 421 8300 +1 415 421 8301 james@bostwickfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Judith Ann Pavey jpavey@starnlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Harry Yee +5412 541 541 2850 harry.yee@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on May 4, 2015. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by United States of America - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/4/2015. This action is dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. There are no remaining claims or parties. (emt, ) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      EO: The parties have informed the Court that Plaintiff has received the settlement funds from Defendant. As such, the parties are ORDERED to submit a Stipulation for Dismissal no later than 5/29/2015. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/29/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        EP: Status Conference Re: Settlement held. The Court requests Harry Yee to contact the pertinent U.S. Treasury Representative to emphasize the urgency in expeditiously processing and transferring the settlement funds to the client's trust account. Nothing further is scheduled at this time. (C7, No Record, 10:30-10:47 A.M.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/24/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          EO: Pursuant to Counsel Judy Pavey's request, the Court SETS a Status Conference re: Settlement for 4/24/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Ms. Pavey to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/22/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            EO: Pursuant to Counsel Harry Yee's representation that he has apprised Plaintiff's counsel of the status of settlement, thus negating the need for a Status Conference, the 85 Further Status Conference previously set for 3/31/2015 is hereby VACATED. Mr. Yee to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/26/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              EO: Pursuant to Counsel Harry Yee's request, the Further Status Conference previously set for 3/27/2015 is CONTINUED to 3/31/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Mr. Yee to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                EP: Further Status Conference held. The Court is concerned that an agreement in principle, which was reached several months ago, has not had all of the necessary approvals within the Department of Justice during the period of time that has elapsed thus far. The Court is hereby requesting that the Request for Settlement Funds be expedited. A Further Status Conference is set for March 27, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (C7, No Record, 10:00-10:15 A.M.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  EO: Pursuant to Counsel James Bostwick's request, a Further Status Conference is set for 3/12/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the NEF re 83 Costs Taxed has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on January 27, 2015. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      (Note: This a "text only" entry; no pdf attached to this docket entry): Costs Taxed in amount of $ 201,813.17 against Defendants re 77 (emt, ) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (FURTH STATUS CONF) held on 1/22/15 - before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Transcriber Cynthia Fazio, Telephone number 808.541.2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Remote availability of electronic transcripts is regulated by FRCP 5.2(a),FRCrP 49.1(a) and FRBP 9037(a) Redaction Request due 2/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2015. (14 pp.) (cf@hid.uscourts.gov) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          EP: Further Status Conference held on 1/22/2015. Memorialized settlement terms provided to the Court by Mediator Charles Crumpton and made a part of the record. (C7F, 2:30-3:00PM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2015: # 1 Stipulation for Compromise Settlement [SEALED]) (bbb, ). (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            EO: Per Charles Crumpton's request, the Further Status Conference previously set for 1/21/15 at 03:00 PM is RESCHEDULED to 1/22/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Mr. Crumpton to notify the parties.(Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              EP: Further Status Conference was held on 1/21/2015. The Further Status Conference is CONTINUED to 1/21/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (In chambers, no record, 11:30-11:45AM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                EP: Further Status Conference RE: Settlement held. A further Status Conference is scheduled for 1/21/2015 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (In Chambers, No Record, 3:00-3:30 PM) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  (BILL OF COSTS) REQUEST Plaintiff's Submission of Litigation Costs by Ricardo Shields. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Judith Ann Pavey, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Pavey, Judith) Modified on 1/8/2015 to reflect this filing as a "Bill of Costs" (emt, ). (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    EP: Further Status Conference RE: Settlement held. The parties are ordered to further confer with each other. A Further Status Conference is set for 1/9/2015 at 3:30 PM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.(C7, No Record, 9:59-10:07 AM) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      EP: Further Status Conference Re: Settlement held. A Further Status Conference is set for January 5, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.(C8, No Record, 10:00-10:20 AM) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        EP: Status Conference held.Defendant United States of America shall provide a status update to the Court about the settlement of this case on 12/22/2014.A Further Status Conference Re Settlement is set for 12/22/2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren. (C7 no record 9:30-9:48am.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          EO: The Status Conference set for 12/5/2014 is CONTINUED to 12/8/2014 at 9:30AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            EO: As requested in Judith Pavey's letter dated December 1, 2014, a Status Conference is set for 12/5/2014 at 10:00AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              EP: Status Conference Re Settlement held on 10/10/2014. (In Chambers, No Record, 9:00-9:13AM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                EP: Status Conference Re Settlement held. A Further Status Conference Re Settlement is set for 10/10/2014 at 9:00AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. At the time of this Conference, the Court will contact James S. Bostwick by phone at the phone number previously provided to the Court.(C8 no record 9:36-9:45am.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (SEALED) TRANSCRIPT OF SETTLEMENT ON THE RECORD held on August 18, 2014, - before Judge Kurren. (Cahill, Jessica) Modified on 9/15/2014 (emt, ). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO RELEASE SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS HELD AUGUST 18, 2014 re 67 - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Correspondence re: MOTION/Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren from Judith Ann Pavey, Esq., dated September 10, 2014 Re: Request to release sealed transcript of proceedings held on August 18, 2014. (emt, ) Modified on 9/11/2014 - updating to motion (bbb). (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Status Conference set for 10/6/2014 is CONTINUED to 10/9/2014 at 9:30AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Counsel may appear at this Conference by phone by notifying Judge Kurren's Courtroom Manager (808-541-1306) of their phone number, prior to the Conference. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          EP: EP: Settlement on the Record held. Settlement, pending government approvals, entered into the record. Terms stated. Trial date and related deadlines are VACATED. A Status Conference is set for 10/6/14 at 1:30pm. The Transcript of this proceeding shall be SEALED.(C8F, 10:05-10:19AM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            EP: Settlement on the Record held. Settlement, pending government approvals, entered into the record. Terms stated. Trial date and related deadlines are VACATED. A Status Conference is set for 10/6/14 at 1:30pm. (C8F, 10:05-10:19AM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              EO: At the request of Harry Yee, a Settlement on the record is set for 8/18/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Harry Yee to notify counsel. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                EP: Further Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. Settlement negotiations ongoing. (Chambers no record 2:00-3:35pm.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Amended Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition by VTC-Jonathan Martin, M.D. (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition by VTC-Jonathan Martin, M.D. (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Amended Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition John Mallon, M.D. (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition Upon Oral Examination John Mallon, M.D. (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          EO: By the request of Mediator on 07/07/2014, the Further Settlement Conference set for 08/08/2014 IS CONTINUED TO 08/14/2014 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Mr. Charles W. Crumpton to notify parties. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            THIRD AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 6/30/2014. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              EP: Status Conference Re Dates and Deadlines held. All prior dates and deadlines are VACATED; new dates given. Court to prepare scheduling order. Discovery due by 9/5/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2014 09:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 11/4/2014 before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Settlement Conference set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (C8 no record 9:30-9:43am.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                EO: A Status Conference is set for 6/27/2014 at 9:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2014 is CONTINUED to 7/25/2014 at 10:00AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Final Pretrial Conference Statements are due 7/18/2014. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America [RE: DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT DESIGNATION] (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America [Re: Defendant United States of America's Expert Witness Designation] (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        EP: Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. Further Settlement Conference is on call. (Chambers no record 2:00-2:35pm.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response to USA's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Certificate of Service Defendant United States of America's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant United States of America (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Settlement Conference set for 5/22/2014 is CONTINUED to 5/29/2014 at 2:00PM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are due 5/22/2014. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Defendant United States of America's Response to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant United States of America (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Plaintiff's First Supplemental Response to Defendant USA's First Request for Production of Documents (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Plaintiff's First Supplemental Response to Defendant USA's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/7/2014. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant USA (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Plaintiff's Response to Defendant USA's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Plaintiff's Response to Defendant USA"s First Request for Production of Documents (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition by Videoconference Troy S. Koch, M.D. (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of William Meek, RN (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re: Defendant United States of America's Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination of R.Shields) (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (re: Defendant United States of America's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant United States of America) (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      EP: Status Conference held. Deadline for Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures is CONTINUED to 4/30/14. Deadline for Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures is CONTINUED to 5/30/14. (In Chambers, no record 3:35-3:50PM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        EO: A Status Conference is set for 3/13/2014 at 3:30PM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Notice of Taking Videotaped Depositions Upon Oral Examination Robert P. Bejnarowicz, D.O. and Robert C. Pedersen, M.D. (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            EO: Per Harry Yee's request, the Status Conference set for 2/28/2014 is VACATED. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the docket number 30 Certificate of Service filed by United States of America is not signed. The filing party may resubmit the entry. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant United States of America (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    EO: A Status Conference is set for 2/28/2014 at 9:30AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America RE: Defendant United States of America's First Request for Production of Documents and First Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America RE: Defendant United States of America's Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant United States of America (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant United States of America (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 11/26/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              EP: Status Conference Re Dates and Deadlines held. All prior dates and deadlines are VACATED; new dates given, as shown below. Court to prepare scheduling order. Discovery due by 6/27/2014. Motions due by 3/27/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2014 09:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 8/26/2014 before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Settlement Conference set for 5/22/2014 10:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (C6 no record 9:28-9:35am.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricardo Shields Notice of Taking 30(b)(6) Depositions Upon Oral Examination-Designees of Tripler Army Medical Center (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  EO: A Status Conference is set for 11/14/2013 at 9:30AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 11/4/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      EO: In light of the 19 First Stipulation and Order to Amend theRule 16 Scheduling Order Filed on April 15, 2013, to Extend the Deadline for Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Reports, new dates and deadlines given, as shown below. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. [Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2014 09:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 5/20/2014 before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2014 10:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.](Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        FIRST STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER FILED ON APRIL 15, 2013, TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES AND REPORTS - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 10/31/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Supplemental Response to Pl's First Request for Production of Documents (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST Certificate of Service re Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant USA by Ricardo Shields. (Pavey, Judith) Modified on 4/17/2013 (emt, ). (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/15/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference was held. New dates and deadlines are given below. Court to prepare scheduling order. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 5/20/2014 before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2014 09:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2014 10:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Motions due by 12/18/2013. Discovery due by 3/21/2014. (C7 no record 9;33-9:35 a.m.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant United States of America's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Yee, Harry) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff; Certificate of Service. (Pavey, Judith) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2013 @ 9:00 AM is moved to 9:30 AM the same day before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant United States of America's Answer to Complaint; Certificate of Service by United States of America.(Yee, Harry) Modified on 3/18/2013 to add linkage to 1 Complaint (emt, ). (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested to Defendant United States of America - filed by Ricardo Shields. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Shields. United States of America served on 1/22/2013. United Statese Attorney General served by certified mail on 1/11/2013; RRR 1/22/2013. [proof of mailing not included] (emt, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              (REDACTED) COMPLAINT against United States of America - filed by Ricardo Shields.(emt, ) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the 1 Complaint filed by Ricardo Shields references the minor child's name. The filing party may refer to LR100.11.1. Personal Identifiers, LR100.11.2. Redaction/Reference List and LR100.11.3. Responsibility of Counsel. If the filing party deems it necessary, a redacted version of the Complaint may be filed. Upon the filing of any such redaction, the Clerks Office will restrict viewing to the original Complaint filed on January 10, 2013. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Shields as to Tripler Army Medical Center served on 1/16/2013 through Romeo Ipsomia. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Shields. United States of America served (U.S. Attorneys Office) served on 1/15/2013, answer due 3/18/2013. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to United States of America. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number HI006592 re 1 Complaint. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 4/15/2013 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/10/13. (Attachments: # 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?