Manning v. King County DAJD Policy
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01568
District Judge John C. Coughenour, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2020 at 12:47 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Samuel D. Manning, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel D. Manning
v.
No Logo Captain Yuri, Defendant
No Logo King County DAJD Policy, Defendant
No Logo Officer M. Williams, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Judgment by Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None order on report and recommendation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Declaration (non motion)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order Directing Service
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order Directing Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Order on IFP and Payments re In Custody Prisoners
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                  LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCourt Filing
                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Samuel D. Manning. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, # 2 Prison Trust Account)(ST) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?