(PS)Lewis v. Duffy
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00934-TLN-EFB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 16, 2019 at 12:28 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/9/2018 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed and the Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/9/2018 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING 1 Complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Fabillaran, J)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?