ALVAREZ et al v. TRUMP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-00404

Tags
Last Updated April 22, 2019 at 6:41 PM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FRONTERA AUDUBON SOCIETY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Kirkpatrick +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
Space Allison Marcy Zieve +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 azieve@citizen.org
No Logo LEONEL ROMEO ALVAREZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Kirkpatrick +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
Space Allison Marcy Zieve +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 azieve@citizen.org
No Logo NAYDA ALVAREZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Kirkpatrick +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
Space Allison Marcy Zieve +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 azieve@citizen.org
No Logo YVETTE GAYTAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Kirkpatrick +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
Space Allison Marcy Zieve +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 azieve@citizen.org
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/15/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Amicus Brief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Intervene
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Standing Order
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                            LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FRONTERA AUDUBON SOCIETY (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Marcy Zieve on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zieve, Allison)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5952154) filed by FRONTERA AUDUBON SOCIETY, NAYDA ALVAREZ, YVETTE GAYTAN, LEONEL ROMEO ALVAREZ. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons to Donald Trump, # (3) Summons to Patrick Shanahan, # (4) Summons to Attorney General, # (5) Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Kirkpatrick, Michael)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?