United States v. Bryan
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00238
Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2019 at 1:00 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guy Patrick Jennings +1 202 307 6648 +1 202 307 0054 guy.p.jennings@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Mark Linn Bryan, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Minute OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the transfer of this case to the Sacramento Division, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone is taken off calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/2018. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the SACRAMENTO Division. New Case Number 2:18-cv-00424 JAM DB. Old Case Number 1:18-cv-00238 DAD SAB, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2018. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Linn Bryan by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
        CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: # 1 SAB Sched Conf, # 2 Consent Form, # 3 VDRP) (Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Summons
          SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mark Linn Bryan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Guy Patrick Jennings* *United States Department of Justice* *P.O. Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Complaint
            COMPLAINT to Reduce Tax Assessments to Judgment against Mark Linn Bryan by United States. Attorney Jennings, Guy Patrick added. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jennings, Guy) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 7 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?