Ventro Corp IPO v. Ventro Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-03450
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 3:25 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Abraham Kassin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brook H. Byers, Defendant
No Logo David P. Perry, Defendant
No Logo Jerrold B. Harris, Defendant
No Logo John A. Pritzker, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan D. Callaghan, Defendant
No Logo L. John Wilkerson, Defendant
No Logo Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Fetner +1 203 752 5012 +1 203 752 5001 hfetner@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Bradbury +1 202 879 5000
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo S. Joshua Lewis, Defendant
No Logo Ventro Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Albstein, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull and Lifshitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter D.. Bull +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 pdb@nyclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lifshitz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua M. Lifshitz +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 jml@jlclasslaw.com
No Logo Pond Equities, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Deborah Belcore, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Saswata Basu, Intervenor Plaintiff
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367.(sac, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene.. Document filed by Saswata Basu, Deborah Belcore. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195.(sac, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 4974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Deborah Belcore, Saswata Basu. (sac, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by Morgan Stanley to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Steven G. Bradbury from the Firm: Kirkland & Ellis); jury demand. (moc) (Entered: 11/22/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:11 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts David P. Perry, Brook H. Byers, Jonathan D. Callaghan, Jerrold B. Harris, S. Joshua Lewis, John A. Pritzker and L. John Wilkerson. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to BancBoston Robertson by Robertson Stephens, Inc. on 6/24/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Ventro Corporation by Jerry Natoli, CEO, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Abraham Kassin RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 19, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Abraham Kassin amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/13/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          OMNIBUS ORDER, granting [9-2] motion for an order appointing class member Abraham Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff, granting [9-3] motion for an order approving lead plaintiff's selection of Sirota & Sirota, LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP as lead counsel. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE by Ventro Corporation, David P. Perry, Brook H. Byers, Jonathan D. Callaghan, Jerrold B. Harris, S. Joshua Lewis, John A. Pritzker, L. John Wilkerson to [9-2] motion for an order appointing class member Abraham Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff, [9-3] motion for an order approving lead plaintiff's selection of Sirota & Sirota, LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP as lead counsel. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley. (kkc) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER,... that all cases involving Ventro Corporation in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-03808 and 1:01-cv-05824) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 3450. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 3450,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03450 Document No. 15. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-03808; 1:01-cv-05824] (dcap) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 02/26/2002 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MEMO-ENDORSEMENT on Admission to practice Pro Hac Vice; granting the admission of Steven Gradbury, Andrew Clubok, Brant Bishop, and Elizabeth Deeley pro hac vice on behalf of Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co. . ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for defts Ventro Corp., David P. Perry, Brook H. Byers, Jonathan D. Callaghan, Jerrold B. Harris, S. Joshua Lewis, John A. Pritzker and L. John Wilkerson to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 60 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones ) (sac) (Entered: 07/02/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Abraham Kassin in support of [9-1] motion for an order consolidating the actions 01 civ. 3450 and 01 civ. 3808 for all purposes, [9-2] motion for an order appointing class member Abraham Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff, [9-3] motion for an order approving lead plaintiff's selection of Sirota & Sirota, LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP as lead counsel. (kw) Modified on 11/09/2001 (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Howard B. Sirota by Abraham Kassin in support of [9-1] motion for an order consolidating the actions 01 civ. 3450 and 01 civ. 3808 for all purposes, [9-2] motion for an order appointing class member Abraham Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff, and [9-3] motion for an order approving lead plaintiff's selection of Sirota & Sirota, LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP as lead counsel. (kw) Modified on 11/09/2001 (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Abraham Kassin, for an order consolidating the actions 01 civ. 3450 and 01 civ. 3808 for all purposes ; for an order appointing class member Abraham Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff ; for an order approving lead plaintiff's selection of Sirota & Sirota, LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP as lead counsel . Oral argument requested. No return date. (kw) Modified on 11/09/2001 (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C/mail as to L. John Wilkerson by Karolyne McAteer on 6/6/01. Answer due on 6/26/01 for L. John Wilkerson . (cd) (Entered: 06/26/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Morgan Stanley for Howard Fetner to appear pro hac vice . Return date not indicated. Attached is Affidavit in support of Howard Fetner. (djc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/06/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons & complaint as to David P. Perry by mail on 5/12/01 . Answer due on 6/1/01 for David P. Perry . (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/06/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Case Management and Request for adjournment of case mangement conference. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/1/01 at 5:34 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley. (kkc) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; defts Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Incorporated's and BancBoston Robertson Stephens, Inc.'s time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 60 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones ) (sac) (Entered: 06/01/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to Morgan Stanley by Kevin McCarthy on 4/26/01. Answer due on 5/16/01 for Morgan Stanley . (cd) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (jco)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 404137. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?