Unknown Case Title
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00489
Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 3:17 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary Vannatta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 733 Bishop Street, Ste., 1520

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles J. Ferrera +5995 599 599 5220 chuckferrera@lava.net
v.
No Logo Aprn-Rx Audrey Taleff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo DOES 1-100, Defendant
No Logo M.D. David R. Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo M.D. Jeffrey Ching, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo M.D. Joseph Turban, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo M.D. Robert Bonham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo P.A. Marc E. Patrick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Dismissal; Certificate of Service. ~ Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A) ~ by plaintiff Gary Vannatta. (afc) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2010 is vacated. Notice of Dismissal will be filed today per Charles J. Ferrera. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/17/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2010 is CONTINUED to 9:00AM on 10/1/2010 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Scheduling Conference Statements are due 9/24/2010. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/07/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        TRANSMITTAL of Certified Copies of the entire record of Civil No. 10-1-1407, Gary Vannatta vs. Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center, et al. from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, pursuant to Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action. (Attachments: # 1 Computerized Index - Title of Documents, # 2 Complaint; Summons, # 3 Return and Acknowledgment of Service - Joseph Turban, # 4 Return and Acknowledgment of Service - Audrey Taleff, APRN-Rx, # 5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service - Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center, # 6 Return and Acknowledgment of Service - Jeffrey Ching, MD, # 7 Return and Acknowledgment of Service - David R. Jones, MD, # 8 Return and Acknowledgment of Service - Robert Bonham, MD, # 9 Return and Acknowledgment of Service - Marc e. Patrick, PA, # 10 Notice of filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action) (ecs, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form: Election Form to Consent)(ecs, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 9/20/2010 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/24/10. (ecs, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2010: # 1 Memorandum Corporate Disclosure Statements) (ecs, ). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION by All Defendants from First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number Civil No. 10-1-1407-06 KKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certification of Florence T. Nakakuni, # 3 Certificate of Service)(ecs, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?