Giudice v. Community Care Rigby, LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 4:13-cv-00130
District Judge B. Lynn Winmill, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge B. Lynn Winmill
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 3:07 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Vincent Giudice, Plaintiff

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kira Dale Pfisterer +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 kdp@hepworthlaw.com

Represented by hepworthholzer.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John W Kluksdal +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 jkluksdal@hepworthholzer.com
v.
No Logo Community Care Rigby, LLC, Defendant

Represented by HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS AND HAWLEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julian E Gabiola +1 208 233 2001 +1 208 232 0150 jgabiola@hawleytroxell.com

Represented by Parsons Behle & Latimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley J Williams +1 208 522 6700 BWilliams@parsonsbehle.com
No Logo Larry Curtis, Defendant

Represented by HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS AND HAWLEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julian E Gabiola +1 208 233 2001 +1 208 232 0150 jgabiola@hawleytroxell.com

Represented by Parsons Behle & Latimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley J Williams +1 208 522 6700 BWilliams@parsonsbehle.com
No Logo Rebekah Bird, Defendant

Represented by HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS AND HAWLEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julian E Gabiola +1 208 233 2001 +1 208 232 0150 jgabiola@hawleytroxell.com

Represented by Parsons Behle & Latimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley J Williams +1 208 522 6700 BWilliams@parsonsbehle.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Timeline
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court, being duly apprised of the Stipulation 15 entered between plaintiff and defendants for dismissal of the above-captioned matter, and the Court finding good cause therein; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Rebekah Bird, Community Care Rigby, LLC, Larry Curtis. (Gabiola, Julian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE DEADLINES AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery cut-off and expert disclosure deadlines as set forth in Paragraphs 4, 5 and 6 of the Case Management Order (Order) entered by this Court on 5/30/2013, are hereby extended as follows: Plaintiffs' expert witness disclosure shall be due 2/19/2014. Defendants' expert witness disclosure shall be due 30 days from Plaintiffs' expert witness disclosure, or 3/21/2014. All rebuttal expert witness disclosures shall be due 4/4/2014. The deadline to complete discovery shall be 5/30/2014. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION to Extend Expert Witness Disclosures Deadlines and Discovery Cut-Off by Rebekah Bird, Community Care Rigby, LLC, Larry Curtis. (Gabiola, Julian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (st)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Contact ADR Coordinator by 8/30/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2013. Completion of Discovery due by 3/14/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2014. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Rebekah Bird, Community Care Rigby, LLC, Larry Curtis. (Williams, Bradley)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/30/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(jlg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Community Care Rigby, LLC. (Williams, Bradley)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by Rebekah Bird, Community Care Rigby, LLC, Larry Curtis.(Williams, Bradley)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Rebekah Bird, Community Care Rigby, LLC, Larry Curtis, Vincent Giudice re 6 Notice of Appearance, 1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/13/2013. (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Bradley)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 4 Summons Returned Executed, by Rebekah Bird, Community Care Rigby, LLC, Larry Curtis. (Williams, Bradley)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Community Care Rigby, LLC, Rebekah Bird, Larry Curtis. Community Care Rigby, LLC served on 4/3/2013, answer due 4/24/2013; Rebekah Bird served on 4/3/2013, answer due 4/24/2013; Larry Curtis served on 4/3/2013, answer due 4/24/2013. (Williams, Bradley)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Rebekah Bird, Community Care Rigby, LLC, Larry Curtis. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTION Complant and Demand for Jury Trial by Vincent Giudice. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kluksdal, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
The Clerk of Court has sealed the Complaint 1 for referencing full name of minor child. The filing party will resubmit a redacted document for the public docket as well as new Summons and Civil Cover Sheet. (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0976-996142.), filed by Vincent Giudice. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?