Fernie v. HedgePort Associates, LLC
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-mc-00038
District Judge Lorna G. Schofield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 1:38 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rebecca J Fernie, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S DeVincenzo +1 212 612 3285 +1 212 612 3297 michael.devincenzo@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo HedgePort Associates, LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Prusak Chianese +1 212 839 6062 cchianese@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chung +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 nchung@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Michael Egleson +1 212 872 1039 +1 212 872 1002 cegleson@sidley.com
Citation Section M 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re U.S.C. § action in foreign cou
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Motion for Discovery: ORDERED that, in light of the circumstances described above, and the parties' arguments in their court filings and at the above hearing, the Petition is denied without prejudice to renewal when the foreign action is filed. The Court expressly does not reach the other issues raised in opposition to the Petition, including whether Respondent is "found in" the Southern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 1 and close the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/5/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 3/1/2018. (jcs)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DECLARATION of Garth Philippe in Support re: 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253). Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DECLARATION of Lana Milojevic in Support re: 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253). Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253) . Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Salvatore DeVincenzo on behalf of Rebecca J Fernie. (DeVincenzo, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              DECLARATION of Andrew Springer, in Opposition re: 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253). Document filed by HedgePort Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Egleson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253) . Document filed by HedgePort Associates, LLC. (Egleson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina Prusak Chianese on behalf of HedgePort Associates, LLC. (Chianese, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Egleson on behalf of HedgePort Associates, LLC. (Egleson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HedgePort Associates, LLC.(Chung, Nancy) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Chung on behalf of HedgePort Associates, LLC. (Chung, Nancy) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 12 Letter, filed by Rebecca J Fernie. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The deadline to file a memorandum in response is extended from February 15, 2018, to February 22, 2018, nunc pro tunc. The conference, currently scheduled for February 22, 2018, at 11:30 A.M. is adjourned to March 1, 2018, at 10:30 A.M. (Responses due by 2/22/2018. Status Conference set for 3/1/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/16/2018) (ras) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Vincent Filardo, Jr. dated February 15, 2018 re: Hedgeport seeking a one week extension to review the Petition and file a responseif HedgePort determined it appropriate to do so.. Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie.(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Endorsed Letter to Honorable Lorena G. Schofield granting application served on Hedgeport Associates, LLC on February 9, 2018. Service was accepted by Kendra Ratliff, Office Manager. Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Endorsed Letter to Honorable Lorena G. Schofield granting application served on Hedgeport Associates, LLC on February 9, 2018. Service was accepted by Chris Blakeman. Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 8 Letter filed by Rebecca J Fernie. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Respondent shall file a memorandum in response by February 15, 2018. The memorandum shall not exceed 20 pages. A conference will be held on February 22, 2018, at 11:30 A.M. ( Responses due by 2/15/2018), ( Status Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/8/2018) (kgo) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Vincent Filardo, Jr. dated February 7, 2018 re: Fernie v. HedgePort Associates, LLC. Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie.(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Case Designated ECF. (wb)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (wb)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for an Order Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 compelling discovery served on Hedgeport Associates, LLC on February 1, 2018. Service was accepted by Grant "Doe" (last name refused) Comptroller. Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for an Order Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 compelling discovery served on Hedgeport Associates, LLC on February 1, 2018. Service was accepted by Jennifer Mumford of First Corporate Solutions, inc.. Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DECLARATION of Garth Philippe in Support re: 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253). Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                DECLARATION of Lana Milojevic in Support re: 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253). Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-MC-473. Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie.(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING. (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14643253)Document filed by Rebecca J Fernie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Space Space

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?