Perrot v. Kelly
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-10147
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 13, 2021 at 3:35 PM DT (4.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Perrot, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Loevy & Loevy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Edwards Art +1 312 243 5900 steve@loevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony Balkissoon +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 tony@loevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Gayle M Horn +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 gayle@loevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Debra Loevy-Reyes +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 debra@loevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Loevy-Reyes +1 312 243 5900 mark@loevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tara Elizabeth Thompson +1 312 243 5900 tara@loevy.com
v.
No Logo Andrew Canevari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin B. Coyle +1 413 787 1524 +1 413 787 1703 attycoyle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Captain John Brown, Defendant
No Logo Charles Arpin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reardon, Joyce & Akerson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin M. Joyce +1 508 754 7285 +1 508 754 7220 ajoyce@rja-law.com
No Logo Cheryl Clapprood, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Saint Laurent +1 413 886 5198 jsaintlaurent@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Chief Ernest Stelzer, Defendant
No Logo City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward M. Pikula +1 413 531 5004 +1 413 294 1079 attyemp@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Saint Laurent +1 413 886 5198 jsaintlaurent@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo David Louden, Defendant
No Logo Frances Bloom, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Susanne G. Reardon +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 susanne.reardon@state.ma.us
No Logo John Scanlon, Defendant
No Logo Marianne Popko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Saint Laurent +1 413 886 5198 jsaintlaurent@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Paul Glantz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin B. Coyle +1 413 787 1524 +1 413 787 1703 attycoyle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Paul Lance, Defendant
No Logo Richard Kane, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison, Mahoney LLP-CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carole Sakowski Lynch +1 413 737 4373 +1 413 739 3125 clynch@morrisonmahoney.com
No Logo Ronald St. Germain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin B. Coyle +1 413 787 1524 +1 413 787 1703 attycoyle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Thomas Jarvis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin B. Coyle +1 413 787 1524 +1 413 787 1703 attycoyle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Thomas Kennedy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by keyesanddonnellan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen E. Sheehan +1 413 781 6540 +1 413 739 3502 ksheehan@keyesanddonnellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa C. deSousa +1 413 886 5206 +1 413 787 6173 ldsousa@springfieldcityhall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Saint Laurent +1 413 886 5198 jsaintlaurent@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Unknown Agents of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Annapurna Balakrishna +1 617 748 3111 annapurna.balakrishna@usdoj.gov
No Logo Unknown Officers of the Springfield Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Wayne Oakes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Annapurna Balakrishna +1 617 748 3111 annapurna.balakrishna@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
No Logo William Eubanks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Annapurna Balakrishna +1 617 748 3111 annapurna.balakrishna@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas Kelly, Movant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Change Venue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None order on motion to strike
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Clerk's Notes for Motion Hearing held in the Western Division (Springfield) before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Court addresses pending motions and rules accordingly: 1) Motion for Change of Venue 96 DENIED. Discovery has been and should continue to go forward as convenient in Springfield; 2) Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint 91 ALLOWED and extended until 2/1/2019. Plaintiff shall submit within 4 days the relevant state court documents regarding the October 2016 exoneration and/or post conviction release; 3) Plaintiff's Corrected Motion to Appoint a Special Representative for Defendant Thomas Kelly 79 81 DENIED; 4) Defendant's Motion to Strike Returns of Service for Deceased Springfield Police Officers 61 DENIED. Plaintiff ALLOWED 90 days to effectuate proper service as to Defendant Kelly only; 5) Individual FBI Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 71 DENIED without prejudice to renewal once the first amended complaint is filed. Court provides cautionary guidance regarding Rule 11 and possible ramifications; and, 6) Individual FBI Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery 89 ALLOWED in part, there being no need for further discovery, except to permit third party duces tecum subpoenas for documents. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran atalice.moran@verizon.net.) (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 102 Defendants' Motion for Leave of Court to File a Reply to Their Motion to Dismiss, no opposition having been filed. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 101 Defendants' Motion for Leave of Court to File a Reply to Their Motion to Stay Discovery, no opposition having been filed. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                            REPLY to Response to 71 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Leave to File Granted on November 14, 2018) filed by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes. (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                              REPLY to Response to 89 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Leave to File Granted on November 14, 2018) filed by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes. (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 96 MOTION to Change Venue filed by George Perrot. (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 89 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by George Perrot. (Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lisa C. deSousa (deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kathleen E. Sheehan (Sheehan, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None motion to change venue
                                            MOTION to Change Venue by Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain.(deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 96 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: PROCEDURAL ORDER - Discovery shall continue and defendants shall fully cooperate; the question of the need for an amendment to the complaint shall be addressed at the hearing in this matter on December 6th, when the compliance of the parties with reasonable discovery will be considered in determining whether amendment of the complaint is necessary and at this stage in the proceedings.(Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin B. Coyle on behalf of Andrew Canevari, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Ronald St. Germain (Coyle, Kevin) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/5/2018 to To File First Amended Complaint by George Perrot.(Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING: Hearing on 71 Individual FBI Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and all other pending Motions is SCHEDULED for 12/6/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in the Hampden Courtroom of the United States Courthouse, Springfield Division, 300 State Street, SPRINGFIELD, MA before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Motion To Stay
                                                          MOTION to Stay Discovery by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 1, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 2)(Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER finding as moot 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Special Representative, in light of leave being granted to file the Corrected Motion 79 on 8/23/2018. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Perrot. (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Saint Laurent on behalf of Cheryl Clapprood, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko (Saint Laurent, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Opposition re 81 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Corrected Motion to Appoint A Special Representative For Defendant Thomas Kelly filed by City of Springfield, Massachusetts. (deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 83 Plaintiff's Motion for a Final Extension of Time to File His Response to Defendants Eubanks and Oakes's Motion to Dismiss until 9/21/2018. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Sakowski Lynch on behalf of Richard Kane (Lynch, Carole) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 71 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by George Perrot.(Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Second Corrected Motion to Appoint A Special Representative For Defendant Thomas Kelly by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Second Corrected Motion to Appoint A Special Representative For Defendant Thomas Kelly)(Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Charles Arpin (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Oversized Response to Defendants Eubanks and Oakes's Motion to Dismiss and granting Motion for Extension of Time to File His Response until 9/14/2018. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                MOTION Corrected Motion to Appoint A Special Representative For Defendant Thomas Kelly by George Perrot.(Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 75 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Motion to Appoint a Special Representative for Defendant Kelly; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Extension of Time to September 14, 2018 to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 9/5/2018) by George Perrot.(Art, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File A Corrected Motion to Appoint A Special Representative For Defendant Kelly by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Corrected Motion for Leave to Appoint A Special Representative)(Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 72 Individual Federal Bureau of Investigation Defendants' Motion for Leave of Court to File a Brief in Excess of 20 Pages; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 71 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Leave to file granted on 8/13/18) filed by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes. (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes.(Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 61 MOTION to Strike 57 Summons Returned Executed, 54 Summons Returned Executed, 56 Summons Returned Executed, 55 Summons Returned Executed filed by George Perrot. (Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                  MOTION Appoint Special Personal Representative by George Perrot.(Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn S. Greene on behalf of William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. Sheehan on behalf of City of Springfield, Massachusetts (Sheehan, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Clerk's Notes for Status Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Plaintiff to effectuate service upon the estates of the deceased defendants and file an opposition to motion to strike 61 no later than 8/3/2018. Plaintiff allowed to conduct discovery necessary to identify the appropriate parties and file an amended complaint no later than 10/5/2018. Motions to dismiss 31 34 36 42 DENIED without prejudice, subject to renewal upon the filing of an amended complaint. Federal defendants to file a motion to dismiss no later than 8/10/2018. Court reviews Joint Statement 64 submitted by the parties, deems the plaintiffs discovery plan appropriate and adopts the following schedule: All fact discovery to be completed by 6/28/2019; Expert disclosure under Rule 26 to be provided by the plaintiff no later than 8/2/2019, by the defendants no later than 9/13/2019, plaintiffs rebuttal experts no later than 11/1/2019, and defendants rebuttal experts no later than 12/2/2019; Expert discovery, including depositions, to be completed by 1/6/2020; and, Dispositive motions to be filed no later than 2/7/2020 and oppositions shall be filed no later than 3/6/2020. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Saint Laurent on behalf of City of Springfield, Massachusetts (Saint Laurent, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa C. deSousa on behalf of City of Springfield, Massachusetts (deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Motion to strike
                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike 57 Summons Returned Executed, 54 Summons Returned Executed, 56 Summons Returned Executed, 55 Summons Returned Executed by City of Springfield, Massachusetts.(deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 61 MOTION to Strike 57 Summons Returned Executed, 54 Summons Returned Executed, 56 Summons Returned Executed, 55 Summons Returned Executed filed by City of Springfield, Massachusetts. (deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. Sheehan on behalf of Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain (Sheehan, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Sheehan, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF STATUS/SCHEDULING HEARING: Hearing to address pending motions and status of case, including scheduling, set for 7/11/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The parties are to submit a joint statement for a proposed pretrial schedule for the case that includes a plan for discovery no later than 4:00 p.m. on 7/9/2018.(Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas Kelly served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed John Scanlon served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Chief Ernest Stelzer served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Captain John Brown served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT re: service of process by George Perrot. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Oversized Consolidated Repsonse to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 50 . (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Summonses until 6/25/2018. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 34 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim, 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Perrot. (Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by George Perrot.(Horn, Gayle) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting without opposition 47 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Consolidated Response to the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 31 32 34 36 37 42 until 5/7/2018. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to June 25, 2018 to To Serve Summonses by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Tony Balkissoon)(Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to May 7, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 32 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 33 Notice of Appearance, 37 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 34 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim, 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by George Perrot.(Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 60 Days after a decision on representation by the DOJ has been made to Answer or Move to Dismiss Complaint by William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes, Unknown Agents of the Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 44 Motion by the United States for an Extension of Time for Defendants William Eubanks and Wayne Oakes to Answer or Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint until sixty (60) days after a decision on representation by the Department of Justice. Plaintiff having assented to this motion. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Charles Arpin served on 4/6/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. (Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Frances Bloom.(Reardon, Susanne) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Frances Bloom. (Reardon, Susanne) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Elizabeth Thompson on behalf of George Perrot (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 35 Defendant City of Springfield's Motion for Leave of Court to File a Brief in Excess of 20 Pages. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Consolidated Response to the City of Springfield Defendants' Motions to Dismiss until 4/27/2018. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to 04/27/2018 to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 34 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim, 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by George Perrot.(Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of Springfield, Massachusetts.(Pikula, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by City of Springfield, Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit memo in support of MTD, # 2 Exhibit nolle pros)(Pikula, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain.(deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain. (deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Pikula on behalf of City of Springfield, Massachusetts (Pikula, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain.(deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain. (deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa C. deSousa on behalf of Charles Arpin, Andrew Canevari, Cheryl Clapprood, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kennedy, Marianne Popko, Ronald St. Germain (deSousa, Lisa) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 28 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Added Gayle Horn as counsel for the plaintiff. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gayle Horn Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7054650 by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Gayle Horn)(Loevy, Debra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2018: # 2 Affidavit Revised Affidavit) (Beatty, Barbara). (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of William Eubanks, Wayne Oakes (Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas Jarvis served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. (Art, Steven) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Canevari served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Susanne G. Reardon on behalf of Frances Bloom (Reardon, Susanne) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/13/18 to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint,, by Frances Bloom.(Reardon, Susanne) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 23 Defendant Francis Bloom's Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint until 4/13/2018. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 15 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Added Tara Thompson as counsel for the plaintiff. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Perrot. Thomas Kennedy waiver sent on 3/3/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Art, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Perrot. Richard Kane waiver sent on 3/5/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (Art, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Perrot. City of Springfield, Massachusetts waiver sent on 1/26/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed William Eubanks served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Wayne Oakes served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tara Thompson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7029631 by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Mark Loevy-Reyes as counsel for the plaintiff. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark Loevy-Reyes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7015922 by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Frances Bloom served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Cheryl Clapprood served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (Balkissoon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Paul Glantz served on 2/14/2018, answer due 3/7/2018. (Art, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Marianne Popko served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018. (Art, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Ronald St. Germain served on 2/14/2018, answer due 3/7/2018. (Art, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anthony Balkissoon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anthony Balkissoon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Gioia, AnaMaria) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven Art Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7008874 by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven Art)(Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony Balkissoon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7008916 by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anthony Balkissoon)(Loevy, Debra) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 01/25/2018, receipt number 0101-6981031. (Tran, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Case AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Charles Arpin, Frances Bloom, Captain John Brown, Andrew Canevari, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Cheryl Clapprood, William Eubanks, Paul Glantz, Thomas Jarvis, Richard Kane, Thomas Kelly, Thomas Kennedy, Paul Lance, David Louden, Wayne Oakes, Marianne Popko, John Scanlon, Ronald St. Germain, Chief Ernest Stelzer, Unknown Agents of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, Unknown Officers of the Springfield Police Department. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Marianne Popko, Wayne Oakes, David Louden, Unknown Officers of the Springfield Police Department, Thomas Kelly, Unknown Agents of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Ronald St. Germain, Captain John Brown, John Scanlon, Thomas Jarvis, Paul Lance, Paul Glantz, Andrew Canevari, Cheryl Clapprood, William Eubanks, Thomas Kennedy, Richard Kane, Chief Ernest Stelzer, Frances Bloom, Charles Arpin Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6981028 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by George Perrot. (Loevy, Debra) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/26/2018 to correct docket entry ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET and CATEGORY SHEET filed by George Perrot. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Loevy, Debra) Modified on 1/26/2018 to correct docket entry . Duplicate Complaint filed in error. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?