Zog, Inc. v. Intel Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00691
District Judge Michael H. Simon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 11:54 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zog, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eli Greenstein +1 415 400 3000 +1 415 400 3001 egreenstein@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Joost +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 jjoost@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey Marie Kaplan +1 415 400 3000 +1 415 400 3001 skaplan@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph H. Meltzer, PHV +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 661 7056 jmeltzer@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
Intel Corporation Intel Corporation, Defendant
VMware, Inc. Unknown Role, VMware, Inc.
Unknown Role, Clearwire Corp
Unknown Role, New Clearwire CORP
Unknown Role, Synacor, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cloudera, Inc.
Unknown Role, Vuzix Corp
Unknown Role, Intel Pacific Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by George M Garvey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2018 Allison Marie Day +1 415 512 4079 +1 415 512 4077 allison.day@mto.com
TERMINATED: 06/04/2018 Miriam Kim +1 415 512 4041 +1 415 644 6941 miriam.kim@mto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel C. Lee +1 503 224 3380 +1 503 220 2480 rachel.lee@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED steve.lovett@stoel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel F. Katz , +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 dkatz@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Simon Kurtzer-Ellenbogen +1 202 434 5676 +1 202 434 5029 dkurtzer@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel S. Rodman +1 202 434 5952 +1 202 434 5029 rrodman@wc.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 195 - Contract Product Liability
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Supplement to Correspondence. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(74 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 75 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 117 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 8 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 104 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI), Request(82 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 106 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 94 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 62 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 10 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 86 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 77 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 119 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI), Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(74 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 7 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 58 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 116 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 103 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 58 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 64 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Katz, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Supplement to Brief Regarding Proposed Orders.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Brief,,,,,,,,, (105 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 76 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 9 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 118 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Appearance of Frederick S. Longer appearing on behalf of City of New Castle, Cole Phillips Filed by on behalf of City of New Castle, Cole Phillips.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Longer, Frederick) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Rosemary M. Rivas, Christopher A. Seeger, Christopher Ayers, David Buchanan, and Jennifer S. Wagner present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Daniel F. Katz, David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Rachel Rodman, Steven T. Lovett, and Rachael C. Lee present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiffs (ECF 123 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiffs. Filed by Robert S. Key.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Weiner, Melissa) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Supplement to Brief Regarding Proposed Orders. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Brief,,,,,,,,, (105 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 76 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 9 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 118 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Affidavit of Emily Bigelow of Service by Mail of Consolidated Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Supplement to Intel's Request re Proposed Forms of Order. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Request re Proposed Forms of Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Brief Regarding Proposed Orders. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(68 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 75 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 117 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 8 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 104 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI), Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(58 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 116 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 74 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 103 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 58 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 7 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 64 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Joint Proposed Form of Order Submitted re Order Governing Document Collection and Production Format. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Joint Proposed Form of Order Submitted re Protective Order and Order Pursuant to FRE 502. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephone Status Conference held on 8/2/2018 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 8/20/2018. Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Shumway, Bonita) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiffs Joseph Henderson, Matthew Maniskas, and Kottemann Orthodontics, P.L.L.C. (ECF 72 ) is GRANTED. Joseph C. Bourne is withdrawn. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Unopposed Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney as Pro Hac Vice Counsel. Filed by Joseph Henderson, Matthew Maniskas, Kottemann Orthodontics PLLC.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Hedlund, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Rosemary M. Rivas, Christopher A. Seeger, Christopher Ayers, David R. Buchanan, and Jennifer S. Wagner present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Daniel Katz, David Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Rachel S. Rodman, Steve T. Lovett, Rachel Lee, and Tanya Hunter present as counsel for Intel Corporation. Richard J. Burke present as counsel for Quantum Legal. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Order - At the parties' request, the Telephone Conference scheduled for 7/12/2018 at 8:00AM is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:18-md-02828-SI. (mja) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                            Pretrial Order No. 3 (Partial Case Management Schedule). Signed on 7/3/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all associated cases of 3:18-md-02828-SI. (mja) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Case Management Conference held on June 15, 2018 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 7/9/2018. Redaction Request due 7/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2018. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Shumway, Bonita) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Pretrial Order No. 2. Signed on 6/18/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all associated cases of 3:18-md-02828-SI. (mja) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Minutes of Case Management Conference: Case management conference held as stated on the record. Formal order to follow. James E. Cecci, Christopher A. Seeger, Charles E. Schaffer, Adam Witt, Lavrene King, Donald Wall, Nicholas Koluncich, Daniel Dee Miles III, Gerard Stranch, Benjamin Gestel, Michael Jacobs, Robert J. Gralewski, Jr., Stuart A. Davidson, Richard M. Hagstrom, Michael R. Cashman, John Dunbar, Zack Kearns, Michael Fuller, Jennifer S. Wagner, Rick Figler, Christopher Ayers, Gary S. Graifman, Nicholas Migliaccio, Christopher Jennings, Leslie Pescia, Melissa R. Emert, Hirlye (Ryan) Lutz Robert Le, Kelly Jones, Michael Canty, Young Walgenkim, Daniel Rersing, Adam J. Levitt, Jennifer L. Joost, Cari Laufenberg, Brian Gudmundson, Steve D, Larson, Galye M. Blatt, Rosemary M. Rivas, Gordon Fauth, and Daniel Hedlund present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Daniel F. Katz, David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Rachel Rodman, Steven T. Lovett, and Rachael C. Lee present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Certificate of Compliance Kelly Jones Certificate of Good Standing. Filed by Wyatt Mann. (Related document(s): Declaration,,,, (57 in 3:18-md-02828-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Certificate of Compliance CERTIFICATES OF GOOD STANDING. Filed by Gloria K Park. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel(34 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 29 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 18 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 19 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 49 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 35 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 64 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 52 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 48 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 59 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 44 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 19 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Fauth, Gordon) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Reply to Intel Corporation's Opposition to Robbins Geller's Appointment to a Leadership Role in this MDL and to Motion for Appointment of Counsel titled as "The Stoll Berne Group's Motion For Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel, Steering Committee, and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support"(54 in 3:18-md-02828-SI). Filed by Marissa Pascarella, Schwartz Eye Associates, P.A., Lucas Kintz, Zachary Finer, Richard Reis, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union Local 1500, Scott M. Gilman, Unravel The Gavel, Inc., Mikael Young, Eric H Bernstein, Stephen C. Bevilacqua, Jordan Robbins, Steve P. Garcia, Anthony Stachowiak, Aneca Federal Credit Union, Zog, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Counsel titled as "The Stoll Berne Group's Motion For Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel, Steering Committee, and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support"(54 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 13 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 14 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 30 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 47 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 44 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 21 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 22 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 29 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 18 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 14 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 29 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 14 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 44 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 54 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 22 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 29 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 18 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 14 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 30 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 13 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 47 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 21 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Supplement to Motion for Appointment of Gayle M. Blatt to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Filed by Louisa Ferrer. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel(45 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 47 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 48 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 54 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 49 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 47 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 40 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 57 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 46 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 44 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 48 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 48 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 53 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 48 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 44 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 45 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 64 in 3:18-md-02828-SI).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Blatt, Gayle) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notification of CM/ECF Account for Rachel S. Rodman (MDL admission). Your login is: rsrodman. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Response to Motion for Appointment of Counsel for Plaintiff's Executive/Steering Committee(48 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 11 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 12 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 28 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 57 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 45 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 21 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 21 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 21 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 22 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 19 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 20 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 16 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 12 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Amy Storey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Firm Resume)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Koluncich, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notification of CM/ECF Account for Joseph H. Meltzer (MDL admission). Your login is: jhmeltzer. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by Artesia General Hospital, et al.. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Brief Preliminary Statement by Artesia General Hospital and the Proposed Regulated Entities Class. Filed by Artesia General Hospital, et al.. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Brief regarding Preliminary Statement. Filed by Alliance Healthcare System, Inc.. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Notice of Request for Oral Argument on Application of Richard H. Hagstrom for Appointment as a Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Member Filed by Alliance Healthcare System, Inc..Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Dunbar, John) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Proposed Form of Order Submitted Defendant Intel Corporation's Case Managment Proposal. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Brief Defendant Intel Corporation's Statement. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by Andrew East, City of New Castle, City of Providence, Louisa Ferrer, Joseph Anderson, Debra Austin, Joshua Blau, Lee Booth, James Bradshaw, Virginia L. Cardoza, Barbara Clabaugh, Donald Cougle, Anne Daisey, Carl Demonbrun, Jamal Elakrah, Marvin Feiges, Clarence C. Feldner, Steven Fowler, Deborah Greene, Christopher Gulley, Darcy L. Hackel, James E. Heise, Arthur J. Hoffman III, Karem Horne, Alma Jennings, Mathew Kleinmann, Deborah Knapp, Sandra Lessner, Jill Levin, Carol Marziale, Jack Mezzel, Ron Moreno, Ralph Morton, Troy Mowery, Yvette Norris, Kierston Pierce, J. P. Richards Jr., Tami Riecke, Gregory Sadler, Margarite Sampson, Michael Straub, Claude Vogel, Katharn Waterman, Hosea Williams III, Timothy Grunloh, Kyle Murphy, Wyatt Mann, Reno Cappelli, Edward Rinn, Marissa Pascarella, Schwartz Eye Associates, P.A., Lucas Kintz, Zachary Finer, Richard Reis, George West, Westmed Disposal, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers International Union Local 1500, Simon Lee, Sabrina Basham, Staci Black, Bruce Bodfsky, Glenda Dillon, Don Fooshee, Courtney Hill, George Lett, Erica McCleary, Gary Misbach, Cassandra Payne, Emilio Rodriguez, Cole Phillips, Jason Jones, Alexandr Bahcevan, Scott M. Gilman, Unravel The Gavel, Inc., Mikael Young, Eric H Bernstein, Stephen C. Bevilacqua, Jordan Robbins, Gloria K Park, Steve P. Garcia, Anthony Stachowiak, Aneca Federal Credit Union, Zog, Inc.. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Joint Brief titled "Preliminary Statement Addressing Matters Relevant to the Initial Case Management Conference". Filed by Andrew East, City of New Castle, City of Providence, Louisa Ferrer, Joseph Anderson, Debra Austin, Joshua Blau, Lee Booth, James Bradshaw, Virginia L. Cardoza, Barbara Clabaugh, Donald Cougle, Anne Daisey, Carl Demonbrun, Jamal Elakrah, Marvin Feiges, Clarence C. Feldner, Steven Fowler, Deborah Greene, Christopher Gulley, Darcy L. Hackel, James E. Heise, Arthur J. Hoffman III, Karem Horne, Alma Jennings, Mathew Kleinmann, Deborah Knapp, Sandra Lessner, Jill Levin, Carol Marziale, Jack Mezzel, Ron Moreno, Ralph Morton, Troy Mowery, Yvette Norris, Kierston Pierce, J. P. Richards Jr., Tami Riecke, Gregory Sadler, Margarite Sampson, Michael Straub, Claude Vogel, Katharn Waterman, Hosea Williams III, Timothy Grunloh, Kyle Murphy, Wyatt Mann, Reno Cappelli, Edward Rinn, Marissa Pascarella, Schwartz Eye Associates, P.A., Lucas Kintz, Zachary Finer, Richard Reis, George West, Westmed Disposal, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers International Union Local 1500, Simon Lee, Sabrina Basham, Staci Black, Bruce Bodfsky, Glenda Dillon, Don Fooshee, Courtney Hill, George Lett, Erica McCleary, Gary Misbach, Cassandra Payne, Emilio Rodriguez, Cole Phillips, Jason Jones, Alexandr Bahcevan, Scott M. Gilman, Unravel The Gavel, Inc., Mikael Young, Eric H Bernstein, Stephen C. Bevilacqua, Jordan Robbins, Gloria K Park, Steve P. Garcia, Anthony Stachowiak, Aneca Federal Credit Union, Zog, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Michael H. Simon: A notice of voluntary dismissal was incorrectly docketed in case 3:18-md-2828 and all member cases. However, the dismissal only applies to case 3:18-cv-694 SI, and no other cases were dismissed. To correct the error, the entry will be deleted from all cases to which it does not apply. The entry number for the deleted entry may be skipped in cases in which it was deleted if entries were made after the notice of voluntary dismissal. (eo) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement for Intel Corporation. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Notice of Appearance of Rachel C. Lee appearing on behalf of Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation, Intel Corp. CPU Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation, Intel Corporation also adding Steven Lovett and Williams & Connolly Filed by on behalf of Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation, Intel Corp. CPU Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation, Intel Corporation.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Notice of Appearance of Rachel C. Lee appearing on behalf of Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation Adding Williams and Connolly Filed by on behalf of Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Notice of Appearance of Rachel C. Lee appearing on behalf of Intel Corporation adding Steven Lovett and Williams & Connolly Filed by on behalf of Intel Corporation.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Notice of Appearance of Rachel C. Lee appearing on behalf of Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation and adding Williams & Connolly Filed by on behalf of Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: and Substitution of Counsel Filed by Intel Corporation.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: and Substitution of Counsel Filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Corp., Intel Corporation.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Motion for Appointment of Counsel - Gayle M. Blatt to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Louisa Ferrer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Blatt, Gayle) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Motion for Appointment of Counsel Application to Appoint Hinkle Shanor LLP and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-lead Counsel for a Proposed Regulated Entities Class. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Artesia General Hospital, et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Michael E. Jacobs, # 2 Attachment Declaration of Robert J. Gralewski, # 3 Attachment Declaration of Ronald S. Alepin, # 4 Attachment Declaration of Daniel C. Hedlund)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Motion for Appointment of Counsel of Rosemary M. Rivas as Co-Lead Counsel or, in the Alternative, to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Filed by Alexandr Bahcevan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Resume of Rosemary M. Rivas, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Rosemary M. Rivas)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Motion for Appointment of Counsel as to Plaintiff City of Providence's Motion for Appointment of Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Oral Argument requested. Filed by City of Providence. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of Plaintiff City of Providence's Motion for Appointment of Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)Docketed in all Member Cases. (King, Laurence) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Declaration of Gordon M Fauth Jr DECLARATION OF GORDON M. FAUTH IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF FINKELSTEIN THOMPSON LLP FOR APPOINTMENT TO PLAINTIFFS STEERING COMMITTEE. Filed by Gloria K Park. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel(34 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 29 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 18 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 19 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 49 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 35 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 64 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 43 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 52 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 33 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 48 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 59 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 44 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 19 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Fauth, Gordon) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Motion for Appointment of Counsel APPLICATION OF FINKELSTEIN THOMPSON LLP FOR APPOINTMENT TO PLAINTIFFS STEERING COMMITTEE. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Gloria K Park.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Fauth, Gordon) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Motion for Appointment of Counsel Blau/Fooshee Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead and Liaison Counsel, and Brief in Support. Filed by Andrew East, Joseph Anderson, Debra Austin, Joshua Blau, Lee Booth, James Bradshaw, Virginia L. Cardoza, Barbara Clabaugh, Donald Cougle, Anne Daisey, Carl Demonbrun, Jamal Elakrah, Marvin Feiges, Clarence C. Feldner, Steven Fowler, Deborah Greene, Christopher Gulley, Darcy L. Hackel, James E. Heise, Arthur J. Hoffman III, Karem Horne, Alma Jennings, Mathew Kleinmann, Deborah Knapp, Sandra Lessner, Jill Levin, Carol Marziale, Jack Mezzel, Ron Moreno, Ralph Morton, Troy Mowery, Yvette Norris, Kierston Pierce, J. P. Richards Jr., Tami Riecke, Gregory Sadler, Margarite Sampson, Michael Straub, Claude Vogel, Katharn Waterman, Hosea Williams III, Simon Lee, Sabrina Basham, Staci Black, Bruce Bodfsky, Glenda Dillon, Don Fooshee, Courtney Hill, George Lett, Erica McCleary, Gary Misbach, Cassandra Payne, Emilio Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Motion for Appointment, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Motion for Appointment, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Motion for Appointment, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Motion for Appointment, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Motion for Appointment, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Motion for Appointment, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Motion for Appointment, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Motion for Appointment, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Motion for Appointment, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Motion for Appointment, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Motion for Appointment, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Motion for Appointment, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Motion for Appointment)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Yugler, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Declaration of Michael Fuller . Filed by Wyatt Mann. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel(61 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 49 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 56 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 16 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 26 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 29 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 20 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 27 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 35 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 45 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 31 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 16 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 15 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 46 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 23 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 34 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 24 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 37 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 32 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 29 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 25 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 30 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 36 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 38 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 28 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Motion for Appointment of Counsel of Michael Fuller and Kelly Jones for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Filed by Wyatt Mann.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Motion for Appointment of Counsel of Richard M. Hagstrom for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Filed by Alliance Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV of Hagstrom, # 2 Exhibit B - Cert. of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit C - CV of Cashman, # 4 Exhibit D - CV of Dunbar, # 5 Exhibit E - H&J Complex Litig. Overview, # 6 Exhibit F - Recommendation Letter - Judge Peterson, # 7 Exhibit G - Recommendation Letter - Judge Rosenberg, # 8 Exhibit H - HCCIC Report 1-5-18, # 9 Exhibit I - HCCIC Technical Report 1-12-18, # 10 Exhibit J - Recommendation Letter - Warren-Boulton)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Motion for Appointment of Counsel titled as "The Stoll Berne Group's Motion For Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel, Steering Committee, and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support". Filed by Marissa Pascarella, Schwartz Eye Associates, P.A., Lucas Kintz, Zachary Finer, Richard Reis, George West, Westmed Disposal, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers International Union Local 1500, Scott M. Gilman, Unravel The Gavel, Inc., Mikael Young, Eric H Bernstein, Stephen C. Bevilacqua, Jordan Robbins, Steve P. Garcia, Anthony Stachowiak, Aneca Federal Credit Union, Zog, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Motion for Appointment of Counsel for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Filed by City of New Castle, Cole Phillips. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Ex. A - Firm CV, # 2 Attachment Ex. B - Certificate of Good Standing for Charles E. Schaffer)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Schaffer, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Motion for Appointment of Counsel for Plaintiff's Executive/Steering Committee. Filed by George West, Westmed Disposal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment CV of Ryan Lutz, # 2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Lutz)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lutz, Hirlye) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Notice of Receipt of Cases from the Northern District of Illinois: 1:18-cv-02754 opened as 3:18-cv-00965-SINotice of Receipt of Cases from the Northern District of California: 5:18-cv-02424 opened as 3:18-cv-00966-SI. Docketed in all Member Cases. (dsg) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3) On April 5, 2018, the Panel transferred 4 civil action(s) to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1407. See 291 F.Supp.3d 1381 (J.P.M.L. 2018). Since that time, 24 additional action(s) have been transferred to the District of Oregon. With the consent of that court, all such actions have been assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Simon. It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the District of Oregon and assigned to Judge Simon. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1407 to the District of Oregon for the reasons stated in the order of April 5, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Simon. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Oregon. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 5/30/18. Docketed in all Member Cases. (dsg) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiffs (ECF 39 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jennifer Lauren Joost (MDL admission). Your login is: jljoost. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney as Pro Hac Vice Counsel. Filed by Zachary Finer, Richard Reis.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Association of Attorney Christine N. Moore,Christine N. Moore for Don Fooshee. Filed by Don Fooshee.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Moore, Christine) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Association of Attorney Richard S. Yugler,Richard S. Yugler for Don Fooshee. Filed by Don Fooshee.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Yugler, Richard) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Association of Counsel Filed by Don Fooshee.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Tienson, Thane) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Association of Counsel Filed by Sabrina Basham, Staci Black, Bruce Bodfsky, Glenda Dillon, Don Fooshee, Courtney Hill, George Lett, Erica McCleary, Gary Misbach, Cassandra Payne, Emilio Rodriguez.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Tienson, Thane) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Receipt of Case from the Northern District of California: 3:18-cv-01733 opened as 3:18-cv-00757 SI. (dsg) Docketed in all member cases. (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Pretrial Order No. 1 - The Court will hold an initial case management conference in this matter on Friday, June 15, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15B of the Mark O. Hatfield United States Courthouse, 1000 SW Third Avenue, Portland, Oregon. Unless counsel has received prior authorization of the Court, all counsel are expected to appear in person. Attendance at the initial case management conference will not waive objections to jurisdiction, venue, or service. Signed on 5/1/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in All Associated Cases of 3:18-md-02828-SI.(mja) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) On April 5, 2018, the Panel transferred 4 civil action(s) to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1407. See _F.Supp.3d_ (J.P.M.L. 2018). Since that time, 23 additional action(s) have been transferred to the District of Oregon. With the consent of that court, all such actions have been assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Simon. It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the District of Oregon and assigned to Judge Simon. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1407 to the District of Oregon for the reasons stated in the order of April 5, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Simon. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Oregon. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/27/18. Docketed in all Member Cases. (dsg) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Receipt of Case from the Northern District of Alabama: 3:18-cv-00357 opened as 3:18-cv-00671 SINotice of Receipt of Cases from the Northern District of California: 5:18-cv-00105 opened as 3:18-cv-00686 SI 5:18-cv-00111 opened as 3:18-cv-00687 SI 5:18-cv-00146 opened as 3:18-cv-00688 SI 5:18-cv-00187 opened as 3:18-cv-00689 SI 5:18-cv-00210 opened as 3:18-cv-00710 SI 5:18-cv-00235 opened as 3:18-cv-00690 SI 5:18-cv-00298 opened as 3:18-cv-00691 SI 5:18-cv-00352 opened as 3:18-cv-00692 SI 5:18-cv-00379 opened as 3:18-cv-00693 SI 5:18-cv-00580 opened as 3:18-cv-00694 SI 5:18-cv-00633 opened as 3:18-cv-00695 SI 5:18-cv-00742 opened as 3:18-cv-00696 SI 5:18-cv-00799 opened as 3:18-cv-00697 SI 5:18-cv-00894 opened as 3:18-cv-00698 SI 5:18-cv-01216 opened as 3:18-cv-00684 SI 5:18-cv-01461 opened as 3:18-cv-00685 SINotice of Receipt of Case from the Central District of Illinois: 2:18-cv-02009 opened as 3:18-cv-00666 SINotice of Receipt of Cases from the District of New Jersey: 1:18-cv-00540 opened as 3:18-cv-00667 SINotice of Receipt of Cases from the District of New Mexico: 1:18-cv-00051 opened as 3:18-cv-00665 SINotice of Receipt of Cases from the Eastern District of New York: 1:18-cv-00526 opened as 3:18-cv-00670 SI 2:18-cv-00147 opened as 3:18-cv-00668 SI 2:18-cv-00574 opened as 3:18-cv-00669 SIDocketed in all Member Cases. (dsg) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00298. Electronic file received. (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1407 to the District of Oregon and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Simon (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Day, Allison) (Filed on 4/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Intel Corporation (Day, Allison) (Filed on 4/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Marie Day (Day, Allison) (Filed on 4/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam Kim (Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 4/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 14 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for David H. Thompson, Counsel for Plaintiff Zog, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David H. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12119111.) filed by Zog, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certifiicate of Good Standing)(Thompson, David) (Filed on 2/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTIONS: Granting 25 Stipulation in case 5:18-cv-00046-EJD; Granting 7 Stipulation in case 5:18-cv-00379-EJD; Granting 11 Stipulation in case 5:18-cv-00633-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating Cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RELATING CASE. It is hereby ordered that case 3:18-cv-00298-EDL is related to 5:18-cv-00046-EJD Garcia v. Intel Corporation. It is further ordered that such case shall be reassigned to Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/30/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zog, Inc.. Intel Corporation served on 1/17/2018, answer due 2/7/2018. (Meltzer, Joseph) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion for Transfer of Actions and Related MDL Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified 7 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion for Transfer of Actions and Related MDL Proceedings filed by Zog, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 1/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/12/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Summons. (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 1/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Zog, Inc., Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff Zog, Inc. (Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Intel Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12022702.). Filed by Zog, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenstein, Eli) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?