Lefloris Lyon v. USA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 17-2675

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 2:16 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re: Appellant's Jurisdictional Memorandum. 2. Appellees' Response to Appellant's Jurisdictional Memorandum. 3. Appellant's Amended Jurisdictional Memorandum Supporting the Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction for the same reasons set forth in this court's order dated 07/27/2017, in appeal no. 17-2279. Orders transferring a case to another federal district court are not final and generally not appealable. See Hill v. Potter, 352 F.3d 1142, 1144 (7th Cir. 2003). We DENY the appellant's request to convert the appeal to a petition for writ of mandamus. See Simmons v. City of Racince, PFC, 37 F.3d 325, 329 (7th Cir. 1994). Further appeals from the same non-reviewable order will lead to sanctions. Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge and Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge. [18] [6876546] [17-2675] (MM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER re: 1. To the Attention of the Court by Appellant. 2. Appellant Motion for Copy of Flash Drive. 3. Amended Notice of Appeal and Motion to Consolidate Dockets Nos. 17-2279, 17-2675, 17-2684. 4. Appellant's Amended Jurisdictional Memorandum Supporting the Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. 5. Motion for Reconsideration of the September 8, 2017 Order Supporting the Motion for Recruitment of Counsel Requesting Relief. 6. Motion to Take Judicial Notice Supporting the Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. 7. Response to Appellant's Motion for Copy of Flash Drive. The motions to reconsider the court's order dated September 8, 2017, are DENIED. He requests reconsideration of the order severing appeal nos. 17-2675 and 17-2684 and asks that these appeals be consolidated with appeal no. 17-2279. He further argues that he should have to pay only one filing fee for all three appeals. Appeal no. 17-2279 was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction on July 28, 2017, and Lyon offers no argument why this appeal should be reopened. Appeal nos. 17-2675 and 17-2684 are from two distinct district court cases. These cases were not consolidated in the district court and were filed two years apart. The only joint filing made in the two cases was when Lyon filed a notice of appeal that listed both district court cases. His request to reconsider the denial of leave to become an electronic filer also is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for copy of flash drive is DENIED. The district court has placed the items filed before it under seal and transmitted the record to this court under seal. The court therefore will not provide a copy of the record on appeal to the appellant unless these items are placed in the public record by the district court. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the motion to take judicial notice is DENIED. These documents are not relevant to the issues on appeal. JKL [15] [13] [16] [6871782-2] [6866047-2] [17] [6875636] [17-2675, 17-2279, 17-2684] (MM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Lefloris Lyon to take judicial notice supporting the motion for recruitment of counsel. [16] [6871797] [17-2279, 17-2675, 17-2684] (JR)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Lefloris Lyon for reconsideration of the September 8, 2017 order supporting the motion for recruitment of counsel requesting relief. [15] [6871796] [17-2279, 17-2675, 17-2684] (JR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Amended jurisdictional memorandum supporting the motion for recruitment of counsel filed by Pro se Appellant Mr. Lefloris Lyon in 17-2279, 17-2675, 17-2684. [14] [6871792] [17-2279, 17-2675, 17-2684] (JR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Amended notice of appeal and motion to consolidate dockets nos. 17-2279, 17-2675, 17-2684 filed by Pro se Appellant Mr. Lefloris Lyon. [13] [6871789] [17-2279, 17-2675, 17-2684] (JR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/29/2017 for Appellant Lefloris Lyon [12] [6869396] [17-2675] (CAG)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER re: 1. Motion for Leave to File Electronically. 2. Motion for Order Sealing the Record on Appeal. 3. Plaintiffs-Appellants' Objections to Nonparty Motion to Seal. 4. Renewed Motion for Leave to File Electronically. This court's order consolidating the appeals is VACATED, and these appeals are SEVERED. Briefing remains SUSPENDED pending resolution of the motion for recruitment of counsel in both appeals and the jurisdictional issue in appeal no. 17-2675. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appellant's motions for leave to file electronically are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for order sealing the record on appeal is GRANTED only to the extent that certain filings in appeal no. 17-2684 will be placed under seal. The clerk of this court shall unseal the appeal, but shall place under seal the short record, the appellant's docketing statement, the appellee's motion to seal, and the appellant's opposition to the motion to seal. The parties shall have access to these filings, but they will not be part of the public record. The court will review any new filings by the appellant before placing them on the docket to determine if the filings may be placed in the public record, if the filings need to be sealed, or if access to the filings must be completely restricted. The court will restrict all access, including the parties' access, to any confidential documents covered by the protective order of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. If the appellees seek leave to file any documents under seal or under completely restricted access, the appellees should file an appropriate motion. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the clerk of this court shall maintain under seal the exhibits to the appellant's jurisdictional memorandum filed in appeal no. 17-2675. JKL [4] [6865580-2] [6867735] [17-2675, 17-2684] (MM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed Statement by Appellees DOJ, USMS and USA to Appellant's Jurisdictional Statement. [10][6867259] [17-2675] (Hansen, Jeffrey)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER re: Appellant's motion to consolidate appeals. These appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Briefing in this now consolidated appeal is SUSPENDED pursuant to the court's order of 8/17/2017. DW [9] [6867216] [17-2675, 17-2684]--[Edited 09/08/2017 by MM--VACATED per the court's 09/08/2017 order.] (CD)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 23 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?