Precision Discovery, Inc. f/k/a Precision Discovery, LLC v. Hitachi Vantara Corporation f/k/a Hitachi Data Systems Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02561
District Judge R. Brooke Jackson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 4:27 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Precision Discovery, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris, Karstaedt, Jamison & Powers, PC-Englewood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamey W. Jamison +1 720 875 9140 +1 720 875 9141 jjamison@hkjp.com
formerly known as
Precision Discovery, LLC Jamey W. Jamison +1 720 875 9140 +1 720 875 9141 jjamison@hkjp.com
v.
No Logo Cold Creek Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hitachi Vantara Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/9/18. (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Precision Discovery, Inc. f/k/a Precision Discovery, LLC for Precision Discovery, Inc. f/k/a Precision Discovery, LLC. (Jamison, Jamey) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Cold Creek Solutions, Inc., Hitachi Vantara Corporation f/k/a Hitachi Data Systems Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6331522)Attorney Jamey William Jamison added to party Precision Discovery, Inc. f/k/a Precision Discovery, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Precision Discovery, Inc. f/k/a Precision Discovery, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Complaint and Jury Demand, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons Hitachi Vantara Corporation, # 12 Summons Cold Creek Solutions)(Jamison, Jamey) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 2 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?