My24HourNews.Com, Inc. v. AT&T Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01647
District Judge Mark H. Cohen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 1:19 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo My24hournews.com Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Griffin Hamersky LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott A. Griffin +1 646 998 5580 +1 646 998 8284 sgriffin@grifflegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Domenico Hamersky +1 646 998 5580 +1 646 998 8284 mhamersky@grifflegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2110

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Von A. DuBose +1 404 881 4161 dubose@dubosemiller.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tanya F. Miller +1 404 720 8111 miller@dubosemiller.com
v.
AT&T Corporation AT&T Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "AT&T Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Lewis Balser +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 dbalser@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Constance Barrett +1 404 572 3562 jbarrett@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marissa Alter-Nelson +1 212 839 5622 +1 212 839 5599 malternelson@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina Prusak Chianese +1 212 839 6062 cchianese@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eamon Paul Joyce +1 212 839 8555 +1 212 839 5599 ejoyce@sidley.com
No Logo Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fellows La Briola, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry D. Fellows, Jr. +1 404 586 9200 hfellows@fellab.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Coleman Gretchen +1 404 586 9200 mgretchen@fellab.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Keelin Kavanagh +1 212 524 5000 keelin.kavanagh@gmlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendy C. Michael +1 212 524 5004 +1 212 524 5050 wendy.michael@gmlaw.com
No Logo Genacom, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Krevolin Horst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2018 Barclay Hendrix +1 404 835 9395 hendrix@khlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Ntt America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fellows La Briola, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry D. Fellows, Jr. +1 404 586 9200 hfellows@fellab.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Coleman Gretchen +1 404 586 9200 mgretchen@fellab.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Keelin Kavanagh +1 212 524 5000 keelin.kavanagh@gmlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendy C. Michael +1 212 524 5004 +1 212 524 5050 wendy.michael@gmlaw.com
No Logo Verio Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fellows La Briola, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry D. Fellows, Jr. +1 404 586 9200 hfellows@fellab.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Coleman Gretchen +1 404 586 9200 mgretchen@fellab.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Keelin Kavanagh +1 212 524 5000 keelin.kavanagh@gmlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendy C. Michael +1 212 524 5004 +1 212 524 5050 wendy.michael@gmlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Submission of 60 MOTION for Oral Argument, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Oral Argument filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 9/19/18 Email)(Balser, David) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Oral Argument by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Submission of 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David L. Balser, # 2 Exhibit O - Declaration of Todd Olson, # 3 Exhibit P - 8/9/12 Email from B. Pepe to E. Underwood, # 4 Exhibit Q - 8/22/12 Email from E. Underwood to T. Olson, # 5 Exhibit R - 10/11/12 Email from B. Pepe to E. Underwood)(Balser, David) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY BRIEF re 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Genacom, Inc.. (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY BRIEF re 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc.. (Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Submission of 55 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 54 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, /Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Plaintiff's Amended Brief in Opposition to Defendant AT&T's Motion to Dismiss filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Griffin, Scott) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 54 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, /Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffin, Scott) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    PROVISIONALLY SEALED AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Declaration of Von A. Dubose in Support of My24HourNews.Com Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Griffin, Scott) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant AT&T's Motion to Dismiss filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Griffin, Scott) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Dismiss /Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Verio inc. and NTT America Inc. filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Griffin, Scott) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Dismiss /Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Genacom, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Griffin, Scott) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barclay Hendrix terminated. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/27/2018. (btql) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Withdraw Barclay Hendrix as Attorneyby Genacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Ware Lewis on behalf of Genacom, Inc. (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal AT&T Wholesale Master Services Agreement. All such documents shall remain under seal unless ordered to be unsealed by the Court for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/24/18. (bnw) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Submission of 35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 1 Complaint,, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING 45 Motion for Extension of Time, Page Limit Extensions, and Staying All Discovery. SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/3/18. (bnw) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Clerks Notation re 38 Certificate of Interested Persons, 39 Certificate of Interested Persons, 40 Certificate of Interested Persons, and 41 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: 33 MOTION to Dismiss, 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DuBose, Von) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa Alter-Nelson on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Alter-Nelson, Marissa) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Eamon Paul Joyce on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Joyce, Eamon) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Prusak Chianese on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Chianese, Christina) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Certificate of Interested Persons by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Certificate of Interested Persons by Genacom, Inc.. (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation, Corporate Parent NTT Communications Corporation for NTT America, Inc.. (Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Certificate of Interested Persons by AT&T Corp.. (Balser, David) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          SEALED NOTICE Of Filing AT&T's Motion to Dismiss by AT&T Corp., Genacom, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc. re 35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 1 Complaint,, 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Master Services Agreement - Highlighted for Redaction)(Balser, David) Modified on 7/24/2018 to edit text (bnw). (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit of David L. Balser, # 3 Exhibit A - D. Colo. E. Underwood 9-17-2015 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B - D. Colo. July 21 2016 Slip Opinion, # 5 Exhibit C - Mutual Non-Disclosure Agreement, # 6 Exhibit D - Strategic Partnership Business Plan, # 7 Exhibit E - Master Services Agreement - Redacted, # 8 Exhibit F - D. Colo. My24 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment by Transferring Case, # 9 Exhibit G - D. Colo. My24 Reply ISO Motion to Alter or Amendgment by Transferring Case, # 10 Exhibit H - D. Colo. Complaint, # 11 Exhibit I - D. Colo. First Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit J - D. Colo. March 2 2017 Opinion and Order, # 13 Exhibit K - S.D.N.Y. Complaint, # 14 Exhibit L - S.D.N.Y. November 9 2017 Letter, # 15 Exhibit M - S.D.N.Y. First Amended Complaint, # 16 Exhibit N - S.D.N.Y. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(Balser, David) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 37 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by AT&T Corp., Genacom, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, David) Modified on 6/22/2018 to edit text (bnw). (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Genacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Barclay Hendrix on behalf of Genacom, Inc. (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Genacom, Inc. (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING 30 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). The action shall continue as to Defendants AT&T Corp., Verio, NTT, and Genacom, Inc. ONLY (bnw)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal /Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (Griffin, Scott) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/19/18. (jkl) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, David) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ORAL ORDER GRANTING 18 19 20 26 27 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/18/18. (bnw)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Keelin Kavanagh Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7904492). Attorney Keelin Kavanagh added appearing on behalf of Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc. (pmb)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Wendy C. Michael Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7904534). Attorney Wendy C. Michael added appearing on behalf of Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc. (pmb)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Wendy C. Michael Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7904534)by Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc.. (Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        APPLICATION for Admission of Keelin Kavanagh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7904492)by Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc.. (Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Coleman Gretchen on behalf of Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc. (Gretchen, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            FILED IN ERRORNOTICE of Appearance by Henry D. Fellows, Jr on behalf of Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc. (Fellows, Henry) Modified on 5/22/2018 to edit text. Talked to atty (bnw). (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Henry D. Fellows, Jr on behalf of Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc. (Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Marissa Alter-Nelson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7865178). Attorney Marissa Alter-Nelson added appearing on behalf of AT&T Corp. (pmb)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Christina Prusak Chianese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7865155). Attorney Christina Prusak Chianese added appearing on behalf of AT&T Corp. (pmb)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, AT&T Corp. Answer due 6/21/2018; Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc. Answer due 6/21/2018; NTT America, Inc. Answer due 6/21/2018; Verio, Inc. Answer due 6/21/2018. All Defendants may file a brief in support of their motions to dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages in length. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/18/18. (bnw) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Leave to File Briefs in Excess of 25 Pages by AT&T Corp., Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, David) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Eamon Paul Joyce Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7862504). Attorney Eamon Paul Joyce added appearing on behalf of AT&T Corp. (pmb)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Griffin; and granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Hamersky by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on May 15, 2018. (lwb)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission of Marissa Alter-Nelson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7865178)by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, David) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Christina Prusak Chianese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7865155)by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, David) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Eamon Paul Joyce Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7862504)by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, David) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Constance Barrett on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Barrett, Julia) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David Lewis Balser on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Balser, David) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Hamersky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7833319). Attorney Michael Hamersky added appearing on behalf of My24HourNews.Com, Inc. (pmb)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Scott Griffin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7833233). Attorney Scott A. Griffin added appearing on behalf of My24HourNews.Com, Inc. (pmb)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Electronic Summons Issued as to AT&T Corp., NTT America, Inc., Verio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons ATT&T Corporation, # 2 Summons Verio, Inc.)(bnw) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. Verio, revised (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. AT&T Corp. revised (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. NTT America, Inc - revised (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., Genacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 GENACOM)(bnw) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Hamersky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7833319)by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Scott Griffin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7833233)by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. NTT (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. Genacom (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. Endurance (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. Verio (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. AT&T Corp (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet for Complaint by My24HourNews.Com, Inc. re 1 Complaint, (DuBose, Von) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/13/18. (bnw) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by My24HourNews.Com, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7821210.)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?