Johnson v. Trump
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:19-cv-00475-WFJ-SPF
District Judge William F. Jung, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 4, 2019 at 10:18 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alva Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by TRIAL LAWYERS FOR PUBLIC JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer D Bennett +1 510 622 8150 +1 510 622 8155 jbennett@publicjustice.net
Space F. Paul Bland, Jr. +1 415 381 5599 pbland@publicjustice.net
Space Karla Gilbride +1 202 797 8600 +1 202 232 7203 kgilbride@publicjustice.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TYCKO & ZAVAREEI, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Aizpuru +1 202 417 3667 kaizpuru@tzlegal.com
Space Tanya Susan Koshy +1 510 250 3298 tkoshy@tzlegal.com
Space Hassan A. Zavareei +1 202 973 0900 +1 202 973 0950 hzavareei@tzlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Varnell & Warwick, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janet R. Varnell +1 352 753 8600 +1 352 753 8606 jvarnell@varnellandwarwick.com
Space BRIAN WILLIAM WARWICK +1 352 753 8600 +1 352 753 8606 bwarwick@varnellandwarwick.com
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Franckman +1 424 203 1600
Space Henry Self +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601
Space Ryan Stonerock +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601

Toggle Switch Represented by Ford & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracey K. Jaensch +1 813 261 7800 +1 813 261 7899 tjaensch@fordharrison.com
Space Dawn Siler-Nixon +1 813 261 7800 +1 813 261 7899 dsiler-nixon@fordharrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J Harder +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601 charder@harderllp.com
No Logo Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Franckman +1 424 203 1600
Space Henry Self +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601
Space Ryan Stonerock +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601

Toggle Switch Represented by Ford & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracey K. Jaensch +1 813 261 7800 +1 813 261 7899 tjaensch@fordharrison.com
Space Dawn Siler-Nixon +1 813 261 7800 +1 813 261 7899 dsiler-nixon@fordharrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J Harder +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601 charder@harderllp.com
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/14/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 77 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Compel
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Compliance notice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Compliance notice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Compliance notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Charles J. Harder in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Production of Documents)(Harder, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [30] Motion to strike; granting [32] motion to dismiss in accord with the attached order. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/14/2019. (CCB)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on June 5, 2019 before Judge William F. Jung. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nikki Peters,Telephone number 813-301-5448. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (NLP)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [33] Joint Motion. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/10/2019. (Jung, William)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [34] MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional Certification of Collective Action) filed by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Consent to Join Form, # (2) Consent to Join Form, # (3) Affidavit of Corina Cotenescu, # (4) Consent to Join Form, # (5) Affidavit of Phillip Johnson)(Zavareei, Hassan)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 6/5/2019 re [30] MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump For President Inc. and Donald J. Trump and [32] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. and Donald J. Trump. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters (SAO)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting [47] motion to appear pro hac vice; granting [48] motion to appear pro hac vice; granting [49] motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Steven Frackman, Henry Self, and Ryan Stonerock may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants, with Attorneys Dawn Siler-Nixon and Tracey K. Jaensch designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/4/2019. (NCR)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Ryan Stonerock to appear pro hac vice by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Henry Self to appear pro hac vice by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Steven Frackman to appear pro hac vice by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot [40] Motion to Compel. Plaintiff Johnson has agreed to attend her noticed deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/4/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [40] MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Alva Johnson filed by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Hassan Zavareei)(Zavareei, Hassan)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [32] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [30] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Harder, Charles)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in opposition re [34] Motion to Certify Class filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - List of conclusory statements, # (2) Exhibit 2 - List of hearsay statements, # (3) Exhibit 3 - proposed notice redlined by defendant, # (4) Exhibit 4 - proposed notice as modified by defendant)(Siler-Nixon, Dawn)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Declaration
                                                                              DECLARATION of Charles J. Harder re [40] MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Alva Johnson by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Harder, Charles)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2019 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Alva Johnson by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Harder, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in opposition re [32] Motion to dismiss filed by Alva Johnson. (Zavareei, Hassan)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [30] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Alva Johnson. (Zavareei, Hassan)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of PRETRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE set for 6/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (To be conducted at same time as hearing noticed at docket 35.)(CCB)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019 Case Management Report
                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Zavareei, Hassan)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE of HEARING on [33] Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Strike Request for Injunctive Relief from Plaintiff's Complaint , [32] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , [30] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint set for 6/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 motion to certify class
                                                                                            MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional Certification of Collective Action) by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Notice of Collective Action, # (2) Exhibit Proposed Consent to Join Form, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of Omarosa Manigault Newman, # (4) Exhibit Declaration of Phillip M. Johnson, # (5) Exhibit Declaration of Alva Johnson)(Zavareei, Hassan)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019, Terminated: 6/10/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Strike Request for Injunctive Relief from Plaintiff's Complaint by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Harder, Charles)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019, Terminated: 6/14/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Jaensch, Tracey)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Answer
                                                                                                  ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [1] Complaint by Donald J. Trump.(Harder, Charles)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019, Terminated: 6/14/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                    MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Harder, Charles)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                                                                      NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. Related case(s): N (Harder, Charles)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Harder, Charles)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Compliance notice
                                                                                                          NOTICE of compliance re [25] Order by Alva Johnson (Varnell, Janet)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Compliance notice
                                                                                                            NOTICE of compliance re [24] Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Harder, Charles)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                                                                                              ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Charles J. Harder, appearing on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055906.) Related document: [23] Unopposed MOTION for Charles J. Harder to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                                                                                                ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Charles J. Harder, appearing on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055906.) Related document: [23] Unopposed MOTION for Charles J. Harder to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER directing Attorneys Jennifer Bennett, Paul Bland, and Karla Gilbride to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. It appears that you are not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by April 9, 2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/26/2019. (SAO)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting [23] motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Charles J. Harder may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants, with Attorneys Dawn Siler-Nixon and Tracey K. Jaensch designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/22/2019. (NCR)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019, Terminated: 3/22/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Charles J. Harder to appear pro hac vice by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint on or before 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/15/2019. (CCB)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019, Terminated: 3/15/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [1] Complaint by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey K. Jaensch on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Jaensch, Tracey)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Siler-Nixon on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Siler-Nixon, Dawn)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                                                                                                                ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Hassan A. Zavareei, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055707.) Related document: [6] MOTION for Hassan A. Zavareei to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of pendency of related cases re [5] Related case order and track 3 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alva Johnson. Related case(s): n (Varnell, Janet)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re [3] Related case order and track 2 notice by Alva Johnson. (Varnell, Janet)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                      WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/11/2019 by Alva Johnson as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Aizpuru, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                                                                                                                        ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jennifer Bennett, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055636.) Related document: [10] MOTION for Jennifer Bennett to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                                                                                                                          ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Frank Paul Bland Jr, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055636.) Related document: [14] MOTION for F. Paul Bland to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                                                                                                                            ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Karla Gilbride, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055635.) Related document: [11] MOTION for Karla Gilbride to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting [14] motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney F. Paul Bland may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Janet R. Varnell designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/8/2019. (NCR)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                                                                                                                                ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Tanya S. Koshy, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055604.) Related document: [8] MOTION for Tanya S. Koshy to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019, Terminated: 3/8/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for F. Paul Bland to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting [10] motion to appear pro hac vice; granting [11] motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Jennifer Bennett and Karla Gilbride may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Janet R. Varnell designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/6/2019. (NCR)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                      PROOF of service by Alva Johnson (Varnell, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019, Terminated: 3/6/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Karla Gilbride to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019, Terminated: 3/6/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Jennifer Bennett to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting [6][7][8] motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Tanya S. Koshy, Katherine M. Alzpuru, and Hassan A. Zavareei may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiff, with Attorney Janet R. Varnell designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/1/2019. (NCR)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019, Terminated: 3/1/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Tanya S. Koshy to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019, Terminated: 3/1/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for KATHERINE M. AIZPURU to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019, Terminated: 3/1/2019 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Related case order and track 3 noticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 3. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/27/2019. (SAO)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS issued as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc, Donald J. Trump. (BES)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Related case order and track 2 noticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/26/2019. (SAO)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-475-T-02SPF. (SJB)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15163943) filed by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Proposed Summons)(Varnell, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?