UNITED STATES v. Fitts
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00045

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 6, 2021 at 9:53 AM DT (1.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Carl Hankla +1 202 307 6448 +1 202 307 0054 w.carl.hankla@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Carl Hankla +1 202 307 6448 +1 202 307 0054 w.carl.hankla@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Estate of Dennis J. Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Jody Ann Fitts, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Notice-Other
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None RSM Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates(FORM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None 2 - Minute Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Judgment by Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                ORDER granting the United States' 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Reduce Federal Tax Penalty Assessments to Judgment. It is ordered that a final, partial judgment be entered under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) in favor of the United States on its claim against Jody Ann Fitts as personal representative of the estate of Dennis J. Johnson in the amount of $84,675.80 as of July 31, 018, plus statutory interest accruing thereafter until the fullamount is paid. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Jody Ann Fitts via first class mail
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          STIPULATION AND ORDER For Extension of Initial Scheduling Dates signed, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/16/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/23/2018, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 3/30/2018. (PM) Modified on 2/22/2018: copy sent to Jody Ann Fitts via first class mail (PM).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint (Proposed Summonses) by Plaintiff UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Hankla, W) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES. (Hankla, W) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                COMPLAINT to Reduce Federal Income Tax Assessments to Judgment against All Defendants Attorney W Carl Hankla added to party UNITED STATES(pty:pla), filed by UNITED STATES.(Hankla, W) (Fee Waived) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?