Leggett v. Maxwell Technologies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-00377-LAB-JLB
District Judge Larry Alan Burns, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 25, 2019 at 6:42 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kip Leggett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brodsky & Smith LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Jason Smith +1 610 667 6200 +1 610 667 9029 esmith@brodsky-smith.com
v.
No Logo Burkhard Goeschel, Defendant
No Logo Cambria Acquisition Corp., Defendant
No Logo Franz J. Fink, Defendant
No Logo Ilya Golubovich, Defendant
No Logo John Mutch, Defendant
No Logo Jorg Buchheim, Defendant
Maxwell Technologies, Inc. Maxwell Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Richard Bergman, Defendant
No Logo Steve Bilodeau, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office San Diego
Filed 2/26/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County San Diego
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Notice of voluntary dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kip Leggett (Cardona, Ryan) (jdt).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 Notice of Related Case
    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch of case(s) 3:19-cv00395 3:19-cv-00413; 3:19-cv-00451. (Berger, David) (jdt).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
      ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. [10]. Defendants shall file their response by 6/28/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/23/2019. (jdt)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 Notice of appearance
        NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Paul Cardona on behalf of Kip Leggett (Cardona, Ryan)Attorney Ryan Paul Cardona added to party Kip Leggett(pty:pla) (jdt).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019, Terminated: 5/24/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch. (Berger, David). Modified on 5/23/2019 - Signer for Plaintiff not associated with party. Sent QC email to have atty file Notice of Appearance (jdt).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch identifying Corporate Parent Tesla, Inc. for Maxwell Technologies, Inc. (Ostler, Joni) (jdt). (jao).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Notice of appearance
              NOTICE of Appearance of Joni Ostler by Joni L. Ostler on behalf of Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch (Ostler, Joni)Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Richard Bergman(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Steve Bilodeau(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Jorg Buchheim(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Franz J. Fink(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Burkhard Goeschel(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Ilya Golubovich(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Maxwell Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party John Mutch(pty:dft) (jdt).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Notice of appearance
                NOTICE of Appearance of David J. Berger by David J Berger on behalf of Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch (Berger, David)Attorney David J Berger added to party Richard Bergman(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Steve Bilodeau(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Jorg Buchheim(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Franz J. Fink(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Burkhard Goeschel(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Ilya Golubovich(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Maxwell Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party John Mutch(pty:dft) (jdt).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                  ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. [5]). Defendants shall file their response by 5/31/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/29/2019. (jdt)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019, Terminated: 4/29/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch. (Brownlie, Robert)Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party Richard Bergman(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party Steve Bilodeau(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party Jorg Buchheim(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party Franz J. Fink(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party Burkhard Goeschel(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party Ilya Golubovich(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party Maxwell Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Brownlie added to party John Mutch(pty:dft) (jdt).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Notice - other
                      NOTICE of Plaintiff's PSLRA Certification by Kip Leggett re [1] Complaint, (Smith, Evan). Modified on 2/27/2019 - Sent QC email reminder re format pursuant to Civ LR 5.1(j). (jdt).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Summons issued
                        Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kip Leggett. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (mme)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 ComplaintCourt Filing
                            COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Cambria Acquisition Corp., Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch, Tesla, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12238729.), filed by Kip Leggett. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00377-LAB-JLB. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Smith, Evan)(mme) (sjt).
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 140 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?