Electrum Partners, LLC v. Johnston

Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-03106
District Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey
Last Updated February 28, 2019 at 2:53 AM EST (6.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Electrum Partners, LLC, Petitioner

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Deverie Jean Christensen +41539 494 00x6328 +1 415 394 9401 christensend@jacksonlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua A Sliker +1 702 921 2460 +1 702 921 2461 joshua.sliker@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo Leslie Bocskor, Petitioner

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Deverie Jean Christensen +41539 494 00x6328 +1 415 394 9401 christensend@jacksonlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua A Sliker +1 702 921 2460 +1 702 921 2461 joshua.sliker@jacksonlewis.com
v.
No Logo Pamela Johnston, Respondent
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 896 - Other Statutes: Arbitration
Timeline
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER that 1 Electrum and Bocskor's Petition to Compel Arbitration is DENIED without prejudice to their ability to reurge it in a properly supported motion. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT re 1 Motion to Compel,,, by Petitioners Leslie Bocskor, Electrum Partners, LLC. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT re 1 Motion to Compel,,, by Petitioners Leslie Bocskor, Electrum Partners, LLC. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT re 1 Motion to Compel,,, by Petitioners Leslie Bocskor, Electrum Partners, LLC. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER to Judge Dorsey from John T. Brennan. (MR) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/29/2018. On 3/28/18, the Court received a letter from Attorney John T. Brennan, which offers reasons that the court should deny the pending petition to compel arbitration 1 . Case-related correspondence like this is prohibited by Local Rule IA 7-1(b), which provides that "All communications with the court must be styled as a motion, stipulation, or notice, and must be filed in the court's docket and served on all other attorneys and pro se parties. The court may strike any case-related correspondence filed in the court's docket that is not styled as a motion, stipulation, or notice." Because the court does not consider oppositions styled as letters, the court will disregard Mr. Brennan's letter. And Mr. Brennan is cautioned that, if he wants the court to consider his position, he must file documents in accordance with the rules of this court. The Clerk of Court is directed to MAIL a copy of this minute order to The Law Office of John T. Brennan, 151 East 4th Street, No. 1-A, Brooklyn, NY 11218. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EX PARTE MOTION for Service of 3 Summons and 1 Petition on Johnston by Counsel and Email, by Petitioners Leslie Bocskor, Electrum Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NY Post Article, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Joshua A. Sliker, Esq.,, # 3 Exhibit December 8, 2017 Email to Brennan, # 4 Exhibit Request to Waive Service, # 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service at Narrows Avenue, # 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service at West 73rd Street, # 7 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service at West 52nd Street, # 8 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service at Park Avenue, # 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service at Ridgewood Avenue, # 10 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service at Stafford Place, # 11 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service at Old Bridge Turnpike, # 12 Exhibit Second Brennan Email) (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time to Serve 3 Summons and 1 Petition, by Petitioners Leslie Bocskor, Electrum Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - NY Post Article, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Joshua A. Sliker, Esq., # 3 Exhibit 3 - December 8, 2017 Email to Brennan, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Request to Waive Service, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Attempted Service at Narrows Avenue, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Attempted Service at West 73rd Street, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Affidavit of Attempted Service at West 52nd Street, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Affidavit of Attempted Service at Park Avenue, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Attempted Service at Ridgewood Avenue, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Affidavit of Attempted Service at Stafford Place, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Affidavit of Attempted Service at Old Bridge Turnpike, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Second Brennan Email) (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Pamela Johnston. (MMM) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Leslie Bocskor, Electrum Partners, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT PETITION to Compel Arbitration against Pamela Johnston (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4903356) by Electrum Partners, LLC, Leslie Bocskor. Proof of service due by 3/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Independent Contractor Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - SDNY Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Arbitration Demand, # 4 Exhibit 4 - John Brennan Letter, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Sliker, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 12/22/2017 (MMM). Modified on 3/29/2018 (DC). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 29 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?