Skylstad v. State of Washington
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01636
District Judge John C. Coughenour, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2020 at 8:26 PM DT (8.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Scott Skylstad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CIVIL RIGHTS JUSTICE CENTER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Darryl Parker +1 206 557 7719 dparker@civilrightsjusticecenter.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-X, Defendant
No Logo Dominic Franzo, Defendant
No Logo Don Wood, Defendant
No Logo Henri Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Julius Monroe, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Anderson, Defendant
No Logo State of Washington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State Of Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space State of Washington
No Logo Theresa Cohn, Defendant
No Logo Washington Department of Corrections, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bill of Costs
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Bill of Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Judgment by Court
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None order on report and recommendation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Reply (non motion)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Response to Objections to R&R
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Objections to Report and Recommendation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Cross Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Unavailability
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER REGARDING CONSENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Pursuant to defendants Motion to dismiss, The Court directs the parties to indicate by by 11/26/2018, whether they consent or decline consent to Magistrate Judge Tsuchida. (AE)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Notice to Filer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Notice to Filer
                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (Ad Hoc, Michelle M Young) (SG) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
                                                                            LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SG)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants State of Washington, Washington Department of Corrections re 1 Notice of Removal, (Young, Michelle) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                DECLARATION in Support of Removal of Snohomish County Superior Court Cause No. 18-2-09228-31 to Federal Court of Michelle M. Young re 1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants State of Washington, Washington Department of Corrections (Young, Michelle) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                  NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court re 1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants State of Washington, Washington Department of Corrections. (Young, Michelle) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 18-2-09228-31; (Receipt # 0981-5539482) Attorney Michelle M. Young added to party State of Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle M. Young added to party Washington Department of Corrections(pty:dft), filed by State of Washington, Washington Department of Corrections. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Complaint)(Young, Michelle) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?