Ahern v. Local 1400, communications Workers of America, Union, AFL-CIO, CLC and its Election Committee
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-12573
District Judge Nancy Gertner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 28, 2019 at 1:35 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cheryl Ahern, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Harvey A. Schwartz +1 617 742 7010 +1 617 742 7225 schwartzharvey@mac.com
v.
No Logo Local 1400, communications Workers of America, Union, AFL-CIO, CLC and its Election Committee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Shelley B. Kroll +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 skroll@segalroitman.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 185
Nature of Suit 730 - Labor: Reporting/Disclosure
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Civil Case Terminated. (Filo, Jennifer)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cheryl Ahern. (Schwartz, Harvey) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    AFFIDAVIT of Theresa Dobson re 3 Memorandum of Law by Local 1400, communications Workers of America, Union, AFL-CIO, CLC and its Election Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Kroll, Shelley) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2006 (Filo, Jennifer). (Entered: 12/23/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Local 1400, communications Workers of America, Union, AFL-CIO, CLC and its Election Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kroll, Shelley) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2006 (Filo, Jennifer). (Entered: 12/23/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered, denying temporary restraining order. Plaintiff cannot show either the likelihood of success on the merits or irreparable harm, under the terms of the relevant law. On the former, there are serious jurisdictional issues which, at the very least, cast doubt on the likelihood of success. (There is a question as to whether this matter may proceed under Title I, before a Court, or under Title IV, through an administrative proceeding in front of the Secretary of Labor. 29 U.S.C. 411-15, 481-83. On the latter, there is substantial question whether the plaintiff will be irreparably harmed if she has to wait until either a Court or the Secretary of Labor determines which election to certify (the first or the second) and which candidate has won (assuming she did not win the second election). (Gertner, Nancy)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Electronic clerk's notes for proceedings held before Judge Nancy Gertner: Hearing re Request for Injunctive Relief held on 12/23/2005; Harvey Schwartz for the pltf. and Shelley Kroll for the defts.; The court hears oral arguments; The court orally denies the request for temporary restraining order; The lawsuit will proceed and the re-election will take place. (Court Reporter Valerie O'Hara.) (Filo, Jennifer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filing fee: $ 250.00, receipt number 69102 regarding Complaint 1 (Filo, Jennifer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BRIEF by Cheryl Ahern in support 1 Request for Injuctive Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons Issued as to Local 1400, Communications Workers of America, Union, AFL-CIO, CLC and its Election Committee. (Filo, Jennifer)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Filo, Jennifer)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Local 1400, communications Workers of America, Union, AFL-CIO, CLC and its Election Committee Filing fee: $ 250, filed by Cheryl Ahern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G)(Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?