L & H PLUMBING v. REPUBLIC WESTERN INS, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00001-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo L & H PLUMBING AND HEATING SUPPLIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES H. CASEY +1 856 367 5723
v.
No Logo JOANNE GOLDFINE, Defendant
No Logo MATTHEW GOLDFINE, Defendant
No Logo Republic Western Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo UNIVERSAL CONSTRUCTION & MANAGEMENT CORP., Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 130 - Contract - Surety
Cause Section 40 U.S.C. § 270 Miller Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Ocean
Terminated 3/25/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated Case
Case closed (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing case pursuant to General Rule 30A without prejudice and without costs. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 3/22/96; The following actions were taken, dismissing pursuant Rule 30A [4-1] dismiss/dismissal notice Call for Dismissal By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 Notice of Call for dismissal
        NOTICE of Call for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 30 Motion hearing set for 9:30 3/22/96 (sa)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          Copy of ORDER reassigning matter from Judge Brown to Judge Orlofsky and reallocating matter from Trenton to Camden. (signed by Chief Judge Anne E. Thompson) (NM) (eh)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Wolfson (Trenton-Brown) (mr)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Complaint
              COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 206396 (mr)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Case Referred to Arbitration
                CASE REFERRED to arbitration (mr)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for REPUBLIC WESTERN INS, UNIVERSAL CONSTRUCT., MATTHEW GOLDFINE ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (mr)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 42 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?