MECHANICS AUTO PARTS v. APS, INC., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00251-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MECHANICS AUTO PARTS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by avflawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUGUST E. KNESTAUT +1 856 853 8500 +1 856 384 1230 aknestaut@avflawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Aps, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis Robert Moffa, Jr +1 856 488 7740 +1 856 488 7720 lmoffa@mmwr.com
No Logo I.S.W., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis Robert Moffa, Jr +1 856 488 7740 +1 856 488 7720 lmoffa@mmwr.com
No Logo John Does, Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Gloucester
Terminated 4/16/1996
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 96-5310[], {SUP.CT.GLOU.CNTY.}
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) Re: affirming the District Court Order enter 4/16/97. Costs taxed against appellant. (mb)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Appeal - Miscellaneous
    Record complete for purposes of appeal. (dt)
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Transcript
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on April 15, 1996 (dt)
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 5/29/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 Transcript Request
        Transcript Purchase Order RE: [29-1] appeal (Transcripts from 4-15-96 reqeusted) (dt)
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
          NOTICE of Docketing ROA from USCA Re: [29-1] appeal USCA NUMBER: 96-5310 (dt)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Notice of Appeal (USCA)
            NOTICE OF APPEAL filed at 3:42 P.M. by MECHANICS AUTO PARTS Re: [28-1] order. Fee Status: PD.$105.00;REC.NO.219564. Copies of notice of appeal sent to USCA and Attorney(s): LOUIS R. MOFFA JR., AUGUST E. KNESTAUT (AC)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 Terminated Case
              Case closed (jm1)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [19-1] motion for summary judgment; and dismissing matter ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: T. FORMAROLI; Minutes of: 4.15.96; The following actions were taken, granting [19-1] motion for summary judgment terminating [19-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 2/16/96 on [19-1] motion By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/14/1996 Motion Hearing
                    Motion hearing re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment at 4/4/96 (dv)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/4/1996 Motion Hearing
                      Motion hearing re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment at 3/15/96 (dv)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Motion Hearing
                        Motion hearing re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment at 3/1/96 (dv)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AUGUST E. KNESTAUT, ESQ. counsel for plaintiff MECHANICS AUTO PARTS Re: opposition to [19-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Miscellaneous Document
                            DECLARATION of EDWARD J. MCBRIDE, JR. Re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Miscellaneous Document
                              DECLARATION of MURRAY SULLIVAN Re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Miscellaneous Document
                                DECLARATION of STEPHEN SATTINGER Re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Affidavit
                                  AFFIDAVIT of AUGUST E. KNESTAUT, ESQ. Re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Affidavit
                                    AFFIDAVIT of JOHN F. CARTER, II Re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT of CAROL DENISE CRUMP Re: [19-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996, Terminated: 4/15/1996 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by APS, INC., Motion hearing set for 2/16/96 on [19-1] motion . (All Brief(s)/PO Subm) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED (jm1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/22/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                          Notice of Intent to submit opposition to a Dispositive motion by MECHANICS AUTO PARTS (jm1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                            Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by APS, INC., I.S.W. (jm1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: 4/18/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by APS, INC.; jury demand (certf. of svc.) (jm1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 8:15 4/10/95 ; ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 Jury Demand
                                                      DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiff, MECHANICS AUTO PARTS (jm1) Modified on 02/10/1995
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER, sealing the transcripts of the hearings on the application for a preliminary injunction held on January 19, 20, and 21 ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1) Modified on 02/10/1995
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/21/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: T.FORMAROLI/C,NAMI; Minutes of: 1.21.95; The following actions were taken, Continued hearing on application of plaintiff for a preliminary injunction; Hearing on application of defendant for a judgment as a matter of law. Ordered DECISION RESERVED; Ordered application for a preliminary injunction DENIED. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law read into the record. Order to be entered. By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1) Modified on 02/10/1995
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/21/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER, that Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65 is hereby DENIED ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1) Modified on 02/10/1995
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: T.FORMAROLI/C.NAMI; Minutes of: 1.20.95; The following actions were taken, Continued hearing on application of plaintiff for a preliminary injunction; Hearing continued to Saturday, January 21, 1995 @ 8:00 a.m. By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1) Modified on 02/10/1995
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: T. FORMAROLI/C. NAMI; Minutes of: 1.19.95; The following actions were taken, hearing on application of plaintiff for a preliminary injunction; Hearing continued to Friday, January 20, 1995 @ 8:00 a.m. By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1) Modified on 02/10/1995
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  CONSENT ORDER, of confidentiality ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1) Modified on 01/17/1995
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 8:00 1/19/95 ; Order to Show Cause is extended from 1/6/95 to 1/19/95 @ 10:00. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1) Modified on 01/17/1995
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Order
                                                                      ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:30 2/2/95 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1) Modified on 01/04/1995
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (ar1) Modified on 01/04/1995
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                                                          APPLICATION by APS, INC., I.S.W. and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 1/26/95 for I.S.W., for APS, INC. (ar1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Remark
                                                                            Brief in Support by August E. Knestaut, Esquire for plaintiff Mechanics Auto Parts RE:Order to show cause with Temporary Restraints, (Filed in Superior Court Gloucester County). (ar1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT by Lewis Farling for plaintiff MECHANICS AUTO PARTS Re: [1-1] complaint (Filed in Superior Court Gloucester County). (ar1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by Joseph D. Alahverde for Plaintiff MECHANICS AUTO PARTS Re: [1-1] complaint (Filed in Superior Court Gloucester County). (ar1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Joseph York for Plaintiff MECHANICS AUTO PARTS Re: [1-1] complaint (Filed in Superior Court Gloucester County). (ar1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Order
                                                                                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINTS (Filed in Superior Court Gloucester County). (ar1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                                                                                      VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Gloucester County on December 21, 1994. (No Docket Number Annexed on Verified Complaint) (ar1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Notice of Removal
                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by APS, INC., I.S.W. Filed with the following state court proceedings, A]Verified Complaint Annexed, etc. FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 193650 (Certificate of Service Annexed) (ar1) Modified on 01/04/1995
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?