UFCW, et al v. UNICARE
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00252-SSB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CLAY BOWMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by croninandmusto.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK T. CRONIN +1 856 857 1776 +1 856 857 1778 ptcesq@croninandmusto.com
No Logo ISADORE TENNENBERG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by croninandmusto.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK T. CRONIN +1 856 857 1776 +1 856 857 1778 ptcesq@croninandmusto.com
No Logo UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS EASTERN STATES HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by croninandmusto.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK T. CRONIN +1 856 857 1776 +1 856 857 1778 ptcesq@croninandmusto.com
v.
No Logo Unicare Health Facilities, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY EMMET FLEMING +1 215 963 5000
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 7/7/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and without costs. (lc)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 7/7/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing action without costs & without prejudice ( signed by Judge Stanley S. Brotman ) (bf)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed (bf)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995 ~Notice (other)
        Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by UNICARE (Notice of Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative for Summary Judgment) (lc)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
          APPLICATION by UNICARE and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 2/15/95 for UNICARE (jm1)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/18/1995 Summons Returned Executed
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to UNICARE 1/11/95 Answer due on 1/31/95 for UNICARE (bf)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Referred to Arbitration
                CASE REFERRED to arbitration (ar1)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for UNICARE ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (ar1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 193648 (ar1)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 56 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?