UFCW, et al v. HEALTH SERVICES
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00253-JHR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CLAY BOWMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by croninandmusto.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK T. CRONIN +1 856 857 1776 +1 856 857 1778 ptcesq@croninandmusto.com
No Logo ISADORE TENNENBERG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by croninandmusto.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK T. CRONIN +1 856 857 1776 +1 856 857 1778 ptcesq@croninandmusto.com
No Logo UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION AND PARTICIPATING FOOD INDUSTRY EMPLOYERS EASTERN STATES HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by croninandmusto.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK T. CRONIN +1 856 857 1776 +1 856 857 1778 ptcesq@croninandmusto.com
v.
No Logo HEALTH SERVICES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GEORGE W.C. MCCARTER +1 732 450 1090 billmccarter@earthlink.net
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Camden
Terminated 3/14/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Terminated Case
Case closed (femp)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Dismissal, without prejudice, by UFCW, CLAY BOWMAN, ISADORE TENNENBERG (femp)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
      APPLICATION by HEALTH SERVICES and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 3/1/95 for HEALTH SERVICES (femp)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: 1/27/1995 Summons Returned Executed
        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to HEALTH SERVICES 1/12/95 Answer due on 2/1/95 for HEALTH SERVICES (femp)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
          NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Summons Issued
            SUMMONS(ES) issued for HEALTH SERVICES ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (ar1)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
              COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 193649 (ar1)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 49 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?