NEWBERRY, et al v. BUTLER, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00254-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DEBBIE NEWBERRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SCOTT D. LIEBLING +1 856 424 1808
No Logo WILLIAM S. NEWBERRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SCOTT D. LIEBLING +1 856 424 1808
v.
No Logo DIVISION OF STATE POLICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-5, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL BUTLER, Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Cumberland
Terminated 5/18/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 5/18/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal without prejudice or costs against either party (jm1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/18/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jm1)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 4.28.95; The following actions were taken, granting [4-1] motion to extend time to reply under Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(B)(1) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(b)(2) By Magistrate Robert B. Kugler (jm1)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Order
        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to extend time to reply under Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(B)(1) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(b)(2) ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (jm1)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Letter
          LETTER by STEPHEN J. ZWEIG Re: Notice of dismissal (jm1)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of STEVEN J. ZWEIG Re: [4-1] motion to extend time to reply under Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(B)(1) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(b)(2) (jm1)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995, Terminated: 4/25/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              Notice of MOTION to extend time to reply under Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(B)(1) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(b)(2) by DIVISION OF STATE and MICHAEL BUTLER [4-1] motion referred to Magistrate Robert B. Kugler, Motion hearing set for 4/21/95 on [4-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (jm1)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Letter
                LETTER by Clerk returning motion papers for failure to comply with Local Rule 12N (jm1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (femp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 193655 (femp)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 41 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?