RESOLUTION TRUST v. SHIN, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00255-JHR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Resolution Trust Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "RESOLUTION TRUST CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR UKRAINIAN FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Watanabe Spivak & Moss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMANTHA DULANEY +1 212 765 2100 sdulaney@spivak-lipton.com
v.
No Logo HAE S. HAN, Defendant
No Logo MYUNG SOON SHIN, Defendant
No Logo YEONG HO SHIN, Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 220 - Foreclosure (Diversity)
Cause Section 12 U.S.C. § 1464 Federal Savings and Loan
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Camden
Terminated 4/10/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (femp)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing matter, without prejudice and without costs ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami; Minutes of: 4/7/97; The following actions were taken, granting [13-1] dismiss/dismissal notice Call for Dismissal By Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez (femp)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997, Terminated: 4/7/1997 Notice of Call for dismissal
        NOTICE of Call for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 30 Motion hearing set for 9:30 4/7/97 (ln)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami; Minutes of: 1/25/96; The following actions were taken, withdrawing [11-1] dismiss/dismissal notice Call for Dismissal By Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez (femp)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995, Terminated: 1/26/1996 Notice of Call for dismissal
            NOTICE of Call for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 30 Motion hearing set for 12/29/95 (ln)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/18/1995 Substitution of Attorney
              Substitute attorney for RESOLUTION TRUST ; Terminated attorney LOWELL L. THOMAS for RESOLUTION TRUST ; Added, SAMANTHA DULANEY (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/8/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                Minute entry: Minutes of: 6/2/95; The following actions were taken, granting [5-1] motion for leave to serve by publication terminating [5-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/2/95 on [5-1] motion By Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/5/1995 Order
                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion for leave to serve by publication ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER permitting plaintiff (RTC) leave to serve process by Publication on defts. Yeong Ho Shin and Myung Soon Shin, and Hae s. Han, etc.; with copy of motion annexed. ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (mgr)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/11/1995 Remark
                      Statement As to Why No Brief Necessary (femp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/11/1995 Certification
                        CERTIFICATION of Lowell L. Thomas Re: [5-1] motion for leave to serve by publication (femp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/11/1995, Terminated: 6/5/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          Notice of MOTION for leave to serve by publication by RESOLUTION TRUST [5-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/2/95 on [5-1] motion . (PO Subm) (femp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Lis Pendens by RESOLUTION TRUST (femp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (femp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT filed, filing fee waived. (femp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                  CASE REFERRED to arbitration (femp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Summons Issued
                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for YEONG HO SHIN, MYUNG SOON SHIN, HAE S. HAN ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (femp)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?