PEREZ v. LEWIS, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00258-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Victor Perez, Petitioner
v.
No Logo DONALD E. LEWIS, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSEANN A. FINN +1 856 225 8498 roseann_finn@ccprosecutor.org
No Logo Office of the New Jersey Attorney General, Respondent
Officially listed as "THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY"

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSEANN A. FINN +1 856 225 8498 roseann_finn@ccprosecutor.org
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Camden
Terminated 3/31/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Remark
RETURN TO SENDER Re: Order dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition mailed to VICTOR PEREZ (jm1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jm1)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to summarily dismiss petitioner's habeas corpus petition, and the habeas corpus petition is accordingly dimissed ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        OPINION dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 3.21.95; The following actions were taken, granting [8-1] motion to summarily dismiss petitioner's habeas corpus petition; terminating [8-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 4/7/95 on [8-1] motion By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of MARY DALE GOLDEN Re: service of motion & brief (jm1)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995, Terminated: 3/27/1995 Motion to Dismiss
              Notice of MOTION to summarily dismiss petitioner's habeas corpus petition by respondents, DONALD E. LEWIS and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, Motion hearing set for 4/7/95 on [8-1] motion . (jm1)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to extend time to answer setting answer due for March 14, 1995; terminating [5-3] hearing Motion hearing set for 2/21/95 on [5-1] motion, set for 2/21/95 on [5-2] motion ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Certification
                  CERTIFICATION of ROSEANN A. FINN Re: [5-1] motion to extend time to answer, [5-2] motion setting answer due for March 14, 1995 (jm1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995, Terminated: 2/21/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Notice of MOTION to extend time to answer , setting answer due for March 14, 1995 by respondents, DONALD E. LEWIS and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, Motion hearing set for 2/21/95 on [5-1] motion, set for 2/21/95 on [5-2] motion .(aff. of svc.) (jm1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Letter
                      LETTER by ANNE C. PASKOW Re: receipt of petition for a writ of habeas corpus (jm1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER, set answer due for 2/17/95 for THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, for DONALD E. LEWIS ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (femp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                          NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. (femp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                            PETITION for writ of habeas corpus, Filing Fee Paid Receipt #193658 (femp)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 50 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?