FENNELL v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00261-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TODD FENNELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOCKE REYNOLDS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas H. Miller +1 540 983 9300
v.
No Logo DANIEL J. WALSH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DON E. CATINELLO +1 609 984 0023
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE WALSH, Defendant
No Logo NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DON E. CATINELLO +1 609 984 0023
No Logo Richard Roe, Defendant
No Logo The State Of New Jersey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DON E. CATINELLO +1 609 984 0023
Office Camden
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Camden
Terminated 10/25/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, RULE16
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 10/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER, voluntary dismissing the case without prejudice ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (dt)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (dt)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Scheduling Conference
      Scheduling conference held before Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 7/5/95. (et)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 5/18/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Order
        ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 11:00 7/5/95 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (dt)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
          APPLICATION by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, NJ STATE POLICE, DANIEL J. WALSH and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 5/31/95 for DANIEL J. WALSH, for NJ STATE POLICE, for STATE OF NEW JERSEY (dt)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Summons Issued
            SUMMONS(ES) issued for STATE OF NEW JERSEY, NJ STATE POLICE, DANIEL J. WALSH ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (dt)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Letter
              LETTER by counsel for pltf requesting issuance of summons (dt)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Amended Complaint
                AMENDED COMPLAINT by TODD FENNELL , (Answer due 1/28/95 for NJ STATE POLICE, for STATE OF NEW JERSEY ) amending [1-1] complaint against DANIEL J. WALSH (dt)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (ar1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 193659 (ar1)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 85 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?