King County v. BP PLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00758
District Judge Robert S. Lasnik, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2021 at 3:29 PM DT (3.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo King County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steve W. Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin A. Crass +1 617 641 9550 +1 617 641 9551 benk@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Wesley Kelman +1 617 641 9550 +1 617 641 9551 wesk@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Mahoney +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 barbaram@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew F. Pawa +1 617 641 9550 +1 617 641 9551 mattp@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Merrick Stacy +1 206 296 9015 + 206 296 0191 jennifer.stacy@kingcounty.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY H Kevin Wright +1 206 296 9015 +1296019 +12 296 0191 kevin.wright@kingcounty.gov
v.
No Logo BP PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Philip H Curtis +1 212 836 8000 philip.curtis@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew T. Heartney +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 matthew.heartney@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan W. Hughes +1 415 471 3100 jonathan.hughes@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY John David Lombardo +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 John.Lombardo@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy G Milburn +1 212 836 8000 nancy.milburn@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachael S Shen +1 415 471 3100 rachael.shen@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth S St. John +1 213 243 4000 elizabeth.stjohn@arnoldporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Schubert Barer (Anch)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/03/2018 Diana S Breaux +1 206 464 3939 +1 206 464 0125 dbreaux@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ralph H Palumbo +1 206 516 3800 +1 206 516 3842 rpalumbo@yarmuth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Simson Weinstein +1 734 649 9441 +1 206 516 3888 eswein@gmail.com
Chevron Corporation Chevron Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Theodore Joseph Boutrous, Jr. +1 213 229 7804 +1 213 229 6804 tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Seth Lipshutz +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 374 8469 jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert M McKenna +1 206 839 4300 rmckenna@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Nolan Tabor +1 202 763 1758 atabor@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stern & Kilcullen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Silverstein +1 973 535 1900 jsilverstein@sgklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Herbert J. Stern +1 973 535 1900 +1 973 535 9664 hstern@sgklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Johnny William Carter +1 713 651 9366 jcarter@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kemper Diehl +1 206 516 3880 kdiehl@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Erica Worth Harris +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 3363 eharris@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Neal S Manne +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 3380 nmanne@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven M. Shepard +1 212 336 8330 +1 212 336 8340 sshepard@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo ConocoPhillips, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartlit Beck LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean C. Grimsley +1 303 592 3100 +1 303 592 3140 sean.grimsley@bartlit-beck.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Alex J Harris +1 303 592 3197 alex.harris@bartlit-beck.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jameson R. Jones +1 303 592 3123 +1 303 592 3140 jameson.jones@bartlit-beck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tracie J Renfroe +1 713 751 3214 +1 713 751 3290 trenfroe@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Carol Margaret Wood +1 713 751 3200 cwood@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Kastner & Gibbs, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A Christofilis +1 206 628 6615 KChristofilis@williamskastner.com
TERMINATED: 07/18/2018 Marshall L Ferguson +1 206 628 6600 mferguson@williamskastner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Rosenberg +1 206 628 6600 arosenberg@williamskastner.com
No Logo Does 1 through 10, Defendant
ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, MOBIL CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel Reilly-Bates +1 206 407 2223 +1 206 407 2224 gaber@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jaren Elizabeth Janghorbani +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0211 jjanghorbani@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel John Toal +1 212 373 3869 +1 212 492 0869 dtoal@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
No Logo Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BEVERIDE & DIAMOND, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey T Clausen +1 206 315 4808 cclausen@bdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erika Holsman +1 206 315 4800 eholsman@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-326-7967

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan J. Crimmins +1 202 326 7972 +1 202 326 7999 bcrimmins@kellogghansen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David Charles Frederick +1 202 326 7951 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David K. Suska +1 202 326 7900 dsuska@kellogghansen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by George M Garvey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Paul Collins +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 5125 Daniel.Collins@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Ann Kim +1 415 512 4089 +1 415 644 6909 elizabeth.kim@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jerome Cary Roth +1 415 512 4000 +1 415 512 4077 Jerome.Roth@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P. Tuttle +1 213 683 9506 +1 213 683 4006 eric.tuttle@mto.com
No Logo Non-Party States, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Indiana Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas M. Fisher +1 317 232 6255 +1 317 232 7979 tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Kian J Hudson +1 317 232 0709 kian.hudson@atg.in.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Tupper +1 206 493 2300 tupper@tmw-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (179) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Joint Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None 1 - Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None 1 - Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                          NOTICE OF UPDATED NINTH CIRCUIT BRIEFING SCHEDULE ; filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Attorney Elizabeth Simson Weinstein for BP PLC added; per 142 Notice of Appearance. NOTICE of Docket Text Modification: Modified docket text to correct name of attorney appearing (SWT)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth S. Weinstein Ralph H Palumbo on behalf of Defendant BP PLC. (Palumbo, Ralph) Modified on 12/4/2018 to correct name of attorney appearing (SWT). (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Diana S Breaux for Defendant BP PLC. (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Casey T Clausen on behalf of Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Clausen, Casey) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                  NOTICE of Firm Name Change ; filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips. (Jones, Jameson) Changed Firm Name to Bartlit Beck LLP on 10/30/2018 (DS). (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting plaintiff's 125 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Parties shall inform Court by letter on how to proceed based on out come of the appeal. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time-OtherCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting plaintiff's 130 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ORDER re 133 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kian J Hudson for Amicus Non-Party States, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER re 132 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas M Fisher for Amicus Non-Party States, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, filed by Amicus Non-Party States. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/19/2018, (Tupper, James) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kian Hudson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Non-Party States (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5494751 (Tupper, James) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tom Fisher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Non-Party States (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5494738 (Tupper, James) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James A Tupper, Jr on behalf of Amicus Non-Party States. (Tupper, James) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time Partially Unopposed Motion for Two-Week Extension of Deadline to Respond to Motions to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff King County. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Steve W. Berman. Filed by Plaintiff King County. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Steve W. Berman. Filed by Plaintiff King County. (Berman, Steve) Modified firm's address on 9/20/2018 (DS). Changed firm address on 9/20/2018 (DS). (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Plaintiff King County, TO RESPONSE to 125 MOTION to Stay Partially Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE, by Defendants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, to 125 MOTION to Stay Partially Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Partially Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings, filed by Plaintiff King County. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/21/2018, (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                                                                                                PRAECIPE by Defendant BP PLC re 119 Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Defendant BP p.l.c.'s Corrected Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction))(Palumbo, Ralph) Modified to create docket entry relationship on 9/12/2018 (SWT). (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                  MOTION (Request) for Judicial Notice Accompanying Defendant BP p.l.c.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant BP PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/1/2018, (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ***Motions terminated per parties' Notice of Mootness (dkt. 122 ): Motions to Dismiss Original Complaint. (Dkts. 106 - 112) (SWT)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Mootness re 110 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, 111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 109 MOTION to Dismiss, 108 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, 112 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, 107 MOTION (Request) for Judicial Notice re 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Noting Date Set re pending motions to dismiss, Dkts. 106, 118, 108, 110, 115, 112, 117, 120, 116, 111, 109, 119 : Noting Date 11/2/2018, per 121 Stipulation and Order. (SWT)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting parties' 114 Stipulated Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss: Defendants will file response to First Amended Complaint by 9/11/2018, Plaintiff to serve responses to motions to dismiss by 10/11/2018, defendants to serve reply briefs by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Defendants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant BP PLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Jones, Jameson) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                        Stipulated MOTION re Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, filed by Defendants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/28/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, Does 1 through 10, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, filed by King County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Range of Global Mean Temperature From 1850 to the Present with the Projected Instantaneous Climatic Response to Increasing CO2 Concentrations)(Berman, Steve) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Jones, Jameson) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                      MOTION (Request) for Judicial Notice re 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant BP PLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant BP PLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 104 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alex J Harris for Defendant ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alex J. Harris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5407698 (Rosenberg, Adam) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 102 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven M Shepard for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven M. Shepard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5404980 (Diehl, Kemper) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 97 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Jameson Reece Jones for ConocoPhillips by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 96 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Carol M. Wood for ConocoPhillips by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 95 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Sean C. Grimsley for ConocoPhillips by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) Modified on 7/18/2018 to add represented party name (CDA). (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 94 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Tracie J Renfroe for Conoco Phillips. by Clerk William M McCool. **Application submitted due to new local counsel Adam Rosenberg**No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jameson Reece Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350219 (Rosenberg, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carol M. Wood FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5353847 (Rosenberg, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean C. Grimsley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350223 (Rosenberg, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tracie J. Renfroe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5353869 (Rosenberg, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Marshall L Ferguson for Defendant ConocoPhillips. (Rosenberg, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam Rosenberg on behalf of Defendant ConocoPhillips. (Rosenberg, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting parties' 90 Stipulated Motion Regarding Page Limits for Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated MOTION Regarding Page Limits for Briefing of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/11/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting parties' 88 Stipulated Motion Regarding Schedule for FRCP 26(a)(1) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. The deadlines set by Court's June 13, 2018 Order (Dkt. No. 46 ) and June 25, 2018 Order granting the parties' Stipulated Motion (Dkt. No. 85 ) are vacated. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) Modified on 7/2/2018 to edit docket text (TH). (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulated MOTION Regarding Schedule for FRCP 26(a)(1) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/28/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 86 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel P Collins for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel P. Collins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5373945 (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting parties' 78 Stipulated Motion; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/11/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/18/2018, Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Royal Dutch Shell plc and BP p.l.c. ; filed by Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Tuttle, Eric) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 77 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brendan J Crimmins for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 76 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David C Frederick for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 75 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth A Kim for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 74 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jerome C Roth for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 73 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David K Suska for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated MOTION re Schedule for FRCP 26(a) Conf, etc,, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/21/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brendan J. Crimmins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366890 (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David C. Frederick FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366886 (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth A. Kim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366878 (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jerome C. Roth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366871 (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David K. Suska FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5366815 (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erika Holsman on behalf of Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Holsman, Erika) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 63 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth S St. John for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 62 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachael S Shen for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 61 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nancy G Milburn for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 60 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John D Lombardo for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 59 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew T Heartney for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 57 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Philip H Curtis for Defendant BP PLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth S. St. John FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357227 (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachael S. Shen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357221 (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nancy G. Milburn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357211 (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John D. Lombardo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357203 (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan W. Hughes FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357197 (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew T. Heartney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357180 (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Philip H. Curtis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant BP PLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5357161 (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Tuttle, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Tuttle on behalf of Defendant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Tuttle, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 49 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Daniel J. Toal for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 48 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jaren Janghorbani for Attorney Exxon Mobil Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 47 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theodore V Wells, Jr for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney Diana S Breaux for BP PLC added; per 50 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BP PLC (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ralph H Palumbo on behalf of Defendant BP PLC. (Palumbo, Ralph) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Toal FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5355800 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jaren Janghorbani FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5355799 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theodore V. Wells, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5355769 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney Gabriel Reilly-Bates for Exxon Mobil Corporation added; per 40 Praecipe to Attach Document, 32 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tracie J Renfroe for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 41 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Carol M Wood for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 39 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Johnny W Carter for Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tracie J. Renfroe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5353869 (Ferguson, Marshall) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carol M. Wood FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5353847 (Ferguson, Marshall) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Praecipe to Attach Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRAECIPE to attach document AMENDED Signature page re 32 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Amended Signature Page)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Johnny W. Carter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5353583 (Diehl, Kemper) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kemper P Diehl on behalf of Defendant Chevron Corporation. (Diehl, Kemper) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 34 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sean C Grimsley for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting parties' 31 Stipulated Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 33 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jameson R Jones for ConocoPhillips, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 32 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Gabriel Reilly-Bates. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean C. Grimsley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350223 (Ferguson, Marshall) Modified on 6/12/2018 to correct title of document (CDA). (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTED APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jameson Reece Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Receipt No. 0981-5350219 (Ferguson, Marshall) Modified on 6/12/2018 to correct title of document (CDA). (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/11/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney Marshall L Ferguson for ConocoPhillips added; per 27 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean C. Grimsley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5350223 (Christofilis, Katherine) Modified on 6/12/2018 **local counsel contacted and will file corrected application ** (CDA). (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jameson Reece Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ConocoPhillips (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5350219 (Christofilis, Katherine) Modified on 6/12/2018 **Local counsel contacted and will file corrected application** (CDA). (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ConocoPhillips (Christofilis, Katherine) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine A Christofilis on behalf of Defendant ConocoPhillips. (Christofilis, Katherine) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Wesley Kelman for King County, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew F Pawa for King County, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin A Krass for King County, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Wesley Kelman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff King County (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5349038 (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew F. Pawa FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff King County (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5349033 (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin A. Krass FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff King County (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5349027 (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Praecipe to Attach Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRAECIPE to attach document Complaint re 1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Chevron Corporation (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Notice to Filer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Erica Harris for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Neal S. Manne for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Herbert J Stern for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joel M. Silverstein for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joshua S Lipshutz for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr for Defendant Chevron Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of Pendency of Other Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Multiple Courts, case number in other court Multiple Case Numbers ; filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erica Harris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332903 (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Neal S. Manne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332902 (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Herbert J. Stern FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332901 (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joel M. Silverstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332890 (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joshua S. Lipshutz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332879 (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5332866 (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chevron Corporation (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT re 1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Chevron Corporation. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of William E. Thomson re 1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Chevron Corporation (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-11859-0; (Receipt # 0981-5332619) Attorney Robert M McKenna added to party Chevron Corporation(pty:dft), filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, ConocoPhillips, BP p.l.c., Chevron Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKenna, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2018: # 2 State Court Complaint) (KB). Modified on 5/30/2018 to add State Court Complaint (KB). (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?