BUSSIE v. BUSH
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-04555
District Judge Noel L. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 5:42 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTHONY BUSSIE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY BUSSIE +1 856 963 0420 ABUSSIE64@HOTMAIL.COM
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "NANCY PELOSI"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
v.
No Logo BARACK OBAMA,, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "DR. CONDOLEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo JOHN CONYERS, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "RICHARD CHENEY"
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH, JR."
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from ANTHONY BUSSIE re: Request to Clerk for Full Refund of $350 FF, etc. (TH, ) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/28/10. (js) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, RICHARD CHENEY, JOHN CONYERS, DR. CONDOLEZZA RICE, BARACK OBAMA,, NANCY PELOSI, filed by ANTHONY BUSSIE.(nz, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDERED IFP is GRANTED and Clerk shall file the Complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/13/2010. (nz, )n.m. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Complaint Received. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP, # 2 Summons To Be Issued, # 3 Consent to Receive Documents Electronically # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (nz, ). (Entered: 09/08/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 7 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?