Mandarini v. BMR Contracting, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-10297
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 3:17 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo James V. Merloni, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Joseph Bonfiglio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis A. Mandarini, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo BMR Contracting, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Bonfiglio, Louis A. Mandarini, III, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, James V. Merloni, Jr, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SUMMONS Returned Executed BMR Contracting, Inc. served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha N. Gillin on behalf of Joseph Bonfiglio, Louis A. Mandarini, III, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, James V. Merloni, Jr, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund (Gillin, Sasha) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Summons Issued as to BMR Contracting, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Franklin, Yvonne) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT against BMR Contracting, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7013847 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph Bonfiglio, Louis A. Mandarini, III, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, James V. Merloni, Jr, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Title Sheet)(Sills, Anne) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/16/2018) (Franklin, Yvonne). (Entered: 02/16/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 5 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?