Kalhorn v. Pham
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01685

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 11, 2021 at 10:14 PM DT (1.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Leave
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None In Limine
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Trial
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Trial
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Continue
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Leave
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Leave
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Vacate
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Order of Recusal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Leave
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Leave
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/11/2018. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on July 24, 2018, plaintiff James Paul Kalhorn shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?