Sehwail v. Wray
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00132
District Judge Claude M. Hilton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 9:15 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hashem Nader Sehwail, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CAIR - Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thania Diaz Clevenger +1 813 514 1414
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Omar Mustafa Saleh +1 813 514 1414 +1 813 987 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by CAIR National Legal Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Lena F. Masri +1 202 488 8787 +1 202 488 0833

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gadeir I. Abbas +1 202 742 6410 +1 202 488 0833 gabbas@cair.com
v.
No Logo Charles H. Cable, IV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Christopher A. Wray, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
No Logo David P Pekoske, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kevin K. McAleenan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Russel Travers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
So Ordered re 27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Hashem Nader Sehwail. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/14/2018. (dest, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hashem Nader Sehwail (Abbas, Gadeir) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Set Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Notice of Hearing Date set for 09/14/18 re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Memorandum in Support re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SUMMONS Returned Executed Kevin K. McAleenan served on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; David P Pekoske served on 5/31/2018; Russel Travers served on 6/1/2018; Christopher A. Wray served on 6/1/2018; Charles H. Cable, IV served on 6/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(dest, ) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Correction re 22 Certificate of Service. The filing user has been notified to file the original proof of service with the Clerk's office. (dest, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE of Service re 21 Summons Issued as to USA, by Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas on behalf of Hashem Nader Sehwail (Abbas, Gadeir) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Summons Issued as to Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dest, ) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Proposed Summons re 8 Amended Complaint by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons - Wray, # 2 Proposed Summons - Pekoske, # 3 Proposed Summons - Mcaleenan, # 4 Proposed Summons - Travers, # 5 Proposed Summons - District Attorney, # 6 Proposed Summons - Attorney General)(Abbas, Gadeir) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Notice of Correction re 19 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that document 19 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dest, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Proposed Summons on FBI / Wray (and all defendants) by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons on TSC / Kable, # 2 Proposed Summons on TSA / Pekoske, # 3 Proposed Summons on CBP / McAleenan, # 4 Proposed Summons on Travers / NCTC)(Abbas, Gadeir) (Main Document 19 replaced on 5/23/2018) (dest, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/23/2018) (dest, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/23/2018) (dest, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/23/2018) (dest, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/23/2018) (dest, ). (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 Second MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None case transferred in - district transfer
                            Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00158. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDERED: 15 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause, construed as a motion to transfer venue, is GRANTED. With the consent of the parties, this case is transferred to the Alexandria Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia for all future proceedings. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/7/2018. (MHM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None response
                                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 14 Order to show cause filed by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Saleh, Omar) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                  ORDER directing Plaintiff to show cause by a written response filed by Noon on February 8, 2018, why this case should not be transferred. Defendants shall respond by Noon on February 9, 2018. Second Amended Complaint due by Noon on February 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/7/2018. (JW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/7/2018. Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop (JW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Motion for TRO
                                      AMENDED MOTION for temporary restraining order by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Saleh, Omar) Modified on 2/7/2018 to edit text (RH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None letter
                                        APPENDIX re 8 Amended Complaint Exhibits 4 -10 by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10)(Saleh, Omar) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None letter
                                          APPENDIX re 8 Amended Complaint Exhibit 3 by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 pgs 31-60)(Saleh, Omar) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None letter
                                            APPENDIX re 8 Amended Complaint Exhibits 1 - 2 by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 pgs 37-83, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Saleh, Omar) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hashem Nader Sehwail.(Saleh, Omar) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                NOTICE of Special Appearance by Dena Michal Roth on behalf of Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray (Roth, Dena) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                  MOTION for Lena Masri to appear pro hac vice by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Saleh, Omar) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                    MOTION for Gadeir Abbas to appear pro hac vice by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Saleh, Omar) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. This matter is set for a TELEPHONIC HEARING on the 1 Complaint on Wednesday, February 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/5/2018. (MHM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Motion for TRO
                                                        Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Saleh, Omar) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                          NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report Form, # 2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT against Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX 026555) filed by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2018: # 2 Exhibit 1 PART 1, # 3 Exhibit 1 PART 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 PART 1, # 6 Exhibit 3 PART 2, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5) (RH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/8/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?