United States v. Jackson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01067
District Judge Robert S. Lasnik, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2021 at 2:33 PM ST (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yen Jeannette Tran +1 202 616 3366 y.jeannette.tran@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Brian P Jackson, Defendant
No Logo James J Jackson, III, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
No Logo King County, Defendant
No Logo State of Washington Department of Revenue, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Substitute
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Order to Re-Note Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Order to Re-Note Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Notice re Pro Se Registration
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time to answer and on initial scheduling dates re parties' 16 Stipulation: Mr. Jackson's Answer or response to complaint due 10/22/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/19/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/26/2018, Joint Status Report due by 11/11/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: James Jackson via USPS)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss partyCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting parties' 12 Joint Motion to Dismiss Brian P. Jackson, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(Brian P Jackson terminated.) (cc: James Jackson, Brian Jackson via USPS)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer re parties' 6 Stipulation: Mr. Jackson allowed an extension until 9/21/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: James Jackson, Brian Jackson via USPS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Brian P. Jackson, James J. Jackson, III, King County, State of Washington Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(DJ) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Yen Jeannette Tran added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons -James J. Jackson, # 3 Summons -King County, # 4 Summons -State of WA Dept. of Revenue, # 5 Summons -JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., # 6 Summons -Brian P. Jackson)(Tran, Yen) (Fee Waived) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?