Vidurek v. IRS
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-07971
District Judge Colleen McMahon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 4:22 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Vidurek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by John Vidurek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Vidurek
No Logo Kimberly Vidurek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kimberly Vidurek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Vidurek
No Logo Mary Madden, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Brenda Dial, Defendant
No Logo Daniel H. Schulman, Defendant
No Logo Guy Chiarello, Defendant
No Logo IRS, Defendant
No Logo J. Melendez, Defendant
No Logo Jack Dorsey, Defendant
No Logo Jeanette Willet, Defendant
No Logo John Koskinen, Defendant
No Logo John/Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Linda Piack, Defendant
No Logo Maryellen Benecke, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Quinn, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mailed a copy of 8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), 7 Order of Dismissal to John Vidurek, 1 South Drive, Hyde Park, NY 12539; and Kimberly Vidurek 1 South Drive Hyde Park, NY 12538 with Right to Appeal forms attached. (rro)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint),, 7 Order of Dismissal,,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mro)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued November 30, 2017, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the pending action under docket number 17-CV-9064 (VB). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/30/2017) (mro) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and to note service on the docket. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed as duplicative, without prejudice to the action under docket number 17-CV-9064 (VB). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/30/2017) (mro) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        LETTER from John Vidurek, dated 11/17/17 re: Petitioner informs the Court that this case was filed as an "Action at Law" and not a Habeas Corpus; and that he requests that it be removed from the docket and monies returned. Document filed by John Vidurek.(sc) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Vidurek, dated 11/16/17 re: Petitioner requests that the Court transfer his case back to the Federal Courthouse in White Plains, because his present health condition causes him to be unable to spend 3-4 hours traveling each way. Document filed by John Vidurek.(sc) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE TO ORDER TO PAY. Document filed by John Vidurek. (vn) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 465407015127 received. (sj)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Mailed a copy of 3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to John Vidurek, 1 South Drive, Hyde Park, NY 12539; and Kimberly Vidurek, 1 South Drive, Hyde Park, NY 12538. (rro)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (keb)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiffs are directed to render payment of the $400 filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 11/17/2017. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 11/17/2017. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/18/2017) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(keb) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Case Designated ECF. (sac)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by John Vidurek, Kimberly Vidurek. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit II, # 3 Exhibit III)(sac) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            COMPLAINT against IRS, John Koskinen, Brenda Dial, John/Jane Doe, J. Melendez, Maryellen Benecke, Linda Piack, Jeanette Willet, Daniel H. Schulman, Guy Chiarello, Mary Madden, Michael J. Quinn, Jack Dorsey. Document filed by Kimberly Vidurek, John Vidurek. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(sac) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 13 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?