Landmark Technology LLC v. Blade-Tech Industries, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05506
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2019 at 1:58 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Banie & Ishimoto LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Alexander Lee +1 650 549 5660 +1 415 665 2520 jlee@banishlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Alexander Lee +1 650 549 5660 +1 415 665 2520 jlee@banishlaw.com
v.
No Logo Blade-tech Industries, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Praecipe to Attach Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Praecipe to Attach Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                    SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. on 6/29/2018 (Lee, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report Order Form for District JudgesCourt Filing
                      ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/10/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/17/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                          Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. (CMG) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None
                            REPORT on the filing of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (Attachments: # 1 complaint)(CMG) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (CMG)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Landmark Technology LLC (Lee, John) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Praecipe for a Summons
                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Landmark Technology LLC (Lee, John) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5367869), filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Lee, John) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?