Drake v. Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-08092
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2019 at 3:54 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard B Drake, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clay Robbins, III +1 310 553 6630 +1 310 407 2295 clayrobbinsiii@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Begam & Marks PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M Friedman +1 602 254 6071 +1 602 252 0042 sfriedman@begamlaw.com
v.
No Logo BNSF Railway Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bradley J Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Lee Thorpe +1 602 916 5000 +1 602 916 5550 wthorpe@fclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thorpe Shwer, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley David Shwer +1 602 682 6100 bshwer@thorpeshwer.com
Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation"
No Logo Chemical Lime Company Of Arizona, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Unknown Parties, Defendant
No Logo Chemical Lime Company, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Industrial Railways, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Alan Olbricht +1 602 234 8772 +1 602 234 0341 KOlbricht@bcattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Resnick & Louis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell J. Resnick +1 602 456 7573 +1 602 456 6256 mitchellresnick@cox.net
Citation Section 45 U.S.C. § 51
Nature of Suit 330 - Personal Injury: Federal Employer's Liability
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER pursuant to the 73 Stipulation of Dismissal, the above-captioned action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice pursuant to 41(a)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 09/21/10. (ESL) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE re Notice of Filing Proposed Order Re: Stipulation for Dismissal by Richard B. Drake re 73 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Re: Stipulation for Dismissal)(Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Richard B. Drake. (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 71 Motion to Continue; Possible Dismissal re-set to 7/27/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/29/10.(LSP) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Continue Dismissal Motion to Postpone Dismissal by Richard B. Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date; vacating any pending hearings; denying all pending motions as moot; directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on June 28, 2010 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 05/28/10. (ESL) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Settlement by Chemical Lime Company (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard B. Drake re 67 Report, (Robbins, Clay) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPORT Plaintiff's Expert Reports Pursuant to Fed. Rule 26(a)(2)(b) by Plaintiff Richard B. Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert-Dennis Percy, # 2 Exhibit Expert-Allen Haley [Ex. 1], # 3 Exhibit Photos [Ex. 2], # 4 Exhibit Expert-Dr. Learch [Ex. 3], # 5 Exhibit Expert-Dr. Otto [Ex. 4], # 6 Exhibit Expert-Dr.Likeover [Ex. 5])(Robbins, Clay) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER re status conference. Discovery due by 8/6/2010. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant additional extensions absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/3/2010. (NVO) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Clay Robbins, III (telephonically) for pla; ReNae Nachman, Bradley Shwer and Keith Olbricht for dfts. Scheduling Conference held on 4/30/2010. Deadlines entered as stated on the record. Separate order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Railways. (Olbricht, Keith) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to 50 Third Party Complaint, by Industrial Railways.(Olbricht, Keith) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard B. Drake re 61 Witness List, CV.s and Fee Schedules of Experts (Robbins, Clay) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Witness List by Richard B. Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dennis G. Percy - CV.Fees, # 2 Exhibit Allen W. Haley - CV.Fees, # 3 Exhibit Ronald J. Otto, M.D. - CV.Fees, # 4 Exhibit Larry Likover, M.D. - CV.Fees, # 5 Exhibit Thomas Learch, M.D. - CV.Fees, # 6 Exhibit David Golden, M.D. - CV.Fees, # 7 Exhibit William Donavan, M.D. - CV.Fees, # 8 Exhibit Jose Spencer, M.D. - CV.Fees)(Robbins, Clay) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER: Industrial Railways answer due 4/23/2010; Dispositive motions due by 8/27/2010; Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/2010. (NVO) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice re NOTICE OF NON-PARTY AT FAULT AND SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF NON-PARTY AT FAULT by Chemical Lime Company (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard B. Drake re 57 Stipulation, (Robbins, Clay) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STIPULATION to Reschedule CMC, or In the Alternative to Allow Amendment to the CMC Order by Richard B. Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Clay Robbins III in Support of the Stipulation, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Allowing Amendment of the September 9, 2009 CMC Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Order Setting Amended Case Management)(Robbins, Clay) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice re NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Chemical Lime Company (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice re Service of Its Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company (Thorpe, William) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT TALKS by Chemical Lime Company. (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 01/18/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Summons Issued as to Industrial Railways. (MHA). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print. (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice re Exhibit A to Third Party Complaint by Chemical Lime Company, Chemical Lime Company of Arizona re 50 Third Party Complaint (Nachman, ReNae) Modified on 1/12/2010 TO INCLUDE FILER (KMG). (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chemical Lime Company, Chemical Lime Company of Arizona. (Nachman, ReNae) Modified on 1/12/2010 TO INCLUDE FILER (KMG). (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Third Party THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Industrial Railways, Unknown Parties (named as ABC Corporation I-X, ABC Limited Liability Companies I-X, ABC Partnerships I-X, John and Jane Does I-X) filed by Chemical Lime Company, Chemical Lime Company of Arizona.(Nachman, ReNae) Modified on 1/12/2010 DOCKET MODIFIED TO ADD (Unknown Parties) TO THE CASE AND TO INCLUDE FILER. (KMG). (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SUMMONS Submitted by Chemical Lime Company (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER pursuant to 47 Stipulation : Chemical Lime Company of Arizona may file its proposed third party complaint submitted with the amended stipulation against Third-Party Defendant Industrial Railways. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/2010. (NVO) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          STIPULATION AMENDED STIPULATION TO ALLOW THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Chemical Lime Company of Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER. The parties have filed a stipulation to file a third-party complaint. Dkt. #28. The Court's deadline for adding parties expired on November 11, 2009. Dkt. #28. Under Rule 16(b)(4), a scheduling order may be modified only for "good cause." The good cause standard primarily considers the diligence of the parties seeking the amendment. Johnson v. Mammoth Recreation, Inc., 975 F.2d 604, 609 (9th Cir. 1992). "The district court may modify the pretrial schedule 'if it cannot reasonably be met despite the diligence of the party seeking the extension.'" Id. (quoting Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 advisory committees notes (1983 amendment)). The parties' stipulation states that no party objects to or will be prejudiced by the third-party complaint, but it does not address good cause for extension of the Court's deadline. The stipulation is denied without prejudice to the parties filing a stipulation that addresses good cause and explains why the third-party complaint could not have been filed within the Court's deadline through the exercise of reasonable diligence. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12-18-09. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER. The parties have filed a status report on settlement talks. Dkt. #37. The report states that plaintiff submitted a settlement demand to defendants on November 25, 2009, and that defendants will consider the demand and respond within the next 30 days. This does not comply with the Court's Case Management Order. Dkt. #28. The Court's order required the parties to "meet in person and engage in good faith settlement talks no later than November 24, 2009." Id. at 4. The parties shall comply in full with the Court's requirement no later than January 13, 2010, and shall file a report confirming their face-to-face, good-faith settlement talks by January 15, 2010. Further complete compliance with the Court's orders will be required. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12-18-09. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, ) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice re Notice of Service of Discovery Responses by Chemical Lime Company, Chemical Lime Company of Arizona (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  STIPULATION TO ALLOW THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Chemical Lime Company, Chemical Lime Company of Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemical Lime Company of Arizona. (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chemical Lime Company of Arizona. (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying 32 Motion for Extension of Time re 30 day extension of time to respond to discovery. The Court does not need to rule on this type of extension inasmuch as it does not affect the deadline to complete discovery. The deadline to complete discovery in this matter remains 6/30/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/2/2009. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANTS CHEMICAL LIME COMPANY AND CHEMICAL LIME COMPANY OF ARIZONA'S ANSWER TO BNSF RAILWAY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint by Chemical Lime Company.(Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by ReNae A Nachman on behalf of Chemical Lime Company (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Chemical Lime Company. (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Notice re Nonparty at Fault by BNSF Railway Company (Shwer, Bradley) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Notice re Non-Party at Fault by Chemical Lime Company (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying 33 Stipulation as moot re 30 day extension of time to respond to discovery. The Court does not need to rule on this type of extension inasmuch as it does not affect the deadline to complete discovery. The deadline to complete discovery in this matter remains 6/30/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/17/2009. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHEMICAL LIME'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY by Chemical Lime Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Responses to Discovery by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shwer, Bradley) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Chemical Lime Company by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Thorpe, William) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Notice re Service of Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company (Thorpe, William) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Notice re NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemical Lime Company (Nachman, ReNae) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 6/30/2010. Dispositive motions due by 7/30/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/09. (LMR, ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Steven Friedman and Brian Magana for pla; William Thorpe and ReNae Nachman for dfts. Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2009. Separate scheduling order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, ) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by BNSF Railway Company. (Shwer, Bradley) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX087528 as to Clay III Robbins. (BAS)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Clay Robbins III on behalf of Richard B. Drake. (BAS) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER re Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2009 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/4/2009. (NVO) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Notice re Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement by Richard B. Drake (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Remark as to attorney Clay Robbins- removed from database for noncompliance with admissions deadline; party represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BNSF Railway Company. (Thorpe, William) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemical Lime Company. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chemical Lime Company. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Separate ANSWER to Complaint by Chemical Lime Company.(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER pursuant to 16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Chemical Lime Company answer due 7/2/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/30/2009. (NVO) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Chemical Lime Company. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company. (Thorpe, William) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by BNSF Railway Company.(Thorpe, William) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SUMMNS RETURNED EXECUTED of Summons and Complaint served on Chemical Lime Company on 6/8/2009, filed by Richard B. Drake. (Friedman, Steven) Modified on 6/25/2009 (TLJ). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM RETURN OF SERVICE TO SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Summons and Complaint served on BNSF Railway Company on 6/8/2009, filed by Richard B. Drake. (Friedman, Steven) Modified on 6/25/2009 (TLJ). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM RETURN OF SERVICE TO SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard B. Drake Affidavit of Attempted Service on Defendant Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard B. Drake Affidavit of Service on Defendant Chemical Lime Company (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard B. Drake Affidavit of Service on Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SUMMONS Issued as to Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation, BNSF Railway Company, Chemical Lime Company. (Attachments: # 1 BNSF Railway Company, # 2 Chemical Lime Company)(AMB). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print. (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED Summons Issued as to Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation, BNSF Railway Company, Chemical Lime Company. (AMB). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation, BNSF Railway Company, Chemical Lime Company. (Attachments: # 1 BNSF Railway Company, # 2 Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation)(AMB). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print. (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Notice re Summons to Defendant Chemical Lime Company by Richard B. Drake (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Notice re Summons to Defendant BNSF Railway Company by Richard B. Drake (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Notice re Summons to Defendant Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation by Richard B. Drake (Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Complaint filed by Richard B. Drake. Description of deficiency: Document not in compliance with Local Rule 7.1(c). Document not in PDF format and text searchable. (AMB) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Notice re Magistrate consent form. (AMB) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-09-8092-PCT-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered by AMB)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002864102, filed by Richard B. Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Steven) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?