United States v. Forbes
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00530
District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 6, 2019 at 2:06 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Forbes, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kieran O'Neill Carter +1 202 616 1920 +1 202 514 6866 kieran.o.carter@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerard J. Mene +1 703 299 3700 Gerard.Mene@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1340
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55 in favor of plaintiff United States of America and against defendant George Frobes. Entered by Clerk on 10/2/17. Copy mailed: yes(klau, ) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment. ORDERED that a judgment in the amount of $1,657,812.23 as of May 3, 2017 for the penalties assessed against him under 31 U.S.C. ?? 5321(a)(5), accrued interest on such penalties, late payment penalties, and further accrued interest on such penalties, plus statutory additions as allowed by law until the judgment is paid, against defendant George Forbes. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 in favor of the United States of America and against the defendant, George Forbes. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/2/17. Copy sent to defendant by chambers. (klau, ) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by United States of America. Objections to R&R due by 9/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/24/2017. (rban, ) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2017 re 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by United States of America. Plaintiff entered appearance; defendant does not appear. Plaintiff presents argument. Matter taken under advisement. Report and recommendation to follow. (Court Reporter FTR.)(cc: via US mail to defendant)(awac, ) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice of Correction re 15 Declaration. Incorrect case number listed on the document. Clerk's Office has corrected the filing.(gwalk, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Declaration re 13 Memorandum in Support, Supplement to the United States' Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Default Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Onisha Darnell, # 2 Exhibit 5 - Balance due as of May 3, 2017)(Carter, Kieran) (Main Document 15 replaced on 8/1/2017) (gwalk, ). (Entered: 08/01/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,. (clar, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Set Deadlines as to 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice of Hearing Date set for 08/18/2017 re 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Correction re 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,, The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Megan Hoffman Logsdon, # 2 Exhibit 2 - SCRA Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Account Transcripts, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment, # 5 Proposed Judgment)(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Default Judgment as to Complaint with Roseboro,. by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Roseboro Notice)(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that the United States be and hereby is permitted to July 21, 2017 to file a motion for default judgment. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/7/17. (klau, ) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Consent MOTION for Extension to File Default Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mene, Gerard) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to George Forbes (klau, ) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Request for Entry of Default as to George Forbes by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mene, Gerard) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER - It appears from the record that the defendant is in default. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff immediately obtain an entry of default from the Clerk pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), and it is furtherORDERED that promptly after obtaining the entry of default, plaintiff file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum, and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff file a Notice setting the hearing of the motion for default judgment for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, July 21, 2017, before the magistrate judge to whom this action is referred. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/21/17. (gwalk, )copy mailed to dft. (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to George Forbes served on 5/9/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (acha, ) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Mene on behalf of United States of America (Mene, Gerard) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/9/17. (klau, ) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan E. Hoffman-Logsdon and Certification of Local Counsel Kieran O. Carter by United States of America. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Summons Issued as to George Forbes. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            COMPLAINT against George Forbes (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, ) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?