Medina v. That's It Nutrition, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02022
District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2019 at 11:18 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Medina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin-Epstein & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Levin-Epstein +1 212 792 0046 +1 212 563 7108 joshua@levinepstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheehan & Associates, Plc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer I. Sheehan +1 347 635 4160 +1 516 234 7800 spencer@spencersheehan.com
No Logo Freddie Jamison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheehan & Associates, Plc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer I. Sheehan +1 347 635 4160 +1 516 234 7800 spencer@spencersheehan.com
v.
No Logo That''s It Nutrition, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Parties
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Freddie Jamison with prejudice (of the action) (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Medina (with corrected caption compared to ECF 10) with prejudice against defendant solely as to himself Plaintiff Medina and not as to Plaintiff Freddie Jamison (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second), adding plaintiff Freddie Jamison against All Defendants, filed by Freddie Jamison. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information.
            Incorrect Entry Information re 9 Amended Complaint. Counsel has filed an amended complaint that fails to list a newly appearing plaintiff in the caption on the document. Counsel has also failed to physically add the newly appearing plaintiff to the docket at the time of filing. Questions regarding electronic filing may be directed to the Clerk's Office at 718-613-2610. (Lee, Tiffeny)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Medina with prejudice against defendant solely as to himself, Plaintiff Medina and not as to Plaintiff Freddie Jamison (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second), adding plaintiff Freddie Jamison against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Medina. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Pre-Motion Conference
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/6/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff present. The court granted Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint and directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint adding Freddie Jamison as a named plaintiff by no later than July 16, 2018. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone) (Panek, Gabriel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion forJoinder
                  ORDER re: Plaintiff's 8 Application for Pre-Motion Conference: The Application is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to contact the court's Deputy at (718) 613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Plaintiff's request for a 30-day extension of time to serve the complaint is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/5/2018. (Panek, Gabriel)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None ~Motion for Joinder
                    MOTION for Joinder renewal of motion for relief sought at ECF 7 by Anthony Medina. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER re: Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Joinder: The Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Per the undersigned's Individual Rule III(A)(2), any party who wishes to amend a pleading pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) must request a pre-motion conference. The Motion is defective because it does not contain any such request. If Plaintiff renews his motion, he should also state whether Defendant's consent has been sought or obtained for the anticipated amendments. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/5/2018. (Panek, Gabriel)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/4/2018, Entered: None ~Motion for Joinder
                        MOTION for Joinder by Anthony Medina. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/04/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT first amended as of right against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Medina. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer I. Sheehan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                              Summons Issued as to That's It Nutrition, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                                This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                  In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10328901 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Anthony Medina. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?