Wilson v. Playtika, Ltd
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05277
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2021 at 12:49 PM EDT (4.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sean Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EDELSON PC (SF)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Rafey S. Balabanian +1 312 589 6370 +1 312 589 6378 rbalabanian@edelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Todd M Logan +1 312 572 7209 tlogan@edelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Eve-Lynn J. Rapp +1 312 589 6370 erapp@edelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin Harris Richman +1 312 589 6370 +1 312 589 6378 brichman@edelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE J. Eli Wade Scott +1 312 242 0859 ewadescott@edelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tousley, Brain Stephens PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cecily Shiel +1 206 682 5600 cshiel@tousley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Janissa Ann Strabuk +1 206 682 5600 jstrabuk@tousley.com
v.
No Logo Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Byrnes Keller Cromwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Arthur Tondini +1 206 622 2000 jtondini@byrneskeller.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE John Nadolenco +1 213 229 9500 +1 213 625 0248 jnadolenco@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Playtika Holding Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Dodds Powell +1 206 294 7376 +1 206 623 8717 emilyp@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Behnam Dayanim +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 bdayanim@paulhastings.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Edward George +1 202 551 1922 edwardgeorge@paulhastings.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE C. Reade Jacob, Jr. +1 202 551 1987 readejacob@paulhastings.com
No Logo Playtika Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Dodds Powell +1 206 294 7376 +1 206 623 8717 emilyp@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Behnam Dayanim +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 bdayanim@paulhastings.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Edward George +1 202 551 1922 edwardgeorge@paulhastings.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE C. Reade Jacob, Jr. +1 202 551 1987 readejacob@paulhastings.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Seal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Praecipe to Attach Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None File Over-length Motions and Briefs
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None 3 - Stipulation and Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Receipt
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None 3 - Stipulation and Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None 3 - Stipulation and Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Certify
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Certify
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 71 Stipulated Motion to Set Deadlines: Defendant CIE to file motion to dismiss by 1/10/19, Plaintiff's response due by 4/12/19, and any reply brief to be filed by 4/26/19, with the motion noting date 4/26/19; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/11/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/25/2019, Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Set a Schedule for Briefing a Motion to Dismiss and to Set Other Dates Pertaining to Caesars Interactive Entertainment, filed by Defendant Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC. Noting Date 11/28/2018, (Tondini, John) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on STIPULATION re 69 Extending Dates: Playtika, Ltd answer due 12/21/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2018, Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Schedule for Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Response to the Complaint by parties (Logan, Todd) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING 40 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike and GRANTING 43 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint by Plaintiff Sean Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - WSGC Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Smith v. GC Services, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Grant v. McKee, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Rushing v. Viacom)(Logan, Todd) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint (Logan, Todd) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Intent to File Surreply Pursuant to LCR 7(g) re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Logan, Todd) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Defendant Playtika, Ltd, TO RESPONSE to 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing PartyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING PARTY Defendant Playtika Holding Corp.; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 60 Defendants Playtika Ltd. and Playtika Holding Corp.'s Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - partys
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Playtika Holding Corp. (a Delaware corporation), filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Logan, Todd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs, filed by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/18/2018, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER re 53 Stipulated; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Sean Wilson, to 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Todd Logan, # 2 Exhibit 2- Playtika's RFP Responses (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Suzie Kelly Letter, # 4 Exhibit 4 - PM Letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Cheryl Kater Comment)(Logan, Todd) (Entered: 09/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 2 to 55 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Playtika Ltd's 40 Rule 12(b)(2) Motion - Playtika's RFP Responses (Unredacted) by Plaintiff Sean Wilson re 54 MOTION to Seal (Logan, Todd) Modified on 9/13/2018: added document relationship for the underlying motion and the document this exhibit was to be attached too. (CMG). (Entered: 09/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's 40 Rule 12(b)(2) motion (Unredacted) by Plaintiff Sean Wilson re 54 MOTION to Seal (Logan, Todd) Modified on 9/13/2018: added document relationship to the underlying motion (CMG). (Entered: 09/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal, filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Todd Logan ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/14/2018, (Logan, Todd) (Entered: 09/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order ([Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order), filed by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Emily Dodds Powell) Noting Date 8/30/2018, (Powell, Emily) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Sean Wilson, to 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint, 43 MOTION Judicial Notice re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Transcript, # 3 Proposed Order)(Logan, Todd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRAECIPE re 49 Declaration,, by Plaintiff Sean Wilson (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT of the 50 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials and the USB drive containing Exhibit A to the 49 Declaration of J Eli Wade-Scott. (put in expando folder and placed on file shelf.) (CMG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 49 Declaration: Modifed to create relationship between Declaration and Motion to Dismiss 40 at request of counsel. (KB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 48 Response to Motion : Modifed to create relationship between Response and Motion to Dismiss 40 at request of counsel. (KB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A to J. Eli Wade-Scott Declaration in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. inre 49 Declaration,. (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of J. Eli Wade-Scott filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson re 43 MOTION Judicial Notice re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint (Strabuk, Janissa) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct docket entry relationship at request of counsel (KB). (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Sean Wilson, to 43 MOTION Judicial Notice re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint . 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint (Strabuk, Janissa) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct docket entry relationship at request of counsel (KB). (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER on the 46 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney J Eli Wade-Scott for Sean Wilson, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY J. Eli Wade-Scott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sean Wilson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5430121 (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 44 Stipulated Motion for Leave to Serve Jurisdictional Discovery; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order Granting Leave to Serve Jurisdictional Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's 1st Set of RFPs to Defendant Playtika Holding Corp.) Noting Date 7/27/2018, (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Judicial Notice re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint, filed by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/24/2018, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Hagit Blaiberg filed by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Arik Sandler filed by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Defs. Playtika Ltd and Playtika Holding Corp. or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Allegations from the Complaint, filed by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/24/2018, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 37 Stipulated Motion to Stay Deadlines and Discovery Pertaining to Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 36 Stipulated Motion staying Joint Status Report Deadlines until after Court decides the motion to dismiss; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Deadlines and Discovery Pertaining to Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC, filed by Defendant Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC. Noting Date 6/29/2018, (Tondini, John) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY DEADLINES AND DISCOVERY PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. Noting Date 6/28/2018, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 34 Stipulated Motion Setting Case Schedules: Defendants have until 7/2/18 to file responsive motions; Plaintiffs' oppositions to Defendants' motions to compel arbitration or other motions related to Terms of Use are due by 8/13/18; Plaintiffs' oppositions to Defendants' motions to stay the matters as a whole depending on developments in the Ninth Circuit or other facts are due by 8/20/18; Plaintiffs' oppositions to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motions are due by 8/27/18; Plaintiffs' oppositions to Defendants' other Rule 12(b) motions are due by 9/3/18; Defendants' individual replies are due by 9/24/18, which will be the noting date for all motions; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulated MOTION, filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/7/2018, (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alpha Frontier Limited, Other Affiliate Playtika Group Ltd. for Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 31 Stipulated Motion; Defendants' answers/motions are due by 6/8/18; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Time to Respond to Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendant Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC. (Tondini, John) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney Emily Dodds Powell added for Playtika Holding Corp., and Playtika, Ltd per 19 the Notice of Appearance filed by Angelo Calfo. (CMG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER on the corrected 29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward George for Playtika Holding Corp, and Playtika, Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for PHV for Edward George by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on the 24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Nadolenco for Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER on the 22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney C Reade Jacob for Playtika Holding Corp, and Playtika, Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER on the 21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Behnam Dayanim for Playtika Holding Corp, and Playtika, Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED/CORRECTED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment Corporation for Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC (Tondini, John) Modified on 5/7/2018: added text to indicate that this was an amended; original corp discl stmt filed at 20. (CMG). (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Nadolenco FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5303095 (Tondini, John) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEASE DisregardAPPLICATION OF ATTORNEY C. Reade Jacob FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5303113 (Calfo, Angelo) Modified on 5/2/2018: wrong image attached, corrected at ECF #29. (CMG). (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY C Reade Jacob Edward George FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5303104 (Calfo, Angelo) Modified on 5/2/2018: corrected PHV attorney name (CMG). (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Behnam Dayanim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5303090 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC (Tondini, John) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Arthur Tondini on behalf of Defendant Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC. (Tondini, John) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Playtika Holding Corp. mailed on 4/27/2018; Playtika, Ltd mailed on 4/27/2018 (Strabuk, Janissa) Modified on 4/30/2018 (ELS). (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Playtika, LTD on 4/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Playtika Holding Corp. on 4/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Caesers Interactive, LLC on 4/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sean Wilson. (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on the 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Todd Logan for Sean Wilson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER on the 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rafey S Balabanian for Sean Wilson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER on the 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eve-Lynn Rapp for Sean Wilson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on the 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin H. Richman for Sean Wilson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Todd Logan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sean Wilson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5280372 (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rafey S. Balabanian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sean Wilson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5280368 (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eve-Lynn J. Rapp FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sean Wilson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5280366 (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin H. Richman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sean Wilson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5280361 (Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/27/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/5/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Caesars Interactive Entertainment, LLC, Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(GMR) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5271476) Attorney Janissa Ann Strabuk added to party Sean Wilson(pty:pla), filed by Sean Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Strabuk, Janissa) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?