Sauter v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00242
District Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 7, 2019 at 6:04 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Michael Sauter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Fisher Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Edward Fisher +1 888 524 4326 donald.e.fisher@fisherlawfirm.us
No Logo Sherri Lynn Sauter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Fisher Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Edward Fisher +1 888 524 4326 donald.e.fisher@fisherlawfirm.us
v.
No Logo The United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES; ORDER, pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on August 3, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/03/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    First STIPULATIOn to Extend Expert Witness and Dispositive Motions Deadlines. Expert witness disclosure and dispositive motions extended from 6/15/2011 to 7/15/2011. (Motions due by 7/15/2011.) Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 6/17/2011. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/17/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 2/7/2011. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 02/08/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        EP: Status Conference Re: Trial Date and Other Deadlines held on 2/7/2011. New trial date given. Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Bench Trial set for 11/15/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 8/4/2011 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Discovery due by 9/16/2011. Motions due by 6/15/2011.( C5 - no record, 9:00-9:05am.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 02/07/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Clerk's NOTICE re: Assignment of U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Honorable Kevin S.C. Chang is the U.S. Magistrate Judge assigned to the case. Accordingly, please reflect case number CV 10-00242-LEK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 01/31/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            EO: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2011 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI will be held before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Status Conference Re: Trial Date and Other Deadlines set for 2/7/2011 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI will be held before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/31/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              EO: Non Jury Trial set for 7/6/2011 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT will be held before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI for all further proceedings. JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CIVIL NO 10-00242 LEK on all further pleadings ). Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/28/2011. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  EO: Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2011 at 02:00 PM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBYASHI is Vacated. Status Conference Re: Trial Date and Other Deadlines set for 2/7/2011 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The United States of America.(Helper, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Christopher Michael Sauter, Sherri Lynn Sauter. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Donald) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on September 1, 2010. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/30/2010. Bench Trial set for 7/6/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2011 02:00 PM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. Motions due by 2/2/2011. Discovery due by 5/6/2011. (Court Reporter Courtroom 7-No Record) (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherri Lynn Sauter, Christopher Michael Sauter. The United States of America served on 8/19/2010 through Stephan Letho, Receptionist, answer due 10/18/2010. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT'S SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Helper, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE by Sherri Lynn Sauter, Christopher Michael Sauter (Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons) Sherri Lynn Sauter, Christopher Michael Sauter. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service (Notice of Lawsuit & Request to Waive Service of a Summons dated July 12, 2010 and Waiver of the Service of Summons))(Fisher, Donald) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  REPORT of Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs Sherri Lynn Sauter and Christopher Michael Sauter. (Fisher, Donald) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiffs Sherri Lynn Sauter and Christopher Michael Sauter. (Fisher, Donald) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE by Sherri Lynn Sauter, Christopher Michael Sauter Notice of Change of Firm Name of Counsel for Plaintiffs Sherri Lynn Sauter, Christopher Michael Sauter. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Donald) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2010 at 09:00AM is continued to 8/30/2010 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2010 at 09:00AM is continued to 7/29/2010 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Filing fee: $ 350.00,receipt number 251297 re 1 Complaint (gls, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 7/26/2010 before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI.. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/26/10. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Memo)(gls, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT against The United States of America, filed by Sherri Lynn Sauter, Christopher Michael Sauter. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(gls, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?