Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fu v. Landmark Utilities & Concrete Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11140
District Judge Rya W. Zobel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 7, 2019 at 11:41 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Landmark Utilities & Concrete Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Tocci Building Corporation, Reach and Apply Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNicola Seligson & Upton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John W. DiNicola, II +1 617 447 2030 +1 617 338 4244 jack.dinicola@dsu-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. 90 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SUMMONS Returned Executed Landmark Utilities & Concrete Corporation served on 6/23/2018, answer due 7/16/2018. (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 8 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference REset for 8/30/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to late August 2018 by Tocci Building Corporation.(DiNicola, John) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SUMMONS Returned Executed Tocci Building Corporation served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha N. Gillin on behalf of Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fu (Gillin, Sasha) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Tocci Building Corporation.(DiNicola, John) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Summons Issued as to Landmark Utilities & Concrete Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (adminn, ) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT against Landmark Utilities & Concrete Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7164128 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Title Sheet)(Sills, Anne) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/31/2018) (adminn, ). (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?