United States v. Fogel
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00308
District Judge Denise L. Cote, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2019 at 3:56 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella +1 212 637 2477 +1 212 637 2443 brooke.cucinella@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ian Patrick McGinley +1 212 637 2257 patrick.mcginley@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Arditi Naftalis +1 212 637 2310 +1 212 637 2527 joshua.naftalis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo David Blaszczak, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Paul Bach +1 212 479 6470 +1 212 208 2634 jbach@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sabrina P. Shroff +1 212 417 8713 +1 212 571 0392 sabrina_shroff@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella appearing for USA. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 10/01/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FILING ERROR - WRONG FILER SELECTED - NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction as to Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall (Mukasey, Marc) Modified on 6/30/2017 (lb). (Entered: 06/30/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/31/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Conference held on 5/31/17 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/31/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Conference held on 5/31/17 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. The Assignment Committee, having considered the submissions of the parties and pursuant to the authority delegated to it under Local Rule 2 for the Division of Business Among Judges, unanimously concludes that the Indictment docketed as (S-1) 17 CR 0308 does not supersede the information styled United States v. Jordan Fogel, 17-CR-308. THEREFORE, the Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Indictment as a new criminal action with a new docket number and randomly assign the case in accordance with Local Rule 6(b). SO ORDERED. (By Judge Colleen McMahon, Judge William H. Pauley, Judge Vincent L. Briccetti, Judge Valerie Caproni on 6/8/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        LETTER by David Blaszczak addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Sabrina P. Shroff, Assistant Federal Defender dated June 5, 2017 (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          LETTER by USA as to Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 2, 2017 re: Exclusion of Time Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            LETTER by USA as to Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 2, 2017 re: Superseding Indictment Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sabrina P. Shroff appearing for David Blaszczak. Appearance Type: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment. (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Appearance Bond Entered as to (17-Cr-308-02) David Blaszczak in amount of $500,000. $500,000 secured by PRB; co-signed by 3 financially responsible co-signers - 1 week; travel documents surrendered; travel restricted to South Carolina & New York; participate in mental health treatment program; no contact with co-defendants; witness or potential witness unless in presence of counsel; no firearms; no unlawful possession of drugs; drug testing as discretion of PTS; no abuse of alcohol; PTS supervision. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 5/31/2017. Defendant Released.] (bw) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Plea entered by David Blaszczak (2) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16,17,18 and Theodore Huber (3) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Robert Olan (4) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Christopher Worrall (5) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16 Not Guilty. (jw)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote:Arraignment as to David Blaszczak (2) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16,17,18 and Theodore Huber (3) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Robert Olan (4) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Christopher Worrall (5) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16 held on 5/31/2017. Defendant David Blaszczak present with counsel Sabrina Schroff, Esq. (Federal Defenders). Defendant Theodore Huber present with counsels Barry Berke, Esq. and Dani James, Esq. (Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP). Defendant Robert Olan present with counsels David C. Esseks, Esq., Tobias Jacob Fischer, Esq., and Eugene Edward Ingoglia, Esq. (Allen & Overy, LLP). Defendant Christopher Worrall present with counsel Xavier Donaldson, Esq. AUSAs A. Damian Williams, Ian Patrick McGinley, and Joshua Naftalis present. Pretrial Services Lisa Chan present. Court Reporter Vincent Bologna present. The Court temporarily assigns Ms. Schroff and Mr. Patton as counsel for Mr. Blaszczak. The Court alsotemporarily assigns Mr. Donaldson as counsel for Mr. Worrall. The Court request a letter from counsel for Blaszczak and Worrall. All defendants plea not guilty. Govt to submit by this Friday at noon, their response to Mr. Berke letter. Bail set for Mr. Blaszczak and Mr. Worrall. In the interest of justice, time is excluded from today to 6/14/17 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(1)(a). (jw)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry on "District Judge Bail Disposition Sheet" for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Bond Hearing as to (17-Cr-308-2) David Blaszczak held on 5/31/2017. AUSA A. Damian Williams. Defense Counsel Sabrina Schroff. PSA Officer Lisa Chan. BAIL DISPOSITION: $500,000.00 secured by PRB co-signed by 3 financially responsible co-signors -1 week; Travel documents surrendered; Travel restricted to South Carolina & New York; Participate in mental health treatment program; No contact with co-defendants, victims, or potential witness unless in presence of counsel; No firearm; No unlawful possession of drugs; Drug testing at discretion of Pretrial Services; No abuse of alcohol; PTS supervision. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/31/2017) (bw) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Sealed document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan Bach dated 5/30/2017 re: on behalf of The New York Council of Defense Lawyers as amicus curiae to address issues concerning matters of judicial assignments which requires Judicial Review . Document filed by Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Bach, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated 05/25/2017 re: request for exclusion of time under the Speedy Trial Act. ENDORSEMENT: The Court finds that in the interests of justice to exclude time to 5/31/17 to allow the Government to pursue discovery and to allow defendants to travel to this district. These interests are in the interests of justice and outweigh the interests of the defendants and public in a speedy trial. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest for Judge Denise Cote on 5/25/2017)(hm). (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSAs Joshua A. Naftalis, Damian Williams, and Ian McGinley dated 5/25/17 re: Exclusion of Time Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                S(1) INDICTMENT FILED as to David Blaszczak (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, Theodore Huber (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, Robert Olan (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, Christopher Worrall (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16. (Attachments: # 1 indi part 2, # 2 indi part3) (jm)(Filed under seal on 5/23/17) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2017: # 1 indictment, # 2 indictment, # 3 indictment, # 4 indictment) (jm). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?